Conrad v. Charter Nex Films, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiffanney Conrad
Defendant: Charter Nex Films, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02497
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 11/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/28/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/27/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/27/2020, Discovery due by 4/27/2020, Motions due by 5/12/2020, ADR Statement due by 6/13/2020, Mediation Due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/30/2019. (lbak)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charter Nex Films, Inc..(Durban, Debbie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charter Nex Films, Inc..(Durban, Debbie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charter Nex Films, Inc.. (lbak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tiffanney Conrad. (lbak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Nex Films, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8651759.), filed by Tiffanney Conrad. Service due by 12/3/2019. (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Charter Nex Films, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Nex Films, Inc.
Represented By: Debbie Whittle Durban
Represented By: Sue Erwin Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanney Conrad
Represented By: Donald Gist
Represented By: Aaron Vernon Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?