United States of America v. CuttyCo LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 95,000 Dollars and CuttyCo LLC
Claimant: Ann Davis Eldridge and Susan Butler
Case Number: 3:2019cv01764
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay this case until the criminal case is resolved. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/17/19.(mflo, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by Susan Butler, United States of America. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Sherard, Carrie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Verified Statement of Interest of Susan Butler by Susan Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement of Interest of Susan Butler)(Barbier, Deborah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $95,000 Cashiers Check. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Executed Warant Return)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by United States of America. (Sherard, Carrie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (mflo, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (mflo, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 95,000 Dollars Cashiers Check, CuttyCo LLC, filed by United States of America. Service due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Gilad Rosen)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. CuttyCo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 95,000 Dollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CuttyCo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ann Davis Eldridge
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Susan Butler
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Represented By: Deborah B Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?