United States of America v. 24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency and 24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency
Claimant: William Edward Tillman
Case Number: 3:2019cv01758
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 7/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Warrant In Rem Issued placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to William Edward Tillman, 268523, Kirkland Correctional Institution, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210 (bgoo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (bgoo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (Sherard, Carrie) (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/1/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/28/2019 (Sherard, Carrie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM by William Edward Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter from US Attorney's Office, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(cbru, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/29/2019.(cbru, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 proposed Amended Complaint) (cbru, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned as to 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency . (Attachments: #1 Warrant in rem with Return)(Sherard, Carrie) Modified to edit text on 6/26/2019 (cbru, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (cbru, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (cbru, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Agent Julie Yelk)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24,877.48 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24,887.48 dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Edward Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?