Leach v. Sumter County School District
Plaintiff: Cornelius Leach
Defendant: Sumter County School District
Case Number: 3:2019cv01972
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cornelius Leach.(Albrecht, Samantha)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 14 Reason: duplicate entry of #12 . (lbak)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Sumter County School District.(Smith, Allen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Sumter County School District.(Smith, Allen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Sumter County School District. (Smith, Allen) Modified on 8/20/2019 to remove attachment 1 and file separately as document #15 . (lbak)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Sumter County School District.(Smith, Allen)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER terminating #8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as moot in light of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/19. (vhor)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sumter County School District, filed by Cornelius Leach. Service due by 11/4/2019 (Albrecht, Samantha) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/7/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Sumter County School District. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Employment Contract for the 2017-2018 School Year)No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Smith, Allen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton McCall Segars on behalf of Cornelius Leach (Segars, Creighton)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cornelius Leach.(Albrecht, Samantha)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 8/19/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/13/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/13/2019, Discovery due by 2/11/2020, Motions due by 2/26/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/27/2020, Mediation Due by 4/27/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/16/2019. (bgoo) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/16/2019 with corrected scan of document.) (bgoo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Sumter County School District.(Smith, Allen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sumter County School District. (bgoo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-43-01251, filed by Sumter County School District. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8556700) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. Sumter County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Leach
Represented By: Garryl L Deas
Represented By: Julius Wistar Babb, IV
Represented By: Samantha Elenor Albrecht
Represented By: Creighton McCall Segars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County School District
Represented By: Connie Pertrice Jackson
Represented By: Allen D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?