Bolton v. Transworld Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anitra Bolton
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc. and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv02553
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Transworld Systems Inc..(Burchstead, Michael) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/17/2019) (cbru, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: On October 8, 2019, the court entered a Text Order directing Defendant Transworld Systems Inc. to file a complete response to all subparts of Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C). ECF No. 11. Defendant has failed to do so. Defendant is directed to file a complete response to all subparts or, alternatively, to show cause why it should not be sanctioned for failure to comply, no later than October 21, 2019. (Supplement/Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/17/2019. (cbru, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Transworld Systems Inc.'s response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #10 is incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 10/11/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/8/2019. (cbru, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Transworld Systems Inc..(Burchstead, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/31/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/28/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/28/2020, Discovery due by 4/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 9/14/2020, Motions due by 5/8/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/5/2020, ADR Statement due by 6/8/2020, Mediation Due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/7/2019. (cbru, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant Transworld Systems Inc. is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than October 21, 2019. (cbru, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transworld Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aston Acquisition Corp for Transworld Systems Inc... (Burchstead, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Transworld Systems Inc..(Burchstead, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Transworld Systems Inc. (cbru, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anitra Bolton.(cbru, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, Transworld Systems Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8661151) filed by Anitra Bolton. Service due by 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collection Letter)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. Transworld Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc.
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anitra Bolton
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Norsworthy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?