Guest v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steven L. Guest
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01841
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/14/2019. (cbru, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Hawk, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Hawk, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Extension Confirmation Letter)(Hawk, John) Modified to edit text on 7/22/2019 (cbru, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven L. Guest. Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card, #2 DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (cbru, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Steven L. Guest.(cbru, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8529792) filed by Steven L. Guest. Service due by 9/26/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guest v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Guest
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?