South Carolina Democratic Party et al v. Andino et al
Plaintiff: DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party and DCCC
Defendant: Clifford J Edler, Scott Moseley, Marci Andino, Harold E Faust and John Wells
Case Number: 3:2019cv03308
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed and Voluntary by DCCC, DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party. Response to Motion due by 1/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bryant, Christopher)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 Letter from South Carolina Solicitor General. (Kirkland, Harley)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, All Defendants answer due 1/28/2020. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/3/2020.(asni, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marci Andino, Clifford J Edler, Harold E Faust, Scott Moseley, John Wells. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hunter, Thomas) (Main Document 21 replaced on 1/3/2020) (asni, ). Modified to correct case number and year of extension request on 1/3/2020 (asni, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Parkin C Hunter on behalf of Marci Andino, Clifford J Edler, Harold E Faust, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Hunter, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Harley Littleton Kirkland on behalf of Marci Andino, Clifford J Edler, Harold E Faust, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Kirkland, Harley)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marci Andino, Clifford J Edler, Harold E Faust, Scott Moseley, John Wells.(Kirkland, Harley)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/3/2019.(asni, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth C. Frost ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8804122) by DCCC, DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party. Response to Motion due by 12/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application and Certificates of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/26/2019.(asni, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christina Ashley Ford ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8799178) by DCCC, DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/26/2019.(asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Erik Elias ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8796818) by DCCC, DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bryant, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DSCC. (Bryant, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCCC. (Bryant, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Carolina Democratic Party. (Bryant, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by DCCC, DSCC, South Carolina Democratic Party.(asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Wells. (asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Scott Moseley. (asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harold E Faust. (asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clifford J Edler. (asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marci Andino. (asni, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8794752.), filed by South Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC, DCCC. Service due by 2/24/2020(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina Democratic Party et al v. Andino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J Edler
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moseley
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Andino
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold E Faust
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wells
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: Elizabeth C Frost
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Democratic Party
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: Elizabeth C Frost
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Christopher James Bryant
Represented By: Elizabeth C Frost
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?