Protopapas v. Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA et al
Plaintiff: Peter D Protopapas
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA, Zurich American Insurance Company and Sentry Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01635
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE: Counsel is noticed to follow all ECF filing requirements, instructions and judge's preferences when making any future filings. If there are any questions about filing any pleading, please contact the Clerk's Office before attempting to file. Case captions, case numbers, etc. should reflect this court's case in which counsel is filing, not any other court's captions. Associated Cases: 7:18-cv-03291-BHH, 3:19-cv-01635-BHH, 3:19-cv-01827-BHH(alew, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Peter D Protopapas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hill Release, #2 Exhibit Taylor Release, #3 Exhibit 7.8.19 Order re. Transfer, #4 Exhibit 7.5.19 Order re. Status Conference, #5 Exhibit 3.20.19 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider Default)(Spitz, Jescelyn) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Sentry Casualty Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Receiver dated May 7, 2019, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Irene Z. Muse) (alew, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand. Response filed by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Sentry Casualty Company. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver dated May 7, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Irene Z. Muse)(Davis, William) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit text (alew, ). Modified on 7/10/2019 to add parties listed as filers (alew, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Clarification on Receiver, #2 Exhibit Taylor Motion to Lift Default, #3 Exhibit Hill Motion to Lift Default, #4 Envelope Appearances of Receiver)(Powell, Warren)
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Peter D Protopapas.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver, #2 Exhibit Order Denying Covil's Motion to Lift Entry of Default, #3 Exhibit Covil's Motion for Entry of Default Part I, #4 Exhibit Covil's Motion for Entry of Default Part II, #5 Exhibit Covil's Motion for Entry of Default Part III, #6 Exhibit April 24, 2019 Letter from Travelers to the Receiver)(Spitz, Jescelyn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 Sealed Document. (Davis, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Peter D Protopapas. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4.24.19 Letter from Travelers to the Receiver, #2 Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Covil's Motion to Lift Entry of Default, #4 Exhibit Part I: Covil's Motion for Relief from Entry of Default, #5 Exhibit Part II: Covil's Motion for Relief from Entry of Default, #6 Exhibit Part III: Covil's Motion for Relief from Entry of Default, #7 Exhibit Return of Service (WTH))No proposed order.(Spitz, Jescelyn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/20/19.(alew, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Peter D Protopapas.(Spitz, Jescelyn) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sentry Casualty Company.(Sawyer, Wesley)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Dworjanyn, Peter)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company serving Joint Motion to Dismiss #10 ; Memorandum of Law in Support of the Insurers' Joint Motion to Dismiss with Exhibits A-F and H [10-1 through 10-8; Joint Motion to Seal and Memorandum in Support #11 (Davis, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hill Stipulation of Dismissal, #2 Exhibit Taylor Stipulation of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Covil Corporate Revocation)No proposed order.(Clark, Chelsea)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA.(Clark, Chelsea)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Seal Document and Memorandum in Support by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Davis, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Sentry Casualty Company. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, #3 Exhibit B - Hill Motion for Default, #4 Exhibit C - Taylor Motion for Default, #5 Exhibit D - Motion to Appoint Receiver, #6 Exhibit E - Orders Granting Default in Hill and Taylor, #7 Exhibit F - Order Appointing Receiver, #8 Exhibit H - Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice)No proposed order.(Davis, William) Modified on 7/9/2019 to add parties listed as filers (alew, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company re #5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, 4 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal. (alew, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company.(alew, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Sentry Casualty Company. (alew, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (alew, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-02285. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8488636), filed by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Covil Corporation's State Court Motion for Relief from Entry of Default, #2 State Court Documents Part 1, #3 State Court Documents Part 2, #4 State Court Documents Part 3, #5 State Court Documents Part 4, #6 State Court Documents Part 5, #7 State Court Documents Part 6, #8 State Court Documents Part 7)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protopapas v. Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: William Pearce Davis
Represented By: Mariel Denise Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wall Templeton & Haldrup PA
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Represented By: Chelsea Jaqueline Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Harris Dworjanyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Casualty Company
Represented By: Wesley Brian Sawyer
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter D Protopapas
Represented By: Mark Weston Hardee
Represented By: Jonathan M Robinson
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Represented By: Jescelyn Tillman Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?