Davis v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandie R Davis
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02289
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/11/2019. (mbro, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Sandie R Davis (Maxfield, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandie R Davis.(Maxfield, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/4/2019, Fact Discovery due by 3/4/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/8/2020, Discovery due by 6/11/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 6/12/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/10/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/11/2020, Mediation Due by 4/20/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/23/2019. (asni, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Sandie R Davis. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/10/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/20/2019. (asni, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/20/2019. (asni, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/19/2019.(asni, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandie R Davis.(Maxfield, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(asni, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2019-CP-40-03864. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8614473), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Joinder in and Consent to Removal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc, #3 Exhibit C - Joinder in and Consent to Removal of Equifax Information Services, LLC)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandie R Davis
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?