Alexander v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Derrick Alexander
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02493
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/26/2019, Fact Discovery Report due by 3/25/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/5/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/8/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/29/2020, Discovery due by 7/2/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 7/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/10/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/11/2020, Mediation Due by 3/9/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/16/2019. (asni, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Experian Information Solutions Inc(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Derrick Alexander.(Maxfield, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Michael Derrick Alexander(Maxfield, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Michael Derrick Alexander. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/26/2019. (asni, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Michael Derrick Alexander (Maxfield, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/11/2019. (asni, ) Modified to edit text on 9/16/2019 (asni, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/24/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/24/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/11/2019. (asni, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 10/11/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/11/2019.(asni, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Derrick Alexander.(Maxfield, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(asni, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kershaw County, case number 2019-CP-28-00816. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8650039), filed by Trans Union LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Derrick Alexander
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?