Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Lawson
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Defendant: KDL, KL and Daniela H Lawson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01882
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Daniela H Lawson waiver executed on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons)(Bagley, Lee) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/19/2019) (asni, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. KL served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 return of service) refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (asni, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. KDL served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 return of service) refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniela H Lawson. (asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The.(asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The.(asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KL. (asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KDL. (asni, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniela H Lawson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8536397.), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Service due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: AmGUARD Policy No. SGBP998472, #2 Exhibit B 9.19.18 Election, #3 Exhibit C 11.19.18 Election, #4 Exhibit D Death Certificate)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDL
Represented By: Adam Tremaine Silvernail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL
Represented By: Adam Tremaine Silvernail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela H Lawson
Represented By: Adam Tremaine Silvernail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Nashiba Dawntay Finley Boyd
Represented By: Lee Ellen Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?