Brazella Toney v. SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brazella Toney
Defendant: SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC, Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, South Carolina Holdco LLC and Proto Equity Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03226
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 12/12/2019. Case is subject to Arbitration; counsel to file motion to arbitrate. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Thursday, December 12, 2019 9:30 a.m. cancelled and rescheduled to: **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )(mflo, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/22/19. (mflo, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Holdco LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Proto Equity Holdings LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC.(Davis, Donald)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brazella Toney.(Feidler, Stefan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Holdco LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Proto Equity Holdings LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC.(mflo, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-43-2062. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8778568), filed by SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Receipt of Removal, #3 Consent to Removal Proto Equity, #4 Consent to Removal SSC Equity Holdings, #5 Consent to Removal Savasenior Care, #6 Consent to Removal Master Tenant Parent, #7 Consent to Removal SC HoldCo)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazella Toney v. SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Sumter East Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Holdco LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proto Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brazella Toney
Represented By: Stefan B Feidler
Represented By: Eric Poulin
Represented By: Roy T Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?