Trigg v. JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey E. Trigg
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01869
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Trans Union LLC has failed to comply with the text order entered August 12, 2016 (Dkt No. 19), by failing to file Responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories in conjunction with the Rule 26(f) Report by August 26, 2019. Counsel shall file the required responses to interrogatories within ten calendar days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions, which may, without further notice, include dismissal of the action without prejudice, exclusion of some or all defenses, or a monetary sanction not to exceed $500. (Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories due by 9/6/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/27/2019. (cbru, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeffrey E. Trigg.(Maxfield, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC.(Abee, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Jeffrey E. Trigg. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time regarding 26(f) Report and Initial Disclosures. (Rule 26 Report due by 8/26/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/12/2019. (cbru, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time regarding 26(f) Report and Initial Disclosures by JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Abee, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC.(Abee, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/7/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/8/2019.(cbru, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/27/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 2/10/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/20/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/9/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/8/2019. (cbru, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilbur Eugene Johnson on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Johnson, Wilbur)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC answer due 7/29/2019. (Abee, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeffrey E. Trigg.(Maxfield, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(cbru, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-02912 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8533511) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #2 Certificate of Service) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trigg v. JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank Holdings LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Benjamin Rush Smith, III
Represented By: Matthew Adams Abee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey E. Trigg
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?