Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company v. Boda LLC et al

Plaintiff: Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Matthew Standridge, Boda LLC, Justin Brown and Amanda P Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv01747
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Boda LLC waiver executed on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Eggleston, Tracy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Cooper Wilson, III on behalf of Justin Brown, Matthew Standridge (Wilson, Harry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Matthew Standridge waiver executed on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Eggleston, Tracy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Justin Brown waiver executed on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Eggleston, Tracy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton on behalf of Justin Brown, Matthew Standridge (Edgerton, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Matthew Standridge on 07082019 by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form Waiver)(Eggleston, Tracy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Justin Brown on 07082019 by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form Waiver)(Eggleston, Tracy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Amanda P Taylor waiver executed on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Waiver of Service)(Eggleston, Tracy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BODA, LLC, d/b/a THE BIRD DOG, c/o Joseph M. McCulloch, Jr., Esq. on 06/25/2019 by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form-Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Eggleston, Tracy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Amanda P Taylor. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Matthew Standridge. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Justin Brown. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Boda LLC. (mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company.(mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company.(mflo, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (INTERPLEADER) against Boda LLC, Justin Brown, Matthew Standridge, Amanda P Taylor ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8512559.), filed by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company. Service due by 9/17/2019(mflo, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Exhibit) (mflo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company v. Boda LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Eggleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Standridge
Represented By: Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton
Represented By: Harry Cooper Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boda LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brown
Represented By: Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton
Represented By: Harry Cooper Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda P Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?