South Carolina, The State of v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina, The State of
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02783
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Consent Motion to Stay Discovery as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/29/19.(alew, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,, , #19 MOTION to Stay Response filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Takoma Regional Hospital)(Lay, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by Cardinal Health Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Casey, Alice)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,, , #19 MOTION to Stay Response filed by South Carolina, The State of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Order Denying Stay-Spartanburg County, SC, #2 Exhibit B: Order Denying Stay-Greenville County, SC, #3 Exhibit C-: Order Denying Stay-Anderson County, SC, #4 Exhibit D: Order Denying Stay-Lexington County, SC, #5 Exhibit E: Compl. City of Charleston, SC Short Form & Second Amended Master Complaint, #6 Exhibit F: Complaint-City of North Charleston, SC, #7 Exhibit G: Tr. of Motion Hearing in State of New Hampshire (Nov. 6, 2017), #8 Exhibit H: Order Denying Stay-Worcester, MA, #9 Exhibit I: Order Denying Stay-Estate of Bruce Brockel Order, #10 Exhibit J: Order Denying Stay-Dallas County, TX, #11 Exhibit K: Order Denying Stay-Delta County, TX, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M: Order Denying Stay-Van Zandt County, T, #14 Exhibit N: Order Denying Stay-Brooke County Commission, VA, #15 Exhibit O: Order Denying Stay-Weber County, UT, #16 Exhibit P: Order Denying Stay-Uintah County, UT, #17 Exhibit Q: Order Denying Stay-Boston, MA, #18 Exhibit R: Order Denying Stay-Cambridge, MA, #19 Exhibit S: Order Denying Stay-El Monte, CA, #20 Exhibit T: Order Denying Stay-Mecklenburg County, VA 1, #21 Exhibit U: Order Denying Stay-Granite City, IL)(Saltzburg, Lisa) Modified on 10/22/2019 to add exhibit descriptions provided by filing user (alew, ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by South Carolina, The State of. (Saltzburg, Lisa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by McKesson Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PPV Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lori White, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cherokee & Lac Courte Orielles)(Lay, John)
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wisconsin Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - California Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arizona Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Portsmouth Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Kentucky Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Alameda Stay Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Portland, Maine Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - California Stay Order 2, #9 Exhibit 9 - Illinois Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Florida Deferral Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Delaware Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Osage, OK Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Pawnee, OK Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Int'l Union Stay Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Jenks Stay Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Seminole County, OK Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - EDVA Stay Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - WDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit 19 - Fauquier, VA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Prince William, VA Stay Order)No proposed order.(Lay, John)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,, by McKesson Corporation. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lay, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff The State of South Carolina has filed #7 Motion to Remand to State Court and #11 Motion for Expedited Consideration. The motion for expedited consideration is granted. The time to respond to the motion to remand is shortened to 10/16/19. The reply time to the response is shortened to 10/18/19. Defendants Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and AmericsourceBergen Drug Corporation (collectively Defendants) have filed #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The extension is granted. The time in which Defendants may respond to the complaint is enlarged until the later of 30 days after (1) the Court rules on the motion to remand, or (2) a determination by the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to the multidistrict litigation, In re Natl Prescription Opiate Litig., MDL No. 2804. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/11/19.(alew, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Unassigned - MDL no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Lee Austin on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Austin, Casey)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Inabinet, Jr on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Inabinet, George)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite by South Carolina, The State of. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Saltzburg, Lisa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by McKesson Corporation. Response to Motion due by 10/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lay, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Lewis Anna on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Anna, Rachael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Casey, Alice)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by South Carolina, The State of. Response to Motion due by 10/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)No proposed order.(Saltzburg, Lisa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Saltzburg on behalf of South Carolina, The State of (Saltzburg, Lisa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by McKesson Corporation.(asni, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by McKesson Corporation.(asni, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2019-CP-40-04521. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8697250), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Pleadings Part 1, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court Pleadings Part 2)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina, The State of v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Rachael Lewis Anna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jordan M Crapps
Represented By: John T Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Represented By: Casey Lee Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, The State of
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Schmutz
Represented By: Marlon E Kimpson
Represented By: Karl S Bowers, Jr
Represented By: George Craig Johnson
Represented By: Joseph F Rice
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Represented By: Rebecca Magill McCormack
Represented By: Jodi W Flowers
Represented By: Natalia Deyneka
Represented By: IS Leevy Johnson
Represented By: Clyde Havird Jones, Jr
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Jared Quante Libet
Represented By: James W Fayssoux, Jr
Represented By: Temitope Olamide Leyimu
Represented By: Lisa Marie Saltzburg
Represented By: Chantelle Lytle Neese
Represented By: Annemarie Belanger Mathews
Represented By: Rebecca McCormack Hartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?