McCrea v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mercedes C McCrea
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Bank of America NA, Trans Union LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01666
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc only without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/31/2019. (asni, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Mercedes C McCrea (Maxfield, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mercedes C McCrea as to Bank of America, N.A., Only (Maxfield, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Mercedes C McCrea.(Maxfield, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Mercedes C McCrea. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan)(Maxfield, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Mercedes C McCrea. (Maxfield, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wilbur)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to Equifax Information Services LLC only without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/2/2019. (asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Mercedes C McCrea (Maxfield, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to Trans Union LLC only without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Trans Union LLC terminated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/2019. (asni, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Trans Union LLC, Only by Mercedes C McCrea (Maxfield, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/4/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/2019. (asni, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/26/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/28/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/28/2019, Discovery due by 11/27/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 12/11/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/2019. (asni, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to Bank of America, N.A. only without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/11/2019. (asni, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Bank of America, N.A., only by Mercedes C McCrea (Maxfield, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mercedes C McCrea.(Maxfield, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(asni, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2019-CP-40-02546. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8494351), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Joinders in and Consent to Removal)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrea v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Thomas Richmond McPherson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes C McCrea
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?