Schumpert v. Peoples Gas Company et al
Plaintiff: Angela Schumpert
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC, Midwest Receivable Solutions, Peoples Gas Company and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02296
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendant Trans Union LLC only, without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/7/2019. (asni, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Trans Union LLC, Only by Angela Schumpert (Maxfield, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Nashiba Dawntay Finley Boyd on behalf of Peoples Gas Company (Boyd, Nashiba Dawntay)
September 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Hollins Lewis on behalf of Peoples Gas Company (Lewis, Regina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/4/2019, Fact Discovery due by 3/4/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/8/2020, Discovery due by 6/11/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 6/12/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/10/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/11/2020, Mediation Due by 2/18/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/23/2019. (asni, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Schumpert.(Maxfield, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Angela Schumpert. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendant Equifax Information Services LLC only, without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/5/2019. (asni, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Angela Schumpert (Maxfield, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Schumpert. Peoples Gas Company served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Peoples Gas, #2 Envelope Peoples Gas)(Maxfield, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angela Schumpert as to Midwest Receivable Solutions, Only (Maxfield, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/19/2019.(asni, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/10/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/19/2019. (asni, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/19/2019. (asni, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Trans Union ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Schumpert.(Maxfield, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Midwest Receivable Solutions, Only by Angela Schumpert (Maxfield, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(asni, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2019-CP-40-03775. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8615513), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Joinders in and Consent to Removal)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schumpert v. Peoples Gas Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Receivable Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples Gas Company
Represented By: Nashiba Dawntay Finley Boyd
Represented By: Regina Hollins Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Schumpert
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?