United States of America v. 13,830.82 dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 13,830.82 dollars in United States Currency
Claimant: Moses Frasier
Case Number: 3:2019cv01740
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #15 Order to Notify of Address Change and #16 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Moses Frasier, 317940, Lee Correctional Institution, 990 Wisacky Hwy, Bishopville, SC 29010. (lbak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/14/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/16/2019. (lbak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing claimant to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/16/2019. (lbak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Moses Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter from USA, #3 Envelope from USA)(mflo, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM of $13,830.82 funds on deposit in Cooper Trust Fund Account by Moses Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter from USA, #3 Envelope from USA)(mflo, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 Warrant Returned. First attachment description: Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem . (Sherard, Carrie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to in rem property/cash. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant in rem with return)(Sherard, Carrie) See #8 the return of service (mflo, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (mflo, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/20/2019) (mflo, ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 13,830.82 dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Julie Yelk)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 13,830.82 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13,830.82 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Moses Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?