South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Plaintiff: South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv02515
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2019 ; taking under advisement #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mflo, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2019 11:05 AM before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. Counsel shall initiate the conference call and once everyone is on the line please call 803-765-5136 to include Judge Anderson.(mflo, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . First attachment description: Plan of Correction . (Ballard, Desa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Stephen Lloyd re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental affidavit by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. (Ballard, Desa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.(Jordan, William)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response filed by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. (Ballard, Desa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2019 01:30 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for an Expedited Hearing. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/22/19.(mflo, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response filed by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Termination Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Health Insurance Benefits Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - 8/8/19 Survey Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - 9/4/19 Survey Report)(Jordan, William) Modified to edit text on 10/16/2019 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Expedite Response filed by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/10/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Jordan, William)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ballard, Desa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9. Reason: Document filed separately but should have been filed as attachments. Corrected Filing Document Number #8 . (cbru, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ballard, Desa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit Dr Lloyd, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit Anthony Elkins, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Benjamin Pinner, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Franklin Coulter, #6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Gerald Wilson, #7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of James Burch, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of John Adams, #9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Kadijah Jones, #10 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Min Kang, #11 Exhibit J - Affidavit Monnieque Singlton, #12 Exhibit K - Affidavit Scott Strayer, #13 Exhibit L - Affidavit Brenda Capps) (cbru, ). See #21 Supplemental Affidavit of Stephen Lloyd, M.D. (mflo, ). See #22 additional attachment.
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, filed by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. Service due by 12/30/2019 (Ballard, Desa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Board of Medical Examiners, #2 Exhibit B - Hulio Griffin email, #3 Verification) (cbru, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Jordan on behalf of Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (Jordan, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: From the Court's review of the complaint in this case #1 , it notes Plaintiff seeks, among other things, a preliminary injunction. The Court requires a request for a preliminary injunction be made via a motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/9/2019. (cbru, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney)(cbru, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC.(cbru, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654490) filed by South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC. Service due by 12/5/2019(cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 9/6/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/6/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #1 Verification) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Tina Marie Cundari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Medical Endoscopy LLC
Represented By: Desa A Ballard
Represented By: Harvey MacLure Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?