Sims v. Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Henry N. Sims
Defendant: Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald and Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv03513
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
2 Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 1/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Discovery due by 7/16/2020, Motions due by 7/31/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/20/2019. (bgoo)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald.(Thompson, Charles)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry N. Sims.(Dickey, Joseph)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald. (lbak)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Lexington Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-03415. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834391), filed by Connie Billings, Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Wallace Oswald. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of
Represented By: Charles F Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Malone
Represented By: Lake E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Billings
Represented By: Charles F Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Malone
Represented By: Lake E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Oswald
Represented By: Charles F Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Malone
Represented By: Lake E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department
Represented By: Charles F Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael D Malone
Represented By: Lake E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry N. Sims
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?