Chandler v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Shameeka Chandler
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv02327
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Case pending Arbitration. Counsel is requested to submit to the court a status report on or before April 10, 2020. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/10/19.(mflo, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hawk, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, October 8, 2019 at 10:00am before Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. The attorneys stated they are planning on arbitrating the case. (mflo, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, October 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 9/17/19. (mflo, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Hawk, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shameeka Chandler.(Maxfield, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Wells Fargo Bank NA answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Extension Confirmation)(Hawk, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(mflo, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8621630), filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameeka Chandler
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Shelton Sterling Laney, III
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Represented By: Jason David Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?