Miller v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Robert George Miller
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv02033
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Hodges, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert George Miller.(Hicks, Ryan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Robert George Miller.(Hicks, Ryan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Robert George Miller.(Hicks, Ryan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert George Miller.(Hicks, Ryan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 8/28/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/22/2019, Discovery due by 2/19/2020, Motions due by 3/5/2020, Mediation Due by 5/4/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/25/2019. (bgoo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Hodges, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (bgoo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-40-03511, filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8567184) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert George Miller
Represented By: Ryan Kyle Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lillian Marshall Coleman Newton
Represented By: Robert Hayne Hodges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?