Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 3:2020av99999
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 99:9999
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 2004 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Patricia G. Blume vs Alex M. Azar, II Court Name: Bamberg Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Newman, Christie)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2003 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Stephen Foster Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9419997). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2002 COMPLAINT Karen Thompson Schnibbe vs Andrew M. Saul, Comm. of Social Security Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Waive of Filing Fee)Jung, William) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03678 DCN JDA
October 20, 2020 Filing 2001 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Ron Joseph Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9419886). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2000 COMPLAINT Terrell Smith vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03679 MGL JDA
October 20, 2020 Filing 1999 COMPLAINT Columbia Casualty Company vs McCabe Trotter & Beverly, PC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9419339). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint - Richardson Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. B to Complaint - Aubrey Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex. C to Complaint - Park Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex. D to Complaint - Allison Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex. E to Complaint - Boyce Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex. F to Complaint - 15-16 Policy, #10 Exhibit Ex. G to Complaint - 16-17 Policy, #11 Exhibit Ex. H to Complaint - Brief in Supp. of Plaintiff's Class Cert.)Aiken, Jefferson)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1998 COMPLAINT Ashley Nicole Kelly vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03676 MGL KDW
October 20, 2020 Filing 1997 COMPLAINT Michael Ben King vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03674 MGL KDW
October 20, 2020 Filing 1996 COMPLAINT Ertavia Wilson vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Addendum Consent to Magistrate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Addendum Informa Pauperis)Dunn, Geoff) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03675 RMG MGB
October 20, 2020 Filing 1995 COMPLAINT Reco Aturris Harris vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 10/20/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03673 JMC TER
October 19, 2020 Filing 1994 COMPLAINT Justice 360 vs Bryan P. Stirling, Director of the South Carolina Department of Corrections Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9416358). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Bryan Stirling of 09/01/2020, #2 Exhibit Response from Bryant Stirling of 09-29-2020, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Summons Summons to Bryan Stirling, #6 Summons Summons to Alan Wilson)Kassel, John) Modified on 10/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3671-MGL.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1993 COMPLAINT Arthuretta Barber vs National Auto Lenders Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9416339). (Attachments: #1 Summons National Auto Lenders, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Maxfield, David) Modified on 10/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3670-TMC.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1992 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Elisa Ashby (Arrington) vs Arthur Cooksey Court Name: Union County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9415117). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Arthur Cooksey, #4 Supporting Documents Federal Coversheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)DuRant, Bess) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3662-BHH-JDA.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1991 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Krystal Pruitt vs Frederick L. Pannier Court Name: Spartanburg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414701). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Spartanburg County Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories)Whelan, Robert) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3661-TMC.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1990 COMPLAINT Deonta L. Brinston vs City of Easley Greenwood/Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414568). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K9s at Council, #2 Exhibit B - Lu and tay pix, #3 Exhibit C - Employee Roster, #4 Exhibit D - Miller's Harrassment of Co-Worker, #5 Exhibit E - Easley Pay Plan, #6 Exhibit F - Team 4 Convo, #7 Exhibit G - Miller made K9 Coordinator, #8 Exhibit H - K9 Lu Recert, #9 Exhibit I - Miller's Policy Violations, #10 Exhibit J - 9/15/2020 email to Brian James, Esq, #11 Exhibit K - Texts with Chief Byers, #12 Exhibit L - 9/15/2020 email to Brian James, Esq., #13 Exhibit M - email to James, #14 Exhibit Ex N - email from James, #15 Exhibit Ex O - recording policy, #16 Exhibit Ex P - Mayors Charges, #17 Exhibit Ex Q - Carr's porn photo, #18 Exhibit Ex R - Tollison petting Lu, #19 Exhibit S - Dutton Declaration, #20 Exhibit T - Litigation Hold Letter, #21 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification, #22 LR 26.01 Answers, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons Byers, #25 Summons City, #26 Summons JD Actors, #27 Summons Miller)Kern, Candy) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3660-BHH-JDA.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1989 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jack Bodmer vs Schindler Elevator Corporation Court Name: South Carolina Court of Common Pleas County of Horry ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414417). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Stuckey, Erin) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3659-SAL.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1988 COMPLAINT William Carpenella vs Blackbaud, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414314). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Summons)Flowers, Jodi) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3658-RMG.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1987 COMPLAINT Defenders of Wildlife vs U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414049). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Lease Feb. 21, 1991, #2 Exhibit B. Conservation Plan Oct. 2010, #3 Exhibit C. Dawsey Letter Nov. 12, 2015, #4 Exhibit D. Marsh Island Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E. Dawsey Letter Apr. 19, 2016, #6 Exhibit F. Dawsey Letter May 12, 2014, #7 Exhibit G. Wagner Letter June 17, 2014, #8 Exhibit H. Wagner Letter May 20, 2014, #9 Exhibit I. Special Use Application and Permit May 15, 2014)Wannamaker, Catherine) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3657-BHH.
October 19, 2020 Filing 1986 COMPLAINT Kimberly Clark vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9414220). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/19/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03656 DCN PJG
October 19, 2020 Filing 1985 COMPLAINT Joseph Maness vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/19/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03664 DCC SVH
October 18, 2020 Filing 1984 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit March 30, 2020 Letter from M. Andino, #3 Exhibit Commission Election Timeline, #4 Exhibit Commission Website - New Absentee Rules, #5 Exhibit Shernoff Decl. in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit NCSL Website Table)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3654-JMC.
October 18, 2020 Filing 1983 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff. (Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3654-JMC.
October 18, 2020 Filing 1982 COMPLAINT JoAnn Shernoff vs Marci Andino, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the South Carolina State Election Commission Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412989). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons - Marci Andino, #3 Summons Proposed Summons - Howard M. Knapp, #4 Summons Proposed Summons - John Wells, #5 Summons Proposed Summons - JoAnne Day, #6 Summons Proposed Summons - Clifford J. Edler, #7 Summons Proposed Summons - Linda McCall, #8 Summons Proposed Summons - Scott Moseley)Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3654-JMC.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1981 COMPLAINT Alphonso Hammett vs Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412800). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Cohoon, Jack) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3655-SAL-KDW.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1980 COMPLAINT Omesshia Grant vs United States Postal Service Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412769). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Ricker, Brice) Modified on 10/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3652-MGL.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1979 COMPLAINT SC Botanicals, LLC vs Intragenix Holdings, LLC Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412611). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 LR 26.01 Answers)Dennis, Edward) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3650-HMH.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1978 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Axis Routing and Manufacturing, Inc. vs New CNC Court Name: Lexington County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412593). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Corporate Disclosure Statement)Lay, John) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3649-SAL.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1977 COMPLAINT Angela Davis Johnson vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 10/16/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03636 JMC MHC
October 16, 2020 Filing 1976 COMPLAINT Clifford Smith vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 10/16/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03635 BHH MHC
October 16, 2020 Filing 1975 COMPLAINT Margaret Welch vs Johnson & Johnson Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9411874). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Scott, Carmen) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3632-MDL.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1974 COMPLAINT Ashley N. Buenting vs Johnson & Johnson Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9411593). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Scott, Carmen) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3631-MDL.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1973 COMPLAINT Ansley Cliff vs United of Omaha Life Insurance Company Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9411093). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Shutt, Nekki) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3628-MGL.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1972 COMPLAINT Cristal Lyons vs FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Short Term Disability Plan Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9411082). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3627-BHH.
October 16, 2020 Filing 1971 COMPLAINT Chad Robinson vs Kevin Ford Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9410731). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Teresa Benson, #4 Summons Tiffany Campbell, #5 Summons Samuel Dalton, #6 Summons Derek Danley, #7 Summons Matthew Davis, #8 Summons Johnny Eury, #9 Summons Kevin Ford, #10 Summons Dorot Funderburk, #11 Summons Wendel Goodwin, #12 Summons Robbie Hughes, #13 Summons Edward Hunter, #14 Summons James Jefferson, #15 Summons Gregory McCoy, #16 Summons Trionda Mungo, #17 Summons Richard Pittman, Jr., #18 Summons Ramon Sears, #19 Summons Lester Small, #20 Summons Joseph Stinnett)Elliott, Charles) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3626-JMC-JDA.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1970 COMPLAINT Darren Glenn Barnhart vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3625-RMG-KDW.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1969 COMPLAINT United States of America vs Wright and Sons Farm Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Legal Description, #2 Exhibit 2, Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit 3, Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit 4, Mortgages, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Supporting Documents, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Ryan, Katherine) Modified on 10/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3624-DCN.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1968 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $25,020.00 in United States Currency Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Agent Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in Rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3623-DCN.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1967 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Dennis Ludvik Germovsek vs USAA General Indemnity Company Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9409504). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Amended Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Proof of Service on USAA General Indemnity Co., #4 Exhibit D Proof of Service on MGA Insurance Co., #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers)Blackburn, Charles) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3622-SAL.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1966 COMPLAINT United States of America vs Oliver J. Wright, Sr. Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Legal Description, #2 Exhibit 2, Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit 3, Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit 4, Mortgages, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Supporting Documents lis pendens, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)Ryan, Katherine) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3621-DCN.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1965 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Patricia Anne Pizer vs City of Rock Hill Court Name: York County Civil Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9409657). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant Rock Hill, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant Hernandez, #5 Certificate of Service)Morrison, David) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3620-JMC-SVH.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1964 COMPLAINT Charles Watson vs Cook Incorporated Anderson Division. Jury Trail Demanded ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9408934). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons for Defendants Cook Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC, #4 Summons for Defendant William Cook Europe, APS)Burke, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3614-MDL.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1963 COMPLAINT Catherine B. Hovis vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9408294). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3611-MBS.
October 15, 2020 Filing 1962 COMPLAINT Monica Bennett vs Smoke on the Creek, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9408079). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Summons Summons as to Smoke on the Creek, LLC, #3 Summons Summons as to Peter Woodman, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Hamilton Cawley, Molly) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3610-BHH.
October 14, 2020 Filing 1961 COMPLAINT Bruce Wayne Sexton vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/15/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03608 TMC KFM
October 14, 2020 Filing 1960 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Midge Duncan vs Costco Wholesale Corporation Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, Horry County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9406903). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B-proposed Stipulation as to Damages, #3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's demand letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers, #6 Supporting Documents, #7 Supporting Documents)Kinney, Charles) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03605 SAL
October 14, 2020 Filing 1959 COMPLAINT Aaron Jon Barber vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9406729). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Mayes, W) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03603 DCC PJG
October 14, 2020 Filing 1958 COMPLAINT Auto-Owners Insurance Company vs Robert J. O'Neill Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9406678). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibi A - Policies, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Paulick.Letter to AO sending Amended Order of Judgement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Disclosures)Templeton, Morgan) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03602 BHH
October 14, 2020 Filing 1957 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Casey A. Roach vs Samuel W. White Sheriff of Union County Court Name: Union County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9406037). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)Davis, Carly) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 7:20-cv-03601 DCC KFM
October 14, 2020 Filing 1956 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Skip Dawson Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9406040). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons S&S, #4 Summons Dawson)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03600 BHH
October 14, 2020 Filing 1955 COMPLAINT Central Mutual Insurance Company vs Royal Homes of S.C., Inc. CHARLESTON Division. (Insurance Coverage Declaratory Judgment Action) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9405966). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2005-2006 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2006-2007 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - 2007-2008 Policy, #4 Exhibit D - 2008-2009 Policy, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Fourth Amended Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 LR 26.01 Answers, #8 Rule 7.1, FRCivP, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #9 Summons Claude "Jim" Gallagher, #10 Summons Royal Homes, #11 Summons The Retreat at Charleston National Home Owners Association, Inc., #12 Summons The Retreat at Charleston National Horizontal Property Regime)Groves, Stephen) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3599-RMG.
October 14, 2020 Filing 1954 COMPLAINT James Graves vs Ryan D. McCarthy, in his Official Capacity, as Secretary, Department of the Army Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9405099). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Brooks, Charles) Modified on 10/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3609-JMC-SVH.
October 14, 2020 Filing 1953 COMPLAINT Carlton Simons vs BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9404510). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3597-BHH.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1952 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Eric Lawson vs Beaufort County and Ashley Jacobs Court Name: Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9403976). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Aydlette, D L) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3596-BHH-MGB.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1951 COMPLAINT Flecker vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03595 JMC SVH
October 13, 2020 Filing 1950 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Madgia Ames vs Prisma Health Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9402822). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Parham, James) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3594-MGL.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1949 COMPLAINT Amy E. Stubbs vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #2 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03606 MGL KFM
October 13, 2020 Filing 1948 COMPLAINT Barbara Michelle Kay vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Bramhall, Evan) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03592 RMG PJG
October 13, 2020 Filing 1947 COMPLAINT Jordan R. Hurt vs Trans Union, LLC Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9402248). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Bland, Chauntel) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3591-HMH.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1946 COMPLAINT David McAlister vs Graphics Now, Inc. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9401918). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, Brian) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3589-DCC.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1945 COMPLAINT Sharon Schronce vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03586 TLW JDA
October 13, 2020 Filing 1944 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Duke O'Neil Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9401658). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Capstone, #4 Summons O'Neil)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3588-BHH.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1943 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs John Marques Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9401623). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Lifeline, #4 Summons Marques)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3587-BHH.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1942 COMPLAINT Great West Casualty Company vs Sheila Scott Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9401524). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Policy), #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit List of Defendants and Addresses, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Moseley, Robert) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3585-SAL.
October 13, 2020 Filing 1941 COMPLAINT Terri L. Thompson vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03584 SAL KDW
October 12, 2020 Filing 1940 COMPLAINT Gibbs International, Inc, vs Savino Del Bene U.S.A, Inc. Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9400659). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- BPX Logistics Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Summons- BPX Express, #5 Summons- BPX Logistics, #6 Summons- Savino Del Bene USA)English, Gregory) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3583-TMC.
October 12, 2020 Filing 1939 COMPLAINT EVELYN SEVERIN vs STOBA USA CORPORATION Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9400585). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Responses)Lewis, Timothy) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3582-DCN.
October 12, 2020 Filing 1938 COMPLAINT Sametrian Geddis, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for the minor child, B G., JR a minor under the age of 11 years vs United States Department of the Air Force Joint Base Charleston Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9400545). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Proposed Order Order appointing GAL, #5 Proposed Order Petition for appt of GAL)Ling, Gary) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3581-RMG.
October 12, 2020 Filing 1937 COMPLAINT Sondra Rogers vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03575 RBH SVH
October 12, 2020 Filing 1936 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Angela Butler vs Frito-Lay North America, Inc. Court Name: Aiken County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9400379). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Coversheet, #2 State Court Documents Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Whitley, Joshua) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3580-CMC.
October 12, 2020 Filing 1935 COMPLAINT Emery Gowens vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03574 MGL SVH
October 12, 2020 Filing 1934 COMPLAINT Tammy Hill vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03573 MGL MGB
October 9, 2020 Filing 1933 NOTICE OF REMOVAL City of Charleston vs Brabham Oil Company Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, County of Charleston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399788). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1_2020.09.09 Charleston Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2_LongInactive Oilfield Is Open for Now - The New York Times, #4 Exhibit 3_Elk Hills Reserve Oil Will Flow Again - The New York Times, #5 Exhibit 4_Lease (1), #6 Exhibit 5_Lease (2), #7 Exhibit 6_Lease (3), #8 Exhibit 7_Lease (4), #9 Exhibit 8_1946 03 02 Elk Hills Report, #10 Exhibit 9_121 Cong. Rec. S903-11 (Jan. 27, 1975), #11 Exhibit 10_12_H.R. Doc. No. 93-406 (1974), #12 Exhibit 11_G.S. Callendar, THE ARTIFICIAL PRODUCTION OF CARBON DIOXIDE AND ITS INFLUENCE ON TEMPERATURE, February 16, 1938, #13 Exhibit 12_W.K., How Industry May Change Climate, N.Y. Times (May 24, 1953), #14 Exhibit 13_Time Magazine, Invisible Blanket (May 25, 1953), #15 Exhibit 14_Washington Post, Industrial Gases Warming Up Earth, Physicist Notes Here (May 5, 1953), #16 Exhibit 15_1957 12 08 Teller Sees World Flooding Peril (Wash Post) A1, #17 Exhibit 16_Second Supplemental Appropriation Bill, 1956, #18 Exhibit 17_Daniel P. Moynihan, Memorandum (Sept. 17, 1969), #19 Exhibit 18_IPCC (1990) at 254, #20 Exhibit 19_IPCC (1995) at 22, #21 Exhibit 20_IPCC (2001) at 10, #22 Exhibit 21_U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Guide to Climate Change, #23 Exhibit 22_Gulf of Mex. Region, Prod. by Operator Ranked by Vol., #24 Exhibit 23_Hearings Before The Comm on Naval Affs of the House of Repres on Estimates Submitted by the Sec. of the Navy (1915), #25 Exhibit 24_Yergin_The Prize, #26 Exhibit 25_Hakes_Declaration of Energy Independence, #27 Exhibit 26_H.R. Rep. 95-590, #28 Exhibit 27_HCRCHCVX_0372_00001053, #29 Exhibit 28_Grey Bowers Ltr HCRCHCVX_0372_00012670, #30 Exhibit 29_Dear Operator Ltr from L. Denett (Dec 14, 1999), #31 Exhibit 30_US Dept of the Interior_Minerals Management Service (May 31, 2007), #32 Exhibit 31_History of the Petroleum Administration for War 1941-1945 (excerpts), #33 Exhibit 32_TX-76, #34 Exhibit 33_Certificate of Dissolution of War Emergency Pipelines, Inc. (Aug. 28, 1947), #35 Exhibit 34_4th Annual Rpt of the Activities of the Jt Comtt on Defense Prod at 122 (Jan 5, 1955}, #36 Exhibit 35_24_annual_rept, #37 Exhibit 36_S.J. Res. 176_Naval Petroleum Reserve Numbered 1, Elk Hills, Calif, #38 Exhibit 37_FUEL IS DIVERTED FOR THE MILITARY - The New York Times, #39 Exhibit 38_Gregory W. Pedlow & Donald E. Welzenbach, The Central Intelligence Agency and Overhead Reconnaissance, #40 Exhibit 39_CIA Doc. No. CIA-RDP90B00170R000100080001-5 (Aug 3, 1981), #41 Exhibit 40_1994 Rich, Lockheed Skunk Works, #42 Exhibit 41_CIA Doc No. CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400016-2, Contract No. AF33(657)-8577 (SH-511) (Aug. 14, 1962), #43 Exhibit 42_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400012-6, #44 Exhibit 43_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440005-0, #45 Exhibit 44_CIA RDP67B00074R000500450004-0, #46 Exhibit 45_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440006-9, #47 Exhibit 46_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500430003-3, #48 Exhibit 47_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500420006-1, #49 Exhibit 48_CIA-RDP67B00074R000500410006-2, #50 Exhibit 49_CIA-RDP63-00313A000500130031-9, #51 Exhibit 50_Detail Specification Turbine Fuels, Aviation, Kerosene Types, #52 Exhibit 51_Engg Circ 1105-2-186, #53 Exhibit 52_ETL_1100, #54 Exhibit 53 Cong. Rec. S1157-65 (daily ed. Feb. 9, 2005) (statement of Sen. Mark Pryor), #55 Exhibit 54_House Report No. 94-1084 Part 1, #56 Exhibit 55_1942-08-12; Discipline for Non-Compliant Refiners, #57 Exhibit 56_Aircraft Fuels & Propellants, Rpt for the Army Air Force Scientific Advisory Group EXCERPT, #58 Exhibit 57_Military Aviation and the Environment Historical Trends and Comparison to Civil Aviation, #59 Exhibit 58_ Coordinating Research Councils Handbook of Aviation Fuel Properties EXCERPT, #60 Exhibit 59_1941-08-11; Ickes Davis Speech Transcript of Meeting (excerpt), #61 Exhibit 60_2020-10-08 Tesoro Contract RFP Exhibit Table (003), #62 Exhibit 61_1953.05.05.Charleston News and Courier, #63 Exhibit 62_1959.05.30.Charleston evening Post, #64 Exhibit 63_History of Naval Petroleum Reserve No. 1 HCRCHCVX_0372_00019359, #65 Exhibit 64_(Charleston)_Growing Blanket of Carbon Dioxide Raises Earths Temperature _ Modern Mechan, #66 Exhibit 65_(Charleston)_Dept of Defenses Handbook Aerospace Fuels Certification, MIL-HDBK-510A EXCERPT, #67 Certificate of Service, #68 Declaration of Joshua Dick in Support of Notice of Removal, #69 LR 26.01 Answers, #70 Civil Cover Sheet)Smith, Joel) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3579-BHH.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1932 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Aaron McCall vs Levan Chabradze Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399592). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Chase, Gerald) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3572-CMC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1931 COMPLAINT Glenda Gause vs Andrew M. Saul Civil Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399325). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed Summons)Leiter, John) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03578 DCC KFM
October 9, 2020 Filing 1930 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mohammad Nathaniel Wilson vs Berkeley County Court Name: Berkeley County in South Carolina State Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399034). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Ganes, Elloree) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3567-BHH-MGB.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1929 COMPLAINT Tonya Rice for JC vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/9/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03564 JMC TER
October 9, 2020 Filing 1927 COMPLAINT Robert F. Anderson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the bankruptcy estates of Grinding Specialists, LLC and Grinding Specialists of the Carolinas, LLC vs Prosperity Jockey Lot, Inc. Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9398595). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Poston, Brandon) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3565-TMC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1926 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Gregory T. Gardziola vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9398582). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit DOI Service Letter, #5 Exhibit NEF)Hawk, John) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3563-DCC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1925 COMPLAINT Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company vs Sheila Denise Lebron Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9398417). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit POI, #8 Exhibit Booklet Certificate, #9 Exhibit Death Certificate, #10 Exhibit Enrollment & Beneficiary Info, #11 Exhibit Employers Statement, #12 Exhibit Udpated Employers Statement, #13 Exhibit Arrest Warrant, #14 Exhibit 4.13.20 letter, #15 Exhibit 5.5.20 letter, #16 Exhibit Certificate of Appointment, #17 Exhibit Estate Claims Forms)Hawk, John) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3561-DCC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1924 COMPLAINT Angela Hathaway vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/9/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03562 MGL MGB
October 9, 2020 Filing 1923 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $15,020.00 in United States Currency Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in Rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3560-TMC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1922 COMPLAINT Patricia A. Johnson vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9397865). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3559-DCC.
October 9, 2020 Filing 1921 COMPLAINT Calvin M. Jones vs Unum Life Insurance Company of America Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9397864). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3558-TMC.
October 8, 2020 Filing 1920 COMPLAINT Johnnie L. Behlin III, vs DOLGENCORP,LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9397449). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Dolgencorp, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Gambrell, Brian) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3557-MGL.
October 8, 2020 Filing 1919 COMPLAINT Jermaine Antonio Evans vs Commissioner of Social Security Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9397300). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Valtorta, Laura) Modified on 10/8/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03556 TMC PJG
October 8, 2020 Filing 1918 COMPLAINT Harrison vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 10/8/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03555 DCC KDW
October 8, 2020 Filing 1917 COMPLAINT Heather Zeitlin vs OWU, LLC f/k/a Carolina Center for Occupational Health, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9396657). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Tong, Emily) Modified on 10/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3553-DCN-MGB.
October 8, 2020 Filing 1916 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Peter vonLehe Ruegner vs Sun Pet, LTD Court Name: Court of Common Pleas of Dorchester County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9395369). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Moore, Julie) Modified on 10/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3549-RMG-MGB.
October 8, 2020 Filing 1915 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Heather Miller vs NHC Healthcare/Bluffton, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas 14th Judicial Circuit ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9395421). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to L.R. 26.01 Interrogatories)Gray, Kristin) Modified on 10/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3547-DCN-MHC.
October 7, 2020 Filing 1914 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Marc G. Cherisien vs Darel Eugene Coen Court Name: Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9394453). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service)Grantland, John) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3544-RMG.
October 7, 2020 Filing 1913 COMPLAINT Roy Gidron vs United States of America Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9393679). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons proposed summons)Ness, Adam) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3539-MBS.
October 7, 2020 Filing 1912 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Paula Campbell vs Anesthesia Management Solutions, LLC Court Name: Orangeburg County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9393099). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Spence, Melissa) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3538-JMC-TER.
October 7, 2020 Filing 1911 COMPLAINT Pamela Stacy vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/7/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03536 BHH SVH
October 7, 2020 Filing 1910 COMPLAINT Janet B. Haigler, Chapter 7 Trustee for Callahan Grading, LLC vs Matthew Gaines Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9392704). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Poston, Brandon) Modified on 10/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3546-TMC.
October 7, 2020 Filing 1909 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Lesa Grayson, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Grayson vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Court Name: Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9392502). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MetLife's Answer to Complaint, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service)Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3535-MBS.
October 6, 2020 Filing 1908 COMPLAINT ERIC MANDEL, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated vs BLACKBAUD, INC., a South Carolina Resident Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9391872). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Ulmer, Frank) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3534-RMG.
October 6, 2020 Filing 1907 COMPLAINT Melissa Bailey vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Laurens Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03533 TMC JDA
October 6, 2020 Filing 1906 COMPLAINT Ashley Wood vs AnMed Health Medical Plan Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9391061). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 10/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3532-HMH.
October 6, 2020 Filing 1905 COMPLAINT Mildred Hayden Dougherty vs Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9390934). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Defendant Johnson & Johnson Company, #4 Summons Defendant Janssen Ortho LLC, #5 Summons Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons Defendant Janssen Research & Development LLC, #7 Summons Defendant Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #8 Summons Defendant Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc., #9 Summons Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.)Burke, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3531-DCN.
October 6, 2020 Filing 1904 COMPLAINT Barbara A. Hamberry vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Due West Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03527 RMG TER
October 6, 2020 Filing 1903 COMPLAINT Renatta F.Evans vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03526 RMG MHC
October 6, 2020 Filing 1902 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Gizelle K. Cooper vs Florence County Sheriff's Department Court Name: Court of Commons Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9389466). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Roggs Resps, #4 Supporting Documents Answer to Complaint)Gibson, Shauna) Modified on 10/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3530-SAL-KDW.
October 6, 2020 Filing 1901 COMPLAINT Debra Vick vs Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9388490). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 10/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3519-HMH.
October 5, 2020 Filing 1900 COMPLAINT Anice M. Carr vs The Charleston Market, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9387851). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Wigger, Jarrel) Modified on 10/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3517-RMG-MGB.
October 5, 2020 Filing 1899 COMPLAINT Terri Amanda Boyd vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03516 DCN MHC
October 5, 2020 Filing 1898 COMPLAINT Kenneth Lee Hardy vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03514 SAL KFM
October 5, 2020 Filing 1897 COMPLAINT Duffie Alexander vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03513 MGL TER
October 5, 2020 Filing 1896 COMPLAINT Tina Denise Saunders vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA SC Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Duggan, John) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03512 BHH MHC
October 5, 2020 Filing 1895 COMPLAINT Dianna Marie Hirl vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA SC Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Hughes, Daniel) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03509 TMC TER
October 5, 2020 Filing 1894 COMPLAINT Sarah Paris vs Walmart Stores East, LP District of South Carolina Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9386293). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Fargnoli, Christina) Modified on 10/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3508-TMC.
October 5, 2020 Filing 1893 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Judith Franklin vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Court Name: Orangeburg Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9385909). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Joe Doe Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Norris, Charles) Modified on 10/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3507-JMC.
October 2, 2020 Filing 1892 COMPLAINT The League of WOmen Voters of South Carolina vs Marci Andino Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9384825). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Intial interrogatory answers, #3 Summons Summons for Andino, #4 Summons Summons for Day, #5 Summons Summons for Elder, #6 Summons Summons for Knapp, #7 Summons Summons for McCall, #8 Summons Summons for Moseley, #9 Summons Summons for Wells)Dunn, Susan) Modified on 10/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3537-JMC.
October 2, 2020 Filing 1891 COMPLAINT Darlene Green vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03505 TMC KDW
October 2, 2020 Filing 1890 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brett Bursley, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jack Cohoon)No proposed order.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mnas). 3:20-3503-MGL
October 2, 2020 Filing 1889 COMPLAINT Savage vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03504 MBS PJG
October 2, 2020 Filing 1888 COMPLAINT South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund vs Marci Andino Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9384459). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clifford J. Edler, #3 Summons Joanne Day, #4 Summons John Wells, #5 Summons Linda McCall, #6 Summons Marci Andino, #7 Summons Scott Mosley, #8 LR 26.01 Answers)Cohoon, Jack) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mna). 3:20-3503-MGL
October 2, 2020 Filing 1887 COMPLAINT Wando River Marina, LLC vs The Murkin Group, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9383033). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Westbrook, Edward) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03501 BHH
October 2, 2020 Filing 1886 COMPLAINT Atain Specialty Insurance Company vs HJ Stucco, LLC Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9382536). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Complaint in Underlying Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Cross Claim in Underlying Action, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Subcontractor Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Atain Policy 2017-2018, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Atain Policy 2018-2019, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 LR 26.01 Answers, #8 Summons to HJ Stucco, LLC, #9 Summons to Heladio Jiminez, #10 Summons to Nix Construction Company, Inc., #11 Summons to Jason Bullock, #12 Summons to Cindy Bullock)Humphries, Christina) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03498 RMG
October 2, 2020 Filing 1885 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Felicia Pyles vs ZF North America, Inc. Court Name: State Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9382622). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal (State), #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Evert, Jill) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03497 BHH
October 2, 2020 Filing 1884 COMPLAINT Stacey Darlene Poole vs Black, Slaughter & Black Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9382579). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Summons Summons to Black, Slaughter & Black, #3 Exhibit 1. Notice of Hearing, #4 Exhibit 2. Email to David Wilson, #5 Exhibit 3. Reply Email of David Wilson, #6 Exhibit 4. Second Notice of Hearing)Gambrell, Brian) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03499 TLW
October 2, 2020 Filing 1883 COMPLAINT Christopher T. Dotson vs United of Omaha Life Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9382394). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03496 BHH
October 1, 2020 Filing 1882 COMPLAINT Coleman Michael Sams vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03495 RMG SVH
October 1, 2020 Filing 1881 COMPLAINT Sherard Perry vs M. Harrison Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9382130). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to Court's Interrogatories Pursuant to Rule 26.01, #3 Summons Summons)Mills, J) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03494 HMH KFM
October 1, 2020 Filing 1880 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tehila, LLC vs Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Court Name: Horry County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9381920). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Filings)Ralephata, Nosizi) Modified on 10/2/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03500 SAL
October 1, 2020 Filing 1879 COMPLAINT Agostina Perticari vs Roper St. Francis Healthcare Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9381771). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Wigger, Jarrel) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03493 BHH MHC
October 1, 2020 Filing 1878 COMPLAINT EMILY TRANDEM on behalf of Minor Child, PT, and all others similarly situated vs BLACKBAUD, INC., a South Carolina Resident Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9380629). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Ulmer, Frank) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03487 RMG
October 1, 2020 Filing 1877 COMPLAINT Jaylin A. Joseph vs New-Indy Catawba, LLC Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9380022). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Clark, Pheobe) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03485 MGL KDW
October 1, 2020 Filing 1876 COMPLAINT Cortney Samples vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Clinton Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03483 SAL SVH
October 1, 2020 Filing 1875 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Diesha Washington vs Life Insurance Company of North America Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9379454). (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Appendix 2 - Notice of Filing Removal to the United States District Court of South Carolina, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Defendant's Responses to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #5 Defendant's Answer)Shuler, Franklin) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3482-HMH.
October 1, 2020 Filing 1874 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Luther Rembert Baker vs US Foods, Inc. Court Name: Greenville County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9379284). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Yount, Adam) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03477 TMC JDA
September 30, 2020 Filing 1873 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1862 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: Civil Cover Sheet Second attachment description: Answers to Interrogatories. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)(Anderson, Jonathan) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3497-DCN-MHC. Please see ECF No. #1862 for main documents.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1871 COMPLAINT Gordon Parke vs Daiquan Lockwood Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378275). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Brown, #4 Summons to Lockwood)Jessee, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3476-RMG.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1870 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jill Golod vs The Standard Insurance Company Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378179). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer)Hedgepath, James) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03472 DCN
September 30, 2020 Filing 1869 NOTICE OF REMOVAL SIDNEY LYLES vs ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY Court Name: In the Court of Common Pleas for the Fifth Judicial Circuit, State of South Carolina, County of Richland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378116). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Wes Porter, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court Notion of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Hishamunda, Honore) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-03473 MGL
September 30, 2020 Filing 1868 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Hazel Duncan vs NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing Court Name: Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378095). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers US Bank's Corporate Disclosures, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Shellpoint Corporate Disclosures)Milam, G) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03474 TMC
September 30, 2020 Filing 1867 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Clifford Jones vs Allura USA LLC Court Name: Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378026). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process)Buckley, Edward) Modified on 10/1/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03492 DCN
September 30, 2020 Filing 1866 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jennifer Jamieson vs John Harris, Jr. Court Name: Richland County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377950). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Removal, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Garfield, Robert) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3475-JMC-SVH.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1865 COMPLAINT Migdalia Lopez vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377884). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03470 DCN KFM
September 30, 2020 Filing 1864 COMPLAINT Sheree Letish Boggs vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC denial, #2 Summons, #3 Financial Certificate, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Powers, Michelle) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03471 SAL MHC
September 30, 2020 Filing 1863 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Rodile Bessamra vs Genji Retail Support, Inc. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas for Charleston County, South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377577). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #2 Supporting Documents Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Responses to LR 26.01 Interrogatories)Young, Brent) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3468-BHH.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1862 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Alicia Holland vs Beaufort County Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377393). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)Anderson, Jonathan) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3479-DCN-MHC. Please see ECF No. #1873 for Civil Cover Sheet and LR 26.01s.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1861 COMPLAINT Laura Johnson vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03462 BHH KDW
September 30, 2020 Filing 1860 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Helen B. Woolridge vs Walmart Stores, Inc. Court Name: Greenwood County of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9377118). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 - Answer of Defendants, #5 Certificate of Service - Answer of Defendants, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Certificate of Service - Defendants Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Montgomery, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3461-TMC.
September 30, 2020 Filing 1859 COMPLAINT Shitisha Andrea Pope vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for filing IFP, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03460 DCC KFM
September 29, 2020 Filing 1858 COMPLAINT Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company vs Samuel Hutchins Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9375605). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Corporate Disclosure Stmt, #6 Summons Hutchins, #7 Summons Bandini)Cox, Alfred) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3459-TMC.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1857 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Cheryl Ann Johnson vs Thomas Lankford Court Name: Johnson v. Lankford ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9375397). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Supporting Documents answer)Dean, Kelly) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3458-BHH.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1856 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Stacy Zabrycki vs LifeShield National Insurance Company Court Name: Greenwood County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9375280). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supporting Documents Answer)Devlin, Chadwick) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3456-TMC.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1855 COMPLAINT Marie Duke vs Astora Women's Health, LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9375058). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Harris, Walter) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3455-JMC.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1854 COMPLAINT Jason Richards vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03457 JMC JDA
September 29, 2020 Filing 1853 COMPLAINT Lisa McBride vs Spartanburg Regional Health Services District, Inc. Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9374493). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Hodge, Charles) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3454-TMC-KFM.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1852 COMPLAINT Dorothy Mae Jackson vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Informa Pauperis, #4 Envelope consent to magistrate)Dunn, Geoff) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03450 DCN MGB
September 29, 2020 Filing 1851 COMPLAINT United States of America vs Kevin A. Hampton Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Ryan, Katherine) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3449-MGL.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1850 COMPLAINT Sarah Hernandez vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9373546). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03445 DCN PJG
September 29, 2020 Filing 1849 COMPLAINT Milton Gerald vs Andrew Saul Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9373521). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03446 BHH KFM
September 29, 2020 Filing 1848 COMPLAINT Celestine El vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9373484). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03447 JMC MGB
September 29, 2020 Filing 1847 COMPLAINT Marie Bowen vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9373425). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03448 DCN JDA
September 29, 2020 Filing 1846 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Carolyn Beasley vs Dilmar Investments, Inc. Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9373122). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Requests to Admit, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit Cert. of Merger, #5 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #8 State Court Documents Answer, #9 State Court Documents Confidentiality Order, #10 LR 26.01 Answers Dilmar's 26.01 Answers, #11 LR 26.01 Answers Circle K's 26.01 Answers)Holt, Ryan) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3444-SAL.
September 29, 2020 Filing 1845 COMPLAINT Deal vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 9/29/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03443 TMC PJG
September 28, 2020 Filing 1844 NOTICE OF REMOVAL David V. Johnson vs W.S. Badcock Corporation Court Name: Richand County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9371501). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit A- State Court Documents)Barker, Rita) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3438-MGL.
September 28, 2020 Filing 1843 COMPLAINT Irene Manigault vs Department of Veterans Affairs Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9370779). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers PLTFs answers, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Civil clerk, #4 Summons VA, #5 Summons SC DA, #6 Summons USA, #7 Summons Reginal VA)Palmer, Tiffany) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3437-BHH.
September 28, 2020 Filing 1842 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sureko Hamilton vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Court Name: Berkeley County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9370563). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Norris, Charles) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3433-DCN.
September 28, 2020 Filing 1841 COMPLAINT Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company vs Garrett Clark Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9370335). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons of Corin Clark, #4 Summons of Mark Clark, #5 Summons of Garrett Clark, #6 Summons of Kareen Moultrie, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Sawyer, Wesley) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3431-BHH.
September 28, 2020 Filing 1840 COMPLAINT Ross Marine, LLC vs M/V Reel Hooker Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9369711). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Scott, William) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3429-DCN.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1839 COMPLAINT Expert IP, LLC d/b/a AT-NET Services vs Twin Rivers Capital, LLC CHARLESTON Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9368402). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Proposed Summons to Twin Rivers Capital, LLC, #4 Proprosed Summons to HJB Construction, Inc.)Bach, Adam) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3426-DCN.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1838 COMPLAINT Medarc, LLC vs Care Improvement Plus Group Management, LLC Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9368061). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons)Landis, Paul) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3427-HMH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1837 COMPLAINT Eric Milton Dean vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/25/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03423 MGL JDA
September 25, 2020 Filing 1836 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Douglas W. Higgins vs Catalyst Exhibits, Inc. Court Name: Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367960). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: All Pleadings Filed in Beaufort County Case No. 2020CP0701612, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Timothy Roberts, #3 Exhibit 3: Declaration of David Larsen, #4 Exhibit 4: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Appendix Unpublished Opinion, #6 LR 26.01 Answers of Catalyst Exhibits, Inc., #7 LR 26.01 Answers of Tru Services Group, Inc., #8 LR 26.01 Answers of Timothy Roberts, #9 LR 26.01 Answers of David Larsen, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)Adams, Julie) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3424-BHH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1835 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Delta Apparel, Inc. vs HanesBrands, Inc. Court Name: South Carolina Court of Common Pleas, Greenville County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367664). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Coversheet, #2 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, #3 LR 26.01 Answers HanesBrands, Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 INT Answers)Beach, John) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3418-DCC.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1834 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Margaret Austin vs Orangeburg Homes, LLC Court Name: Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367127). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Citizenship of Defendant, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers of Defendant)Dixon, Harry) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3406-SAL.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1833 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Michael Abraham Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367008). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Michael Abraham, #4 Summons to Traded Policy Desk)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3405-BHH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1832 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Philip Harris Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9366937). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Philip Harris, #4 Summons to Harris Financial)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3404-BHH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1831 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Mark Heffington Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9366908). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Mark Heffington, #4 Summons to Blue Marble Advisors)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3403-BHH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1830 COMPLAINT Thomas Dion vs Mimedx Group, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9366836). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Competition Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Non-Solicitation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Georgia Action Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers, #6 Summons)Dunlap, Jennifer) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3402-BHH.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1829 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Beach Patio, LLC vs Maxum Indemnity Company and Engle Martin & Associates Court Name: Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9366584). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Wallace, R) Modified on 9/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3428-SAL.
September 25, 2020 Filing 1828 COMPLAINT Nolan vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 9/25/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03401 DCC PJG
September 25, 2020 Filing 1827 COMPLAINT Jackie Chenell Fisher vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9366266). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/25/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03400 RBH TER
September 25, 2020 Filing 1826 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $29,995.00 in United States Currency Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3398-RBH.
September 24, 2020 Filing 1825 COMPLAINT Rebecca Brunson vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/24/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03395 SAL TER
September 24, 2020 Filing 1824 COMPLAINT Andrey Velichko vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03393 DCN JDA
September 24, 2020 Filing 1823 COMPLAINT Scott Hickey vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03392 TLW KDW
September 24, 2020 Filing 1822 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Cynthia Oglesby vs J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, Greenville County, SC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9363879). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Summons & Complaint, #3 Recommendation Affidavit of Service, #4 LR 26.01 Answers JCPenney LR 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Supporting Documents Suggestion of Bankruptcy, #6 Exhibit A - to Suggestion of Bankruptcy)Stegmaier, Christian) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3391-TMC.
September 24, 2020 Filing 1821 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Patrice Johnson vs PruittHealth, Inc. Court Name: Common Pleas - Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9363516). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers PruittHealth, Inc., #4 LR 26.01 Answers The Oaks of Blythewood, Inc. d/b/a PruittHealth - Blythewood)Duda, William) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3390-JMC-TER.
September 24, 2020 Filing 1820 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Nikki Louise Alexander vs Pharmerica Logistic Services, LLC d/b/a PharMerica Court Name: State Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9363438). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Evert, Jill) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3389-DCN.
September 24, 2020 Filing 1819 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Teresa Wyatt vs Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston Court Name: Spartanburg County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9363069). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Exhibit A State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet -Federal Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers -Lincoln Life Assurance Responses to Local Rule 26.01)Dillard, William) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3381-TMC.
September 24, 2020 Filing 1818 COMPLAINT Lincoln vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 9/24/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03380 SAL KDW
September 24, 2020 Filing 1817 COMPLAINT Pelican's SnoBalls USA, LLC vs William M. Roebuck Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9362744). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)McKnew, Natalma) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3379-MGL.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1816 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. 2 Division. C Holmes v Kevin Campbell, Trustee and James Kevin Holmes (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Letter, #2 Order and Judgment on Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Order)(kdouglass-USBK, ) Modified on 9/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3376-BHH-MHC.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1815 COMPLAINT SouthStar Financial, LLC vs Secured Data Services, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9360675). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Invoices, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Assignment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - NOP Agreements)Tierney, Nicholas) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3374-DCN.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1814 COMPLAINT Marty Starnes vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03372 RMG MGB
September 23, 2020 Filing 1813 NOTICE OF REMOVAL James A. Wilson vs Florence County School District 3 Court Name: Court of Common Pleas - County of Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9360562). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Documents (S&C), #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing (State Ct), #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing (Pltf), #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Dfts' Ans to LR 26.01 Rogs)Lyon, David) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3373-SAL.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1812 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Alice Lawson, as Guardian of Alicia Hamilton, an Incapacitated Person vs Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. a/k/a Wal-Mart Store No. 616 Court Name: Orangeburg County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9360534). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Answer)Roberts, Randi) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3371-TLW.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1811 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Thomas James Delaney Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9360509). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3370-BHH.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1810 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Bryan Gaiser Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9360500). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3369-BHH.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1808 COMPLAINT Trexter Lockhart vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03364 RBH SVH
September 23, 2020 Filing 1807 COMPLAINT Tara Mathis vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03363 BHH JDA
September 23, 2020 Filing 1806 COMPLAINT Scotty Lee Jennings vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security TBD Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents AO 240, #4 Supporting Documents AO 85)Jordan, Woodrow) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03361 SAL JDA
September 23, 2020 Filing 1805 COMPLAINT Susan Smith vs Walmart, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9359447). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to John Doe Company No. 1, #3 Summons Summons to Walmart, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Responses to 26.01 Disclosures)Senn, Karlen) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3362-SAL.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1804 COMPLAINT James Brian Dutton vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Ware Shoals Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03359 MBS PJG
September 23, 2020 Filing 1803 COMPLAINT Catherine Bradley vs Nathan R. Burger Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9359313). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Calloway, Jordan) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3360-JFA-PJG.
September 23, 2020 Filing 1802 COMPLAINT Crystal Thompson vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03358 JMC MHC
September 22, 2020 Filing 1801 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kenneth Rivera vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357533). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Bailey, Sarah) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3356-SAL-JDA.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1800 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Stuart and Nora Witten, as Guardians and Parent of Rocco Recchia vs Southern Health Partners, Inc. Court Name: Pickens County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357898). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons & Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Acceptance of Service - Filed 09-21-2020), #3 Exhibit C (Tennessee Secretary of State Corporations Information), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers, #6 Certificate of Service)Long, James) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3355-DCC.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1799 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Linklater Group, Co. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357799). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3353-BHH.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1798 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs David Miller Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357784). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3352-BHH.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1797 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Matthew Woodard Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357770). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3351-BHH.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1796 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, In His Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Todd Wellnitz Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9357718). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Wellguard Insurance, #4 Summons Wellnitz)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3350-BHH.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1795 COMPLAINT Auto Body Express, LLC vs Corporate ADR, LLC Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9356938). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Weaver, Zachary) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3349-DCC.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1794 COMPLAINT John Madden vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/22/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03347 SAL SVH
September 22, 2020 Filing 1793 COMPLAINT United States of America vs 2017 Audi Q-7 Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Verification of Agent Joseph S. Brim, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3348-DCN.
September 22, 2020 Filing 1792 COMPLAINT Scott Long vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Landrum Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9356209). (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/22/2020 (mnas). 6-20-cv-03345 CMC KFM
September 21, 2020 Filing 1791 Motion to Enforce Subpoena Anderson Division. First Quality Tissue, LLC v. Irving Consumer Products Limited and Irving Consumer Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9355598). (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - US Patent 9,506,203 B2, #3 Exhibit B - US Patent 9,580,872 B2, #4 Exhibit C - US Patent 9,725,853 B2, #5 Exhibit D - Complaint First Quality Tissue vs Irving Consumer Products Limited et al., #6 Exhibit E - Irving Motion to Compel Discovery, #7 Exhibit F - FQ Initial Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Deposition to Shane Hayes, #9 Exhibit H - E-mail Mabey to Siebken August 3, 2020, #10 Exhibit I - Order Appointing Special Master, #11 Exhibit J - E-mail Schmitt to Mok August 6, 2020, #12 Exhibit K - Special Master Order 1, #13 Exhibit L - E-mail Weinand to Mabey September 17, 2020, #14 Exhibit M - E-mail Mabey to Sanders September 7, 2020, #15 Exhibit N - E-mail Mabey to Moore September 8, 2020)Willis, Marguerite) Filed in Case # 6:20-mc-00418-BHH Modified on 9/22/2020 (sgri).
September 21, 2020 Filing 1790 Motion to Enforce Subpoena Anderson Division. First Quality Tissue, LLC v. Irving Consumer Products Limited and Irving Consumer Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9355592). (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - US Patent 9,506,203 B2, #3 Exhibit B - US Patent 9,580,872 B2, #4 Exhibit C - US Patent 9,725,853 B2, #5 Exhibit D - Complaint First Quality Tissue vs Irving Consumer Products Limited et al., #6 Exhibit E - Irving Motion to Compel Discovery, #7 Exhibit F - FQ Initial Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Deposition to Karthik Ramaratnam, #9 Exhibit H - E-mail Mabey to Siebken August 3, 2020, #10 Exhibit I - Subpoena to Karthik Ramaratnam, #11 Exhibit J - E-mail Schmitt to Mok August 6, 2020, #12 Exhibit K - Special Master Order 1, #13 Exhibit L - E-mail Weinand to Mabey September 17, 2020, #14 Exhibit M - E-mail Mabey to Sanders September 7, 2020, #15 Exhibit N - E-mail Mabey to Moore September 8, 2020, #16 Exhibit O - Order Appointing Special Master)Willis, Marguerite) Filed in Case # 6:20-mc-00419-BHH Modified on 9/22/2020 (sgri).
September 21, 2020 Filing 1789 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Hannah J. Secka vs Florence County School District Three Court Name: Court of Common Pleas - County of Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9354544). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C, #2 Exhibit NOR State Court, #3 Exhibit NOR - Plaintiff, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Lyon, David) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3342-SAL-TER.
September 21, 2020 Filing 1788 COMPLAINT Tiffany Brice vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03335 BHH MGB
September 21, 2020 Filing 1787 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kennth L. Campos vs Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC Court Name: Horry County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9354313). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 1 to MTD - Prior Order, #7 Exhibit 2 to MTD - Affidavit of Goodman)Waring, Bradish) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3341-SAL.
September 21, 2020 Filing 1786 COMPLAINT Regina Marie Loschke vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03331 RMG KFM
September 21, 2020 Filing 1785 COMPLAINT John Robert Richey vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03330 TMC KDW
September 21, 2020 Filing 1784 COMPLAINT Simone Bowman vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03328 DCN JDA
September 21, 2020 Filing 1783 NOTICE OF REMOVAL McKenze Kirby Seay vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9353470). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Norris, Charles) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). 7:20-cv-3327-TMC.
September 21, 2020 Filing 1782 COMPLAINT Kim Westly Murphy vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03325 DCC MHC
September 21, 2020 Filing 1781 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Carol A. Massey vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Court Name: Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9353311). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Norris, Charles) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3326-BHH.
September 21, 2020 Filing 1780 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Its Just Wire, LLC vs BMW of Myrtle Beach Court Name: Horry County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9353195). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents)Klein, Elle) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3324-SAL.
September 18, 2020 Filing 1779 COMPLAINT Andrew LeCheminant vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03319 TMC SVH
September 18, 2020 Filing 1778 COMPLAINT Elizabeth Langston vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/21/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03334 TMC MHC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1777 COMPLAINT Glytec, LLC vs Raymie McFarland Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9352249). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to Raymie McFarland, #4 Summons Summons to Monarch Medical Technologies, LLC, #5 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Responses)Bakker, Mark) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3321-HMH.
September 18, 2020 Filing 1776 COMPLAINT Benjamin N. Reitz vs Ingevity Corporation, and Quest Diagnotics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9352118). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Mullaney, Marybeth) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3320-BHH-MGB.
September 18, 2020 Filing 1775 COMPLAINT Jeff Edward Hergesheimer vs Commissioner of SSA Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Appeals Council Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03318 RMG MHC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1774 COMPLAINT Great American Assurance Company vs Latoya Ekpunobi Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9351355). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redacted Policy, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Addendum Attachment to Summons List of Defendants, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Moseley, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03317 MGL
September 18, 2020 Filing 1773 COMPLAINT Michael E. Lawton vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed)Firimonte, Susan) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03316 DCC MHC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1772 COMPLAINT Burlington Drug Company, Inc. vs Dmitriy Tokar Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9350894). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pill Box Rx Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Pill Box Rx Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C Avenue U Credit Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Avenue U Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E Pill Box Rx Statement, #6 Exhibit F Avenue U Pharmacy Statement, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 LR 26.01 Answers)McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 7:20-cv-03315 TMC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1771 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $31,900.00 in United States Currency Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03314 BHH
September 18, 2020 Filing 1770 COMPLAINT J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company vs Caldwell Corp of Thomaston, Inc. d/b/a Cherokee Pharmacy Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9350475). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 7:20-cv-03313 TMC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1769 COMPLAINT April LaMountain vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03312 JMC PJG
September 18, 2020 Filing 1768 COMPLAINT Kenneth A. Zimmerman vs Sealed Air Corporation Short Term Disability Plan Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9349987). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03311 TMC
September 18, 2020 Filing 1767 COMPLAINT Jean L. Odom vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9349986). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-03310 TLW
September 17, 2020 Filing 1766 NOTICE OF REMOVAL White Electrical Construction Company vs Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP Court Name: Beaufort Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9349684). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Local Rule 26.01 answers)Johnson, George) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03309 DCN
September 17, 2020 Filing 1765 COMPLAINT Claudia Melissa Johnson vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03308 RMG TER
September 17, 2020 Filing 1764 Motion to Quash Subpoena Anderson Division. First Quality Tissue, LLC v. Irving Consumer Products Limited and Irving Consumer Products, Inc. (In Re Non-Party Deposition Subpoena to Shane Hayes) ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9349337). (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)Foster, William) Assigned to Case # 6:20-mc-411-BHH. Modified on 9/18/2020 to edit text.(sgri)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1763 COMPLAINT Stanley Deon Elmore vs Commissioner of SSA Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Appeals Council Decision, #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03306 BHH MGB
September 17, 2020 Filing 1762 COMPLAINT Margie Rumsfelt vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03305 MGL KDW
September 17, 2020 Filing 1761 COMPLAINT Kari Wiggins vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03304 MGL SVH
September 17, 2020 Filing 1760 COMPLAINT Sarah Shoun and Allison Newton as Personal Representatives of the Estate of Wendy Haywood Newton vs McLeod Loris Seacoast Hospital d/b/a McLeod Loris Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9348598). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Brittain, Thomas) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03303 MGL KDW
September 17, 2020 Filing 1759 COMPLAINT Robin Hager vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9348480). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03302 HMH
September 17, 2020 Filing 1758 COMPLAINT Steven Robinson vs Unum Life Insurance Company of America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9347976). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03297 TMC
September 17, 2020 Filing 1757 COMPLAINT James Purinton vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 9/17/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03296 BHH PJG
September 16, 2020 Filing 1756 COMPLAINT Bobby Dale Scott vs Monsanto Company Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9345740). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Newman, Graham) Modified on 9/16/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-03292 MDL
September 16, 2020 Filing 1755 COMPLAINT Douglas John Martins vs Commissioner of SSA Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9345284). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 9/16/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03295 MGL MGB
September 16, 2020 Filing 1754 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Michelle Huff vs Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC Court Name: Lancaster County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9345033). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Process and Pleadings Filed in State Court Action, #2 Exhibit 2- South Carolina Secretary of State website printout regarding Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Answer, #6 Certificate of Service)Spencer, Joshua) Modified on 9/16/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03291 TLW
September 15, 2020 Filing 1753 COMPLAINT Joann M. Gorcesky vs HHC South Carolina, Inc d/b/a Lighthouse Behavioral Health Hospital FLORENCE Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9343958). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons HHC South Carolilna, #4 Summons Universal Health, #5 Summons UHS of Delaware)Potts, A) Modified on 9/16/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03289 SAL KDW
September 15, 2020 Filing 1752 COMPLAINT Coty Martin vs Blackbaud, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9343765). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Summons)Flowers, Jodi) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03286 RMG
September 15, 2020 Filing 1751 COMPLAINT Amanda Boozer vs Andrew Saul Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03285 DCC KFM
September 15, 2020 Filing 1750 COMPLAINT Kathy Ann James vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security TBD Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9343301). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents AO 85)Jordan, Woodrow) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03283 JMC KFM
September 15, 2020 Filing 1749 COMPLAINT Megan Anslye Johnson vs Halls Chophouse Grill, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9343049). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Akins, Dale) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03281 DCN
September 15, 2020 Filing 1748 COMPLAINT Terry Rud vs Andrew Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03280 TMC TER
September 15, 2020 Filing 1747 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Randy Levins Baker vs Desmend Garner Court Name: Dorchester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9342857). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit, #2 State Court Documents Exhibit, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Exhibit)Butler, Drew) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03278 RMG MGB
September 15, 2020 Filing 1746 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jeffrey Kline vs Safeco Insurance Company of America Court Name: Richland County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9342716). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer to Complaint)Templeton, Morgan) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-03277 MGL
September 15, 2020 Filing 1745 COMPLAINT Linda Johnson vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03276 JMC JDA
September 14, 2020 Filing 1744 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Audra Walters vs Bank of America, N.A. Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9340069). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)McPherson, Thomas) Modified on 9/15/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03275 MBS
September 14, 2020 Filing 1743 COMPLAINT Paul Abraham vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03272 RMG JDA
September 14, 2020 Filing 1742 COMPLAINT GUY MORIN vs AMERICAN SERVICES, INC GREENVILLE Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9339187). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit LR Rogs, #3 Exhibit Notice Filing Consents, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice Filing Consents, #5 Exhibit Consent - Morin, #6 Exhibit Consent - Parrington, #7 Exhibit Consent - Roper, #8 Exhibit Consent - Scott, #9 Exhibit Consent - Masters, #10 Exhibit Consent - Tyson, #11 Exhibit Consent - Sprinkle, #12 Exhibit Summons, #13 Exhibit Summons)LeClercq, Ben) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03271 TMC
September 14, 2020 Filing 1741 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jamie Cutter vs Edward Keith Milner Court Name: Court of Common Pleas in the First Judicial Circuit in South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9338376). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Milner Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Fletcher Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Lis Pendens, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers)Hunter, Hilary) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03268 MGL
September 14, 2020 Filing 1740 COMPLAINT James F. Joyner, III, as Trustee of the Cubex, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust vs Industrial Control Concepts, Inc., D/B/A ICC, Inc. Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9338910). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Guaranty, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Spencer, Joshua) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03266 SAL
September 14, 2020 Filing 1739 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Johnny Forney vs Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. Court Name: Spartanburg County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9338808). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer to Amended Complaint)Crotty, Cara) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 7:20-cv-03267 TMC JDA
September 14, 2020 Filing 1738 COMPLAINT Joaquin Gutierrez vs Bishop Tires, Inc. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9338530). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, Brian) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03264 DCC
September 14, 2020 Filing 1737 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Louetta Williams vs Circle K Stores, Inc. Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9338412). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers, #4 Main Document Answer)Holt, Ryan) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03263 SAL
September 14, 2020 Filing 1736 COMPLAINT Kristi Prince vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03262 DCN SVH
September 14, 2020 Filing 1735 COMPLAINT United States of America vs 4366 Doby's Bridge Road Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Agent Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in Rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-03261 SAL
September 11, 2020 Filing 1734 New Miscellaneous Filing Charleston Division. United States v. 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. 3M Depo Subpoena to Parker, #2 Exhibit 2. 3M Notice of Intent to Serve Parker Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3. VA Kehoe Ltr to 3M re Parker, #4 Exhibit 4. VA Cooper Ltr Denying Parker Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 5. Kirkland Touhy Ltr re Parker, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Leventis, James) Modified on 9/18/2020 - assigned Case 2:20-mc-00412 (rshu, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 1733 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Cynthia Warren vs 3M Company Court Name: Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9337363). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Responses, #3 State Court Documents State Court File, #4 Exhibit Ex A Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex B Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex C Responses to Master Discovery, #7 Exhibit Ex D Responses to Standard Discovery, #8 Exhibit Ex E Supp Responses to Standard Discovery)Techman, Jennifer) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3258-MBS.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1732 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kimberly Dawn Taylor vs Theresa J. Gaskin Court Name: Chester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9337291). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Plaintiff's Summons and Complailnt, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendants' Rule 26.01 Interrogatory Responses, #4 Supporting Documents Defendants' Answer)Barrow, Mark) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3257-MGL.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1731 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Trisha Westbrook vs Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Court Name: Lexington County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336949). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Answer)Roberts, Randi) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3255-MGL.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1730 COMPLAINT J.W. Campbell vs General Motors LLC Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336840). (Attachments: #1 Summons General Motors LLC, #2 Summons Luther J. Freeman, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01)Anderson, Lauren) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3256-SAL.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1729 COMPLAINT Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest vs Monica Hoefer Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336833). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hoefer, #2 Summons - Hope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Montgomery, John) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3254-MGL.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1728 COMPLAINT Sharod Heyward vs Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC Greenville Division. Heyward v Stoneleigh et al Filing ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336607). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit)Norsworthy, Kenneth) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3251-DCC.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1727 COMPLAINT Georgia Bowers vs Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336331). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons CoopeSurgical, Inc., #4 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Women's Health Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health LLC, #7 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc.)Goings, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3250-TMC.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1726 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Wood Creek Properties of Landrum, LLC vs Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336088). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Printouts Regarding Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Duke Energy Corporation, #2 Exhibit B- Pleadings and Service Documentation, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Answer, #6 Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit A- Motion to Dismiss- Printouts Regarding Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Duke Energy Corporation, #8 Exhibit B- Motion to Dismiss- Affidavit of Stephen C. Charney, #9 Certificate of Service)Spencer, Joshua) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3249-HMH.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1725 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $6,251.00 in United States Currency, et al Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Agent Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in Rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3247-CMC.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1724 COMPLAINT Donald Wayne Hardwick, II vs Andrew M. Saul, Comm. of Social Security Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed in Pauperis)Jung, William) Modified on 9/11/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03243 DCC JDA
September 11, 2020 Filing 1723 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Lawrence Kohler Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9335657). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Kohler Financial, #4 Summons to Lawrence Kohler)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3246-BHH.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1722 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Financial Growth and Management Corporation Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9335623). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3245-BHH.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1721 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs Dee Dee Brooks Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9335581). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3244-BHH.
September 11, 2020 Filing 1720 COMPLAINT S&D Enterprises, LLC vs Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9335337). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summons summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Bertele, Edward) Modified on 9/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3248-SAL.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1719 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Charles E Cook vs Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Court Name: South Carolina Magistrate's Court, Horry County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9333535). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Action Coversheet, #2 State Court Documents State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Experian's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatory Answers)Zwing Bryant, Lyndey) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3239-SAL-TER.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1718 COMPLAINT Jill Golod vs Unum Life Insurance Company of America Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9333512). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3238-RMG.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1717 COMPLAINT Tina Thiam, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Milledge vs Aaron Joyner Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9333161). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Johnson, Garrett) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3236-SAL-JDA.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1716 COMPLAINT Darlene Anderson vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Saluda Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03237 MBS MGB
September 10, 2020 Filing 1715 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jerry L. High vs Ray Chandler Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9333168). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal, #3 LR 26.01 Answers of Defendant Parks Small)Arthur, Samuel) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3235-RBH-TER.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1714 COMPLAINT Stephanie McAbee vs Cook Incorporated Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9333229). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Newman, Graham) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3234-MDL.
September 10, 2020 Filing 1713 COMPLAINT GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY vs ALEXIS SHANEA NORRIS BEAUFORT Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9332572). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Templeton, Morgan) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3230-RMG.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1712 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sara Lee Maynard vs Peter V. Hughes Court Name: Bamberg County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9331838). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Defendant's Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Braithwaite, Taylor) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3228-JMC.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1711 COMPLAINT Larry B. Carter vs United State Army Corps of Engineers, Savannah District Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9331794). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit Letter dated 3-23-20, #4 Exhibit Corps Letter dated 6-9-20, #5 Exhibit Deed of Distribution, #6 Exhibit Title to Real Estate, #7 Exhibit Corps Note to File, #8 Exhibit Corps Letter dated 6-17-20, #9 Exhibit Permit #3794, #10 Summons Summons)Draisen, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3232-TMC.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1710 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sarah McKee on behalf of Herself, and all Others Similarly Situated vs MD02 Fitness, LLC d/b/a O2 Fitness Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9331743). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Kelley, Ashley) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3227-DCN.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1709 COMPLAINT Janice White vs Prisma Health Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9331561). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Defendant Legacy GHS/Tuomey Pension Plan, #4 Summons Defendant Prisma Health)Peace, John) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3226-DCC.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1708 COMPLAINT Kyle J. Bryant vs Sykes Enterprises, Incorporated Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9330612). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Ricker, Brice) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3222-JMC-KDW.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1707 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jeffrey Lett vs Kelley B. Hawkins Court Name: York County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9330265). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rolf M. Baghdady, PA, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Baghdady, Rolf) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3220-JMC.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1706 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Schilli Distribution Services, Inc. and Thomas R. Schilli vs Allied World Specialty Insurance Company and Rockhill Insurance Company Court Name: Newberry Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9329908). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Shaw, Joshua) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-3221-DCC.
September 9, 2020 Filing 1705 COMPLAINT James Stacey McClellon vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Seneca Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9328794). (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03216 SAL KFM
September 8, 2020 Filing 1704 COMPLAINT Susan O. Smith vs Lexington County Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9328378). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Lexington County Summons, #4 Summons McPherson Summons)Sarvis, Bryn) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3217-JMC.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1703 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McKenzie, Edward) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3215-MGL-SVH.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1702 COMPLAINT Courtney Melville vs Nanette F. Barnes (Warden) South Carolina Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9328228). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)McKenzie, Edward) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3215-MGL-SVH.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1701 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Gwendolyn Croker vs Circle K Stores, Inc. Court Name: Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9328186). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Emails with Plaintiffs' Counsel, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Responses to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Neuschafer, Amy) Modified on 9/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3214-RMG.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1700 COMPLAINT Midway International, Inc. vs StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9327869). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Summons to Jakecia White, #5 Summons to StyleByKey Braiding Studio, LLC, #6 LR 26.01 Answers)Matthews, Steve) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3213-JMC.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1699 COMPLAINT Kenyetta Davis vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9327665). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/8/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03212 JMC TER
September 8, 2020 Filing 1698 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Victoria Wells vs BMW of North America, LLC Court Name: Horry County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9327380). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents)Klein, Elle) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3209-SAL.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1697 COMPLAINT Lisa Nicole Tesner vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 9/8/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03206 DCC SVH
September 8, 2020 Filing 1696 COMPLAINT Stephen Reilly vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9327010). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3205-DCN.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1695 COMPLAINT David Estling vs GIDB Tiki, LLC d/b/a "Tiki Hut" Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326983). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, Brian) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3204-HMH.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1694 COMPLAINT Maria Weathers vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/8/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03202 TLW MHC
September 8, 2020 Filing 1693 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Nicole McClelland vs Eye Health America, LLC Court Name: Greenville County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326448). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents)Bakker, Mark) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3201-BHH-JDA.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1692 COMPLAINT Stevens Aerospace and Defense Systems, LLC vs Bernstein Aircraft Sales, LLC Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326403). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Terms & Conditions, #2 Exhibit B Invoices, #3 Exhibit C Invoices, #4 Exhibit D Aircraft Release Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Invoices, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 LR 26.01 Answers)McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3199-TMC.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1691 COMPLAINT Christin Fulford vs Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326384). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3198-RMG.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1690 COMPLAINT John Doe vs The United States of America District of South Carolina Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9326242). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons summons, #3 Affidavit expert affidavit, #4 LR 26.01 Answers answer to 26.01)McGowan, Chad) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3197-SAL.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1689 COMPLAINT Forrest Alexander vs County of Charleston Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9325784). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Bloodgood, Nancy) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3193-RMG-MHC.
September 8, 2020 Filing 1688 COMPLAINT Virginia Dawn Kirby vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security TBD Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents AO 240, #4 Supporting Documents AO 85)Jordan, Woodrow) Modified on 9/8/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03195 BHH MGB
September 8, 2020 Filing 1687 COMPLAINT Maria Camila Torres vs Life Care Services, LLC Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9325582). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Bloodgood, Nancy) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3192-DCN-MGB.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1686 COMPLAINT Otharine Singleton vs HCR ManorCare Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9324499). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)Gist, Donald) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3196-RMG-MHC.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1685 COMPLAINT Owners Insurance Company vs Foxfield Commons Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9324314). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 LR 26.01 Answers)Walsh, James) Modified on 9/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3187-HMH.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1684 COMPLAINT SLF III - HARDEEVILLE, LLC vs RSV - HARDEEVILLE, LLC Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9324072). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Development Agreement (Hardeeville Tract), #4 Exhibit B Copper Station Limited Warranty Deed and Quit-Claim Deed to Reed-HTI, #5 Exhibit C Copper Station Limited Warranty Deed and Quit-Claim Deed to JPR, #6 Exhibit D - Assignment of Owner Rights, #7 Exhibit E - AJA Partial Assignment, #8 Exhibit F - Reed-HTI Assignment, #9 Exhibit G - Limited Warranty Deed, #10 Exhibit H - SLF Assignment, #11 Exhibit I - SLF Reed-HTI Assignment, #12 Exhibit J Partial Assignment from SLF to Speedway, #13 LR 26.01 Answers)Shoun, Cheryl) Modified on 9/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3186-DCN.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1683 COMPLAINT SpecSys, Inc. vs Mermec, Inc. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9323996). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Corporate Disclosure Statement)Lay, John) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3184-JMC.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1682 COMPLAINT Dave Hollon vs Cook Incorporated Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9323856). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Chandler, Grace) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3082-MDL.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1681 COMPLAINT Matthew Johnson, an individual and Minnesota Resident, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated vs Blackbaud, Inc., a South Carolina Resident Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9323605). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Ulmer, Frank) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3181-RMG.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1680 COMPLAINT W&Z, LLC vs Alliance Pancake Partners, LLC Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9323462). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att A to Complaint: Lease, #2 Exhibit Att B to Complaint: Assignment, #3 Exhibit Att C to Complaint: Letter, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Supporting Documents Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)Buckingham, Steven) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3180-DCC.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1679 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, David N. Kenneally, and Melanie Jo Schulze-Miller vs The Freeman Agency, Inc. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9323442). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3179-BHH.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1678 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Ryan Cowsert vs Southern Custard, LLC aka Andy's Frozen Custard Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9322590). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Wilson, Sandi) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3178-TMC-KFM.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1677 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Randolph S. Williams vs AT&T Mobility Services LLC Court Name: Barnwell County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9322133). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence re City of Barnwell, #3 Exhibit C- July 21, 2020 Correspondence re Consent Order, #4 Exhibit D - September 3, 2020 Correspondence from T. Boulware, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Foster, William) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3175-TLW-SVH.
September 4, 2020 Filing 1676 COMPLAINT Teresa C. Goodman vs Unum Life Insurance Company of America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9322007). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3174-TMC.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1675 COMPLAINT David Roman vs Cook Incorporated Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9321086). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons on Cook Group Incorporated, #3 Summons Summons on Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Summons on Cook Medical LLC fka Cook Medical Incorporated, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Pls' 26.01 Answers)McVey, Theile) Modified on 9/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3203-MDL.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1674 COMPLAINT Genworth Life Insurance Company vs Synovus Trust Company, N.A. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9320770). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Synovus, #3 Summons for Jeanne Hall, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Bell, Kevin) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3171-SAL.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1673 COMPLAINT Berenyi, Inc. vs Nucor Corporation Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9320674). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Nucor, #3 Summons Summons to Stevens Towing Co., Inc., #4 Summons Summons to Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC, #5 Summons Summons to Kinder Morgan Mid Atlantic Marine Services, LLC)Hagood, H) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3170-DCN.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1672 COMPLAINT Annette Channell vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/3/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03169 TMC MHC
September 3, 2020 Filing 1671 COMPLAINT Donald Stewart vs Narvin Browning Lichfield Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9320412). Lewis, William) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bshr, ). Case number 8:20-3159-DCC. Please see ECF No. #1666 for original filing.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1670 COMPLAINT Sheila Duncan vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/3/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03164 BHH KDW
September 3, 2020 Filing 1669 COMPLAINT Cynthia C. Price vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 9/3/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03163 MGL KDW
September 3, 2020 Filing 1668 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Stacy Darby vs Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9319944). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit DOI Letter, #4 Exhibit Electronic Notice, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Hawk, John) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3165-BHH.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1667 COMPLAINT James Andrew Lutz vs Commissioner of SSA Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Appeals Council Decision, #2 Application to Proceed IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 9/3/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03162 DCN PJG
September 2, 2020 Filing 1666 COMPLAINT Donald Stewart vs Narvin Browning Lichfield Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Carolina Honey Summons, #4 Summons Narvin Lichfield Summons, #5 Summons Robert Browning Lichfield, #6 Summons Robert Lichfield-2 Summons, #7 Summons Robert Walter Lichfield Summons, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit Exhibit L)Lewis, William) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3159-DCC. Please see ECF No. #1671 for filing fee.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1665 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Frank Fulton vs Victoria R. Greco Court Name: Jasper County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9318276). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)Hurley, Sarah) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3158-DCN.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1664 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Belinda Ward vs Kimbrell's Furniture Distributor's, Inc. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas of Sumter County, SC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9317517). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Summons and Complaint)Stacy, Megan) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3156-JMC-KDW.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1663 COMPLAINT Owners Insurance Company vs Phillip A. Reichart Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9317273). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Walsh, James) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3149-TMC.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1662 COMPLAINT Laurentiu Popescu vs Fort Mill School District Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9317222). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Polvi, Shannon) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3148-JMC-TER.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1661 COMPLAINT Victoria Mabry vs McLeod Health Cheraw Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9317007). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Clark, Pheobe) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3147-SAL-KDW.
September 2, 2020 Filing 1660 COMPLAINT Jason Crone vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03146 JMC PJG
September 1, 2020 Filing 1659 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Stronghill Capital, LLC vs Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC Court Name: Common Please for Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9315421). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)Lang, Louis) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3139-MGL.
September 1, 2020 Filing 1658 COMPLAINT Wilbur Lee Gordon vs Andrew M. Saul, Comm. of Social Security Beaufort Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Waiver of Payment of Filing Fee)Jung, William) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03137 SAL KDW
September 1, 2020 Filing 1657 COMPLAINT Patricia Shambaugh vs Sun Fun Realty, LLC Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9314298). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Sun Fun Realty, #3 Summons Summons to Every Day Better)Hewett, Bradley) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3138-SAL.
September 1, 2020 Filing 1656 COMPLAINT Tracy Lynn Vaughn vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03132 RMG MHC
September 1, 2020 Filing 1655 COMPLAINT Amy Grubbs vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03126 BHH KFM
September 1, 2020 Filing 1654 COMPLAINT Jeffrey Crocker vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03123 DCC KDW
August 31, 2020 Filing 1653 COMPLAINT Mt. Hawley Insurance Company vs Eduard De Guardiola a/k/a Eduard deGuardiola Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9312093). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Eduard de Guardiola; Vista Realty Partners; Long Grove Vista, #4 Summons Long Grove Property Owners' Association, #5 Exhibit A - Policy MGL0143774, #6 Exhibit B - Policy MGL0150695, #7 Exhibit C - Policy MGL0151403, #8 Exhibit D - Policy MGL0155440, #9 Exhibit E - MXL0359893, #10 Exhibit F - MXL0365355, #11 Exhibit G - Complaint filed 10.26.09, #12 Exhibit H - POA Ans and CC 12.22.09, #13 Exhibit I - Summary Judgment Order for LGatS 7.26.12, #14 Exhibit J - Summons & Complaint 8.11.11, #15 Exhibit K - Amended Complaint 12.09.11, #16 Exhibit L - 190211 Amended Summons & Complaint, #17 Exhibit M - Order Joining Cases 02.04.19, #18 Exhibit N - Notice of Claim (2011 matter))DuPre, Allen) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3121-BHH.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1652 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Trinity Electric and Controls vs Fairway Ford, Inc. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas - Greenville County, SC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9312328). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Speer, R) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3120-TMC.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1651 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Theodore Bolick vs Sheriff Phillip Thompson Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9312325). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Chandler, J W) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-3119-RBH-KDW.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1650 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Francine Steineman vs Meridian Security Insurance Company Court Name: York County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9312099). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Bogdan, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3118-MGL.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1649 COMPLAINT Jaime Velazquez vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3116-RMG-SVH.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1648 COMPLAINT Allison Ossege-Lusk vs Elite Therapy Solutions, LLC Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9311835). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, Brian) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3112-TMC-JDA.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1647 COMPLAINT Tiffany Green vs Carolina Restaurants Group, Inc. Lexington Division. d/b/a Wendy's ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9311654). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Mills, J) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3111-SAL-SVH.
August 31, 2020 Filing 1646 COMPLAINT Cliff E. McCall vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to proceed w/o prepaymnet)Johnson, Todd) Modified on 8/31/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03110 SAL PJG
August 31, 2020 Filing 1645 COMPLAINT Deitra B. Pope vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9310126). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Creech, Margaret) Modified on 8/31/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03105 DCC KFM
August 28, 2020 Filing 1644 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kenneth M. Goode vs Brinks Incorporated Court Name: Charleston County State Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9308601). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Exhibit B - filed Affidavit of Service by Mailing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Completed Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's LR 26.01 responses, #5 Supporting Documents Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)Settana, Daniel) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3102-BHH.
August 28, 2020 Filing 1643 COMPLAINT The United States of America vs American Zinc Recycling Corp Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Ragsdale, Stanley) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3101-JMC.
August 28, 2020 Filing 1642 COMPLAINT Regina Sweet vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/28/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03098 MGL MGB
August 28, 2020 Filing 1641 COMPLAINT Wanda Batson vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/28/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03097 TMC MHC
August 28, 2020 Filing 1640 COMPLAINT Robin L. Owings vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9306634). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case 7:20-cv-3096-TMC.
August 28, 2020 Filing 1639 COMPLAINT Christopher J. Dukich vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9306632). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3095-DCC.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1638 NOTICE OF REMOVAL The Turtle Factory Building Corp. vs McGrath Real Estate Holdings, LLC Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9306365). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Ford, Ian) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3099-RMG.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1637 COMPLAINT North American Company for Life and Health Insurance vs Tametris Ryans Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9306309). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Policy, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Devlin, Chadwick) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3094-MGL.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1636 NOTICE OF REMOVAL David Seabrook vs City of North Charleston Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9306129). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Dorsel, Christopher) Modified on 8/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3093-RMG-MGB.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1635 COMPLAINT Sheryn Lackey vs Wyndham Destinations, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9305940). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2015 Form 5500 For Wyndham Worldwide Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, #2 Exhibit B January 7, 2016 Letter from Wyndham, #3 Exhibit C Term Life Insurance Portability Application, #4 Exhibit D Group Life Insurance Policy Number GL147713, #5 Exhibit E Policy Specification Page for Policy Number GL30018545, #6 Exhibit F Email Correspondence Between Reliance Standard and Wyndham, #7 Exhibit G October 6, 2016 Denial Letter, #8 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #9 Civil Cover, #10 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3091-SAL.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1634 COMPLAINT Shamyah Ahsha Morris vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 8/27/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-03090 MGL SVH
August 27, 2020 Filing 1633 COMPLAINT Mt. Hawley Insurance Company vs Eduard De Guardiola a/k/a Eduard deGuardiola Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9305022). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Long Grove at Seaside Farms, #3 Summons de Guardiola, Vista Realty & Long Grove Vista, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Mt. Hawley Insurance Co)DuPre, Allen) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3086-BHH.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1632 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Evan Stone vs Tin Roof Acquisition Company, LLC d/b/a The Senate Court Name: Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9305173). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Thompson, Joseph) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3085-JMC.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1631 COMPLAINT Progressive Northern Insurance Company vs Calvert W. Huffines, Jr., Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304854). (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, John) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3084-DCN.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1630 COMPLAINT Laura K. Ruff vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304815). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3083-DCC.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1629 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Cathy Moore vs Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston Court Name: Greenville County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304693). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Ex 1-State Court Documents-Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -Ex 2-State Court Documents Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet -Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers -Lincoln Responses to LR 26.01 INT)Dillard, William) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3082-HMH.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1628 COMPLAINT Deanna Vanacore vs Keith E. Godsil Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304582). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Lydon, Thomas) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3080-DCC.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1627 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John Britton and Rhonda Britton vs Smith Dray Line, et al Court Name: Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304477). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Public Index)Adkins, Matthew) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). verified with attorney/filing user - this entry is a duplicate of ECF No. #1618 and should not have been filed. A refund has been requested from finance.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1626 COMPLAINT Victoria Becerra Ruiz vs William Barr Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9304319). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)Devine, Mark) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3079-RMG.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1625 COMPLAINT ROBIN HILL vs SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC ROCK HILL Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9303826). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Moore, Christopher) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3072-TLW.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1624 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jake Coker vs Norwich Commercial Group, Inc. Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9303351). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint - Richland County, #2 State Court Documents Certificate of Service - Norwich Commercial Group, Inc., #3 Supporting Documents Consent to Removal by Individual Defendants, #4 State Court Documents Notice to State Court of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 LR 26.01 Answers Norwich Commercial Group, Inc.'s LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Def. Norwich Commercial Group, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)Willis, Marguerite) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3071-MGL.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1623 COMPLAINT Tonya Glover Tuten vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9303685). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Mayes, W) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-3070-JMC-JDA.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1622 COMPLAINT Tawyne Dyonne Austin vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3069-SAL-TER.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1621 COMPLAINT Progressive Northern Insurance Company vs Donald Ladue, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeremy Ladue, and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9303340). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, John) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3068-DCN.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1620 COMPLAINT Linda H. Wiley vs Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit request for waiver of filing fee)Valtorta, Laura) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03066 DCN TER
August 26, 2020 Filing 1619 COMPLAINT All vs Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03065 RMG MGB
August 26, 2020 Filing 1618 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John Britton vs Smith Dray Line & Storage Co., Inc. Court Name: County of Richland, in the Court of Common Pleas 5th Judicial Circuit, of South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9302517). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Shet, #2 Summons Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court Documents Public Index, #4 State Court Documents Public Index, #5 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Interrogatories, #6 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Interrogatories, #7 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Interrogatories)Cappelmann, Emily) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3064-MGL.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1617 COMPLAINT Susan Elaine Austin vs Andrew M. Saul, Comm. of Social Security Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed without Payment of Filing Fee)Jung, William) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03061 TMC KFM
August 26, 2020 Filing 1616 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Alwayne Dontrell Quillin, Jr. vs Daniel Simon Court Name: Lee County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9302302). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Affidavit, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service)Plyler, Daniel) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3063-CMC-SVH.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1615 COMPLAINT South Carolina Coastal Conservation League vs Andrew R. Wheeler Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9302088). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Amigos Bravos 26.01 Disclosures, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Savannah Riverkeeper 26.01 Disclosures, #4 LR 26.01 Answers SC Coastal Conservation League 26.01 Disclosures, #5 LR 26.01 Answers NRDC 26.01 Disclosures, #6 LR 26.01 Answers SC Native Plant Society 26.01 Disclosures, #7 LR 26.01 Answers Waterkeeper Alliance 26.01 Disclosures, #8 Summons EPA Summons, #9 Summons Wheeler Summons)Holleman, Frank) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3062-DCN.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1614 COMPLAINT Donna Bryant vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03058 MGL TER
August 26, 2020 Filing 1613 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Robert A. Schulze vs Unum Group Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9301813). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Plan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Willard, Theodore) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3059-JMC.
August 26, 2020 Filing 1612 COMPLAINT Debra Crawford vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03056 JMC JDA
August 26, 2020 Filing 1611 COMPLAINT Winkle vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 8/26/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03057 TMC PJG
August 25, 2020 Filing 1610 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Eric Devore vs David Lee Phillips Court Name: Beaufort County Probate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit A. Graves Subpoena-Attachment to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit B. Touhy Ltr. re: Graves Depo-Attachment to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit C. USA Ltr. re: Graves Depo-Attachment to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit D. Motion for Protective Order-Attachment to Notice of Removal, #7 Motion To Quash, #8 Exhibit A. Graves Subpoena-Attachment to Motion to Quash, #9 Exhibit B. Touhy Ltr. re: Graves Depo-Attachment to Motion to Quash, #10 Exhibit C. USA Ltr. re: Graves Depo-Attachment to Motion to Quash, #11 Exhibit D. Motion for Protective Order-Attachment to Motion to Quash)Cundari, Tina) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). 9:20-cv-3055-RMG.
August 25, 2020 Filing 1609 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Justin J. Ridley vs Town of Yemassee Court Name: Beaufort Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9300657). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - State, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendants' Answers to Local 26.01 Interrogatories, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Scott, Christy) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3054-BHH-MHC.
August 25, 2020 Filing 1608 COMPLAINT Anthony Denson, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Garland Denson vs Steve Jones Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9300678). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Driggers, Johnny) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3052-DCN.
August 25, 2020 Filing 1607 COMPLAINT Tony R. Ingram vs Andrew M. Saul, Comm. of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9300568). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Jung, William) Modified on 8/25/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03051 RBH PJG
August 25, 2020 Filing 1606 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Alexander Shaffer vs Patrick Joseph Seymour Court Name: Jasper County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9300442). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Answer, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 State Court Documents)Dean, Kelly) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3050-BHH.
August 25, 2020 Filing 1605 COMPLAINT ACCORDIA LIFE AND ANNUITY COMPANY vs JOHN ANTUNES Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9299987). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #4 Exhibit 2 - Surrender check, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Cox, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3049-RMG.
August 25, 2020 Filing 1604 COMPLAINT Carol McLaughlin vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/25/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03048 RBH KDW
August 25, 2020 Filing 1603 COMPLAINT Dawn Taylor vs Pacific Press Technologies, Inc., f/k/a Multipress, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9299862). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Joye, Mark) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3047-SAL.
August 24, 2020 Filing 1602 COMPLAINT Debra Ann Hayes vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03033 BHH MGB
August 24, 2020 Filing 1601 COMPLAINT Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company vs Darrin Rogers Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9297507). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Policy)Morgan, Grenville) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-3041-RMG.
August 24, 2020 Filing 1600 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Dashawn Simmons vs Anthony Howard Hall Court Name: Richland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9297531). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Briggs, #3 State Court Documents, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service)Briggs, Brandon) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3036-DCC-SVH.
August 24, 2020 Filing 1599 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mathew Falgout vs Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. Court Name: Lancaster County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9297476). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-3035-MGL.
August 24, 2020 Filing 1598 COMPLAINT Samuel Levon Harrelson vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9297305). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)McKissick, Robert) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-03031 RBH MHC
August 24, 2020 Filing 1597 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Claudia Barrientos-Sandov vs Alejo Calvo Juarez Court Name: Horry County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9297071). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 State Court Documents, #5 Answer to Complaint)Domin, Timothy) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-3034-SAL.
August 24, 2020 Filing 1596 COMPLAINT Cynthia Stanley vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03030 RMG KDW
August 24, 2020 Filing 1595 COMPLAINT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. vs GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE, CO. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9296499). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Summons - Stephen Baraha, #4 Summons Summons - SC Registered Agent, #5 Summons Summons - SC DOI Director)Gressette, Thomas) Modified on 8/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3029-RMG.
August 22, 2020 Filing 1594 COMPLAINT William Edward Terry vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9295511). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Creech, Margaret) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03028 DCC JDA
August 21, 2020 Filing 1593 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Susie Jackson vs Food Lion, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, County of Georgetown, South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9295007). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Co-Defendant Answer)Ford, Ian) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3042-RMG.
August 21, 2020 Filing 1592 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joseph M. Beeson vs Anderson County Planning Commission Court Name: Anderson County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9294835). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer to Complaint)Darwin, Andrew) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03027 DCC
August 21, 2020 Filing 1591 COMPLAINT Robert Alan Flibotte vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed In Pauperis)Jung, William) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-03023 MGL PJG
August 21, 2020 Filing 1590 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kyle S. Brown vs Georgia-Carolina Radiocasting Company, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, Oconee County, South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9293522). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1 - Civil Action Coversheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Attachment 2 - Defendant's Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories)Merrell, John) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-03021 TMC KFM
August 21, 2020 Filing 1589 COMPLAINT Jackie L. Rivera vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9293513). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03020 SAL KFM
August 21, 2020 Filing 1588 COMPLAINT Gwendolyn Bittle vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03019 SAL MGB
August 21, 2020 Filing 1587 COMPLAINT Catherine L. Shaffer vs Prudential Insurance Company of America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9292688). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-03016 HMH
August 21, 2020 Filing 1586 COMPLAINT GREGORY JAMES ANDERSON vs ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY Unknown Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9292596). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Paul, Richard) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-03017 DCN TER
August 20, 2020 Filing 1585 COMPLAINT W & Z, LLC vs Virginia Family Restaurants, LLC Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9292502). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att. A: Lease Agmt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Pl.'s LCR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Pl.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure, #5 Summons Proposed Summons)Buckingham, Steven) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-3012-DCC.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1584 COMPLAINT Larry D. Frye vs The United States of America Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291900). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SF-95 Claim, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, #3 Exhibit Expert Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #6 Summons William Barr, U.S. Attorney General, #7 Summons Peter McCoy, U.S. Attorney)McAlister, Allen) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). 9:20-cv-3011-BHH-MHC.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1583 NOTICE OF REMOVAL NanoPure, LLC vs David Pobiak Court Name: Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291853). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Jones, Jesse) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-03022 BHH
August 20, 2020 Filing 1582 COMPLAINT Mitsy Lynn McKenzie vs Andrew Saul Commissioner of Social Security Administration South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 application to proceed without prepayment)Kellahan, Jennifer) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03005 BHH KDW
August 20, 2020 Filing 1581 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Marilynn Woods Tucker vs Target Corporation Court Name: Richland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291759). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatory Responses, #4 Supporting Documents Defendant's Answer)Barrow, Mark) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3010-JMC.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1580 COMPLAINT Kristi Banks vs Charles R. Nichols Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291477). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Nichols, #4 Summons F2F Registered Agent, #5 Summons F2F Insurance Carrier 1, #6 Summons F2F Insurance Carrier 2)Clore, Mark) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3009-MBS.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1579 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Dellerice Grant vs Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Court Name: Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291418). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 - Answer of Defendant, #5 Certificate of Service - Answer of Defendant, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Certificate of Service - Defendant Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Montgomery, John) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3008-DCN.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1578 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Estate of Brianna Lynn Beland vs Charleston County Sheriff's Office Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291460). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Jackson, Robin) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-3006-SAL-SVH.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1577 COMPLAINT Donna Nesbitt vs Pfizer, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9290995). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Parke Davis & Co., #3 Summons - Pfizer, Inc., #4 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, #5 Summons - Pharmacia Corporation, #6 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, LLC)Jones, Gregory) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-3007-RMG.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1576 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Brandon Ray Hixon vs Morning Pride Manufacturing, LLC Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9291023). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)McCoy, Keely) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-3002-JMC.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1575 COMPLAINT Justin Santonio Bryant vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-03001 SAL KDW
August 20, 2020 Filing 1574 COMPLAINT Michelle Viscio Timms vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Pelzer Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02997 JMC JDA
August 20, 2020 Filing 1573 COMPLAINT Kimberly Ross Koon vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02996 RBH KFM
August 19, 2020 Filing 1572 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Christie Phillips vs Principal National Life Insurance Company Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9289457). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 LR 26.01 Answers)Hawk, John) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2995-JMC.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1571 COMPLAINT Brandy Thomas vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2994-DCN-SVH.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1570 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Nancy Kennington vs CMH Homes, Inc. d/b/a Clayton Homes and Oakwood Homes Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9288680). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Complaint on CMH, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Certificat of Service for Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - CMH Secretary of State Information, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)Custer, Clayton) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-3003-TMC.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1569 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Steven Gier vs Modern Exterminating Company, Inc. Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9288664). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Savitz, Stephen) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2991-MGL.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1568 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Ruth Dooley vs Publix Super Markets, Inc. Court Name: Anderson County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9287994). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers on behalf of Defendant Publix Asset Management Company, #4 LR 26.01 Answers on behalf of Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc., #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement on behalf of Defendant Publix Asset Management Company, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement on behalf of Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc., #7 Answer on behalf of Defendant Publix Asset Management Company, #8 Answer on behalf of Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc.)Harte, Robert) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2990-HMH.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1567 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Christopher Collins vs Cash America East, Inc. also d/b/a Cash America Pawn Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9287084). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Answers)Lusk, Holly) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2989-RMG.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1566 COMPLAINT Jesse Edward Anderson vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 8/19/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02984 DCC TER
August 19, 2020 Filing 1565 COMPLAINT Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. vs McCall Farms, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286836). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 Contract, #4 Exhibit 2 Invoice 1/20/20, #5 Exhibit 3 Invoice 4/7/20, #6 Exhibit 4 Invoice 7/8/20, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Quisenberry, Brian) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2988-SAL.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1564 COMPLAINT Mark Fultz vs Hospitality South LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286821). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Richardson, Vanessa) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2987-DCN.
August 19, 2020 Filing 1563 COMPLAINT Jermane Bluford vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Mountville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/19/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02983 TMC SVH
August 19, 2020 Filing 1562 COMPLAINT John Filyaw vs United HealthCare Insurance Company Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286294). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2986-SAL.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1561 COMPLAINT Larry Quesenberry vs Prudential Insurance Company of America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9285426). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2982-DCC.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1560 COMPLAINT Perry Finch vs Lowe's Home Centers, LLC formerly known as Lowe's Home Centers, Inc. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9285373). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Consent to Sue, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)Ellis, Todd) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2981-JMC.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1559 COMPLAINT The Boon Insurance Agency, Inc. vs Kelley Lloyd Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9285240). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #6 LR 26.01 Answers)Lehrer, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2980-JMC.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1558 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Higginbotham Pawleys Island Investments, LLC d/b/a Tidelands Lincoln vs Ford Motor Company d/b/a Lincoln Motor Company Court Name: Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9284899). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Woodward, Nickisha) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2977-MBS.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1557 COMPLAINT Thomas R. Smith vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/18/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02979 MHC DCC
August 18, 2020 Filing 1556 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Judy Weber vs Spartanburg Rehabilitation Institute, Inc. Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9284194). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Answer to Complaint)Gende, Mark) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2976-DCC.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1555 COMPLAINT Charles Thomas Barber, Jr. vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration` Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/18/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02970 SAL MGB
August 17, 2020 Filing 1554 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff.(Lyon, David) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2966-MGL-TER.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1553 COMPLAINT Edward N. Middleton vs Midlands Neurology & Pain Associates, P.A. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9283184). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Lyon, David) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2966-MGL-TER.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1552 COMPLAINT Nautilus Insurance Company vs Craig Elwood, George Christodal, NC Trailer Park, LLC, Ekaterina Al Quzza, Samuel King, III, Angela King, and Heather Shaw Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9282317). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, John) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2962-DCN.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1551 COMPLAINT Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza vs Randall Erckert Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9282176). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Responses, #3 Summons Randall Erckert, #4 Summons Strawser Construction, Inc., #5 Summons Amtrak)Bell, James) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2963-SAL.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1550 COMPLAINT Tasha Jacobs vs Cook Incorporated Richland Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9281698). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Chandler, Grace) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2975-MDL.
August 16, 2020 Filing 1549 COMPLAINT Benjamin D. Overton vs Beaufort Jasper Hampton Comprehensive Health Center Civil Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9280941). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit SC Notice Intent File Suit, #4 Exhibit Letter from Barbara Bowens Esq., #5 Exhibit Defendant Denial Letter #1, #6 Exhibit Defendant Denial letter #2, #7 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiffs Answers to LR 26.01)Erickson, Eric) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2958-BHH.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1547 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Frances Brazell vs Bank of England Court Name: Sumter ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9280795). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Watson, Joseph) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2957-JMC.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1546 COMPLAINT Ratliff CPA Firm, PC vs Kabbage, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9280628). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Wright, Michael) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2955-BHH.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1545 COMPLAINT NEXUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. vs NEPHRON STERILE COMPOUNDING CENTER LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9280527). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 U.S. Food & Drug Admin., Compounded Drug Products That Are Essentially Copies of Approved Drug Products Under Section 503B of the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act Guidance for Industry at 6 (January 2018), #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Food & Drug Admin., FDAs Human Drug Compounding Progress Report, at 4 (2017), #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Food & Drug Admin., 503B Bulks List, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)Brown, Stephen) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2956-MGL.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1544 COMPLAINT Great American Assurance Company vs Billy J. Smith Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9280493). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint for Declaratory Relief, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Moseley, Robert) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2954-JFA.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1543 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Megan and Tim Madden, Nicole and Peter Curry, Laura Williams, Krista Johnson, Kayla Britton and Michael Birrell, Shatara Brown and Stephanie Aiken, and Tracy and Quinn Williams vs Petland Summerville, LLC, Petland, Inc., Brad Parker, Debra Parker, Lamar Parker, and Kristen Parker Court Name: State of South Carolina County of Dorchester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9279179). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - copies of pleadings served upon Defendants)Walker, Harry) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2953-DCN.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1542 COMPLAINT Jacquelyn Bell vs Jay Heiny Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9278501). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Shaffer, Tristan) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2949-SAL.
August 13, 2020 Filing 1541 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Dean H. Fralix vs CSX Transportation, Inc. Court Name: Allendale County, Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9277443). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer)Wray, Ronald) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2939-JMC.
August 13, 2020 Filing 1540 COMPLAINT TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc. vs Jessica Renee Crowley Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9277422). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit Covenants Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Summons)Farley, William) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2938-RBH.
August 13, 2020 Filing 1539 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Geri Williams vs TD Bank, N.A. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas Greenville County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9277300). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Complaint, Acceptance of Service, Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Asper, Lucas) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2937-TMC-KFM.
August 13, 2020 Filing 1538 COMPLAINT Thomas Sutton vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/13/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02936 TMC MHC
August 13, 2020 Filing 1537 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John C. Nelums vs Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9276482). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee, #4 LR 26.01 Answers for PHH Mortgage Corporation, in its individual capacity and as successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, #5 LR 26.01 Answers for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.)Kelchner, John) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2932-JMC-PJG.
August 13, 2020 Filing 1536 NOTICE OF REMOVAL MATTHEW ELMORE vs ANDREW M. SAUL Court Name: Court of Common Pleas for Lee County, South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents)de Holl, Andrew) Modified on 8/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02946 MGL KFM
August 12, 2020 Filing 1535 COMPLAINT WILLIAM ALLEN vs BLACKBAUD, INC. CHARLESTON Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9275268). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Segui, Harper) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2930-RMG.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1534 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kisha Johnson vs Prisma Health Upstate Court Name: Spartanburg County Common Pleas, SC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9274458). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)McDonald, Charles) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2928-HMH-JDA.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1533 COMPLAINT Majure vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 8/12/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02927 MGL SVH
August 12, 2020 Filing 1532 COMPLAINT Karla Perkins vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 8/12/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02926 BHH MGB
August 12, 2020 Filing 1531 COMPLAINT Banner Life Insurance Company vs Brittany Dunsford Henry Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9273360). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Brittany Dunsford Henry, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Devlin, Chadwick) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2924-BHH.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1530 COMPLAINT Scarlett Rayne Cooper vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/12/2020 (mnas). 0:20-2917 BHH PJG
August 12, 2020 Filing 1529 COMPLAINT Kimberly C. Brown vs Eaton Corporation Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9272959). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Clark, Pheobe) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2922-JMC-TER.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1528 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jaclyn Fallara vs Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9272682). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)McCoy, Ellison) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2920-DCN.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1527 COMPLAINT Heather Denise Gossett vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/12/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02916 TMC TER
August 12, 2020 Filing 1526 COMPLAINT Aleksandra Soboleski vs Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Associates' Health and Welfare Plan Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9272616). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2919-TMC.
August 12, 2020 Filing 1525 COMPLAINT April Shoemaker vs United HealthCare Insurance Company Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9272601). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 8/12/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2918-BHH.
August 11, 2020 Filing 1524 COMPLAINT Cynthia Joy Owens vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Addendum motion to proceed in forma pauperis)Lowery, Marie) Modified on 8/11/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02907 CMC KFM
August 11, 2020 Filing 1523 COMPLAINT Barbara Williams vs Ty Edward Schuring Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9270743). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Smith, Kevin) Modified on 8/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2898-TMC.
August 10, 2020 Filing 1522 COMPLAINT Deidre Iona Sims vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 8/10/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02892 RMG TER
August 10, 2020 Filing 1521 COMPLAINT ROBIN HUNT vs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BEAUFORT Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9269004). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A SF95, #2 Exhibit Ex B Denial of Claim, #3 Exhibit Ex C Photo, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers, #6 LR 26.03 Answers, #7 Summons DOJ, #8 Summons William Barr, #9 Summons US Atty SC, #10 Summons Navy Beaufort)Liska, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2894-BHH.
August 10, 2020 Filing 1520 COMPLAINT Terrie Shepherd vs Andrew Saul Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9268951). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/10/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02891 PJG
August 10, 2020 Filing 1519 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Allied Eastern Indemnity Co. vs MST-FASERTECHNIK GmbH Court Name: Florence Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9268826). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Yount, Adam) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2890-SAL.
August 10, 2020 Filing 1518 COMPLAINT Eva Thao vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9268150). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/10/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02887 DCN SVH
August 10, 2020 Filing 1517 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Theodore Bolick vs Phillip Thompson Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9268114). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Johnson, James) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2888-RBH-KDW.
August 10, 2020 Filing 1516 COMPLAINT Samara Haqq vs Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Supporting Documents)Garner, Everett) Modified on 8/10/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02886 DCN SVH
August 10, 2020 Filing 1515 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Bradley Powers and Melanie Powers vs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Court Name: Spartanburg County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9267260). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint Part 1, #3 Exhibit Complaint Part 2, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit Rule 26.01 Answers)Sumner, Robert) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). Case originally submitted on 08/07/2020 - See ECF No. #1513 . case number 7:20-cv-2884-BHH.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1514 COMPLAINT Eric Hatcher vs Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9266638). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Shutt, Nekki) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2883-JMC.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1513 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint Part 1, #3 Exhibit Complaint Part 2, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit Rule 26.01 Answers)(Sumner, Robert) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). Please see ECF No. #1515 for filing fee. Case number 7:20-cv-2884-BHH.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1512 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Johnny Mack Kinder vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9266172). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Pleading, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Defendants' Answers to Local Civil Rule 26.01, DSC Interrogatories)Flippin, Todd) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2882-JFA-KDW.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1511 COMPLAINT David Justice vs A B Beverage Company, Inc. Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9265973). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Whetstone, Charles) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2885-JMC.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1510 COMPLAINT Lee vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 8/7/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02881 DCC KDW
August 7, 2020 Filing 1509 COMPLAINT O'Shea vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 8/7/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02878 DCN KDW
August 7, 2020 Filing 1508 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Doyle J. Dreesen vs Premier Assurance Group, LLC Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9265600). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court Documents)Jones, Jay) Modified on 8/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2879-MBS
August 7, 2020 Filing 1507 COMPLAINT Mark Fultz vs Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9265236). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Plt's Answers LR 26.01, #3 Summons Summons)Richardson, Vanessa) Modified on 8/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2877-RMG.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1506 COMPLAINT Stanley Greer vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2874-RMG-KFM.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1505 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Nicole L. Ford vs M.S.A., Inc. d/b/a MSA Delivery Service Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9263916). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Main Document Jury Demand, #4 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #5 Main Document Answer)Highfield, Duke) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2873-JMC.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1504 COMPLAINT Tiffany Simmons vs Andrew Saul Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2872-JMC-KDW.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1503 COMPLAINT Vonea Huger vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9263568). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Miller, Bruce) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2871-MGL.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1502 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John W. Daniel vs PCG Claims, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas Beaufort County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9263527). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal of State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Documents Filed State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #6 Supporting Documents Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)Weatherly, Lee) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2870-DCN.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1501 COMPLAINT SHELLEY KEITH vs GENERALI U.S. BRANCH Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9263340). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: CSA Travel Protection Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet : Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons : Generali U.S. Branch, #4 LR 26.01 Answers : Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Appel, Ross) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2869-RMG
August 6, 2020 Filing 1500 COMPLAINT Dora May Turner vs Commissioner of SSA Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Appeals Council Decision, #2 IFP Application, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to US Attorney, #6 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 8/6/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02861 JMC TER
August 6, 2020 Filing 1499 COMPLAINT Shirley Whitfield, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Whitfield vs The United States of America, Acting By and Through Its Agency, The Internal Revenue Service Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9262840). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Muller, Douglas) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2860-RMG.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1498 COMPLAINT Christina Lynn Doran vs Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Appeals Council Decision, #2 Application to Proceed IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 8/6/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02862 MGL PJG
August 6, 2020 Filing 1497 COMPLAINT Donna McQueen vs Brantley Delasamie Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9262576). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Berger, Kenneth) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2859-TMC.
August 6, 2020 Filing 1496 COMPLAINT Francisco Olvera vs City of Wahalla Anderson Division. Summons, Complaint, Answers to Local 26.01 Interrogatories and Proposed Summons ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9261925). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's Answers to Local 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Coversheet, #3 Summons Proposed Summons - Defendant City of Walhalla, #4 Summons Proposed Summons - Defendant Brinson, #5 Summons Proposed Summons - Defendant Hayes, #6 Summons Proposed Summons - Smith)Denny, Keith) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2857-DCC-KFM.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1495 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Angela Bone vs Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Court Name: Lexington County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9261443). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers, #4 Supporting Documents Answer and Third Party Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer and Third Party Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Answer and Third Party Complaint, #7 Summons Third Party Summons)Roberts, Randi) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2856-JMC.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1494 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John W. Russ vs City of Hartsville Court Name: Darlington County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9261254). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Main Document)Plyler, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2855-SAL-TER.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1493 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Charleston Division. Thompson Construction Group, Inc. and Roy Laverne Bolyn v. Thomas Boyd, Debtor and Pamela Simmons-Beasley, Trustee (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal doc.125, #2 Notice of Appeal doc. 126, #3 Transmittal of Notice of Appeals Letter)(sphipps-USBK, ) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2854-SAL.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1492 COMPLAINT Julie Oglesby vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02852 SAL KFM
August 5, 2020 Filing 1491 COMPLAINT Sharond Lewis vs Jimmy Darell Fuller Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9260196). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Mullis, Pamela) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2851-JFA.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1490 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jeremy Smith vs Michelin Tire Corporation Court Name: SC Court of Common Pleas - Lexington ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9260266). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ragland-Davis, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Samples, Thomas) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2850-JMC.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1489 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Darvin Cannon, Jr. vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Kershaw County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9260184). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Service)Lindemann, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2849-JMC-PJG.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1488 COMPLAINT Trisha Fravala vs Foster and Monroe, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9260048). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Bland, Chauntel) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2848-BHH.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1487 COMPLAINT Derek Milton vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mnas). 1:20-2843 DCC SVH
August 5, 2020 Filing 1486 COMPLAINT Tammie Thompson vs Ciox Health, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9259781). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Defendant Ciox Health, LLC, #4 Summons to Defendant ScanSTAT Technologies, LLC)Bradley, James) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2847-BHH.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1485 COMPLAINT Heide Russell vs Andrew W. Saul Commissioner of Social Security Clinton Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9259757). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02844 RMG JDA
August 5, 2020 Filing 1484 COMPLAINT Patricia Julian Britton vs Eric Degar Roberts Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9259551). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Intermodal Bridge Transport, Inc., #3 Summons Defendant Degars, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories)Lynn, Sydney) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2842-SAL.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1483 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Gary Scheer Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9259220). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Gary Scheer)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2840-BHH.
August 5, 2020 Filing 1482 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs John Kelly Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9259208). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to John Kelly, #4 Summons to Kelly Financial)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2839-BHH.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1481 COMPLAINT Susan Speir vs Randall Speir Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9258466). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TOD Designation, #2 Exhibit B - Buy-Sell Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Randall Speir, #5 Summons The Short Run Stamping Company, #6 Summons The Short Run Stamping Co. of Virginia, #7 Summons Short Run Stamping of Puerto Rico, #8 LR 26.01 Answers)Gooding, Benjamin) Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2837-SAL.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1480 NOTICE OF REMOVAL James Edmonds vs Progressive Northern Insurance Company Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9258295). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Complaint, #3 Supporting Documents Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Murphy, John) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2835-MGL.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1479 COMPLAINT Alexis Solheim vs John Doe Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9257821). (Attachments: #1 Summons to Hands126, LLC, #2 Summons to John Doe, #3 Summons to Promobile, Inc., #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Senn, Karlen) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2831-RMG.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1478 COMPLAINT Shawnathon R. Faison vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02830 DCC JDA
August 4, 2020 Filing 1477 COMPLAINT Tina Lynn Presley vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9257745). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Owens, Brett) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02829 DCC PJG
August 4, 2020 Filing 1476 COMPLAINT Jeroline Brunson vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02828 DCC KFM
August 4, 2020 Filing 1475 COMPLAINT Laird Minor vs US Department of the Treasury Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9257309). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Summons)Carpenter, James) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2836-BHH.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1474 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Donna Stone, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Grant Stone vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Court Name: Florence County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9257171). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 MetLife's Answer to Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2827-RBH.
August 4, 2020 Filing 1473 COMPLAINT Brandy Renee Bailey vs Commissioner of SSA South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Bramhall, Evan) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02825 MGL MGB
August 4, 2020 Filing 1472 COMPLAINT Lacey Kaye Burnett vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02822 RBH PJG
August 4, 2020 Filing 1471 COMPLAINT Iris Moore vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02821 TMC JDA Modified on 8/5/2020 (bshr, ). corrected case number 8:20-cv-2838-TMC-JDA.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1470 COMPLAINT Hayden Amerson Derrick vs John Franklin Jennings Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9255384). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Pittman, Amanda) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2819-TMC.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1469 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Adam Jordan vs Regions Bank, NA Court Name: Common Pleas for Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9254988). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Caskey, Mary) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2817-JMC.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1468 COMPLAINT Aanal Narendrakumar Patel vs Kenneth Cuccinelli Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9254628). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons USAO, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USCIS)Banias, Bradley) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2816-SAL.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1467 COMPLAINT J.M. Smith Corporation d/b/a Burlington Drug Company vs Toms Family Pharmacy, Inc. Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9254382). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2815-TMC.
August 3, 2020 Filing 1466 COMPLAINT J.M. Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company vs Burns, Incorporated d/b/a Rushing Drug Company d/b/a Tupelo Family Pharmacy Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9254298). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C Tupelo Family Pharmacy Statement, #4 Exhibit D Rushing Drug Co. Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 LR 26.01 Answers)McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2814-DCC.
July 31, 2020 Filing 1465 COMPLAINT Jill Mahoney vs Robert Jones Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9252496). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Johnson, Lindsay) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2809-RMG.
July 31, 2020 Filing 1464 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Cynthia Ann Colson vs Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Court Name: State of SC Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9252294). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Notice of Removal)Evert, Jill) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2808-DCN-MHC.
July 31, 2020 Filing 1463 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jeaset Cristal Ibarra vs City of Greenwood Court Name: Civil Court - Greenwood County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9252108). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer of Defendant City of Greenwood, #5 Certificate of Service)Morrison, David) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2807-BHH-KFM.
July 31, 2020 Filing 1462 COMPLAINT Curtis Pinckney vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9250922). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2801-TMC-SVH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1461 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Shemaiah Shell vs Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest Court Name: Richland County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9250077). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Defendant Answer to Complaint)Domin, Timothy) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2800-TLW.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1460 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Elizabeth Hendricks vs Kevin Crowe Court Name: Pickens County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9249521). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Snyder, Amy) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2799-DCC.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1459 COMPLAINT Charles Robert Ashmore, Jr. vs Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents request for waiver of filing fee)Valtorta, Laura) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2794-DCC-SVH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1458 COMPLAINT Gitaben Rohit Vaghela vs Kenneth Cuccinelli Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248943). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO, #5 Summons USCIS)Banias, Bradley) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2793-RBH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1457 COMPLAINT Catherine Boso vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2792-RBH-KFM.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1456 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Carolyn E. Ford vs NewRez, LLC Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248923). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filing, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Milam, G) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2789-RBH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1455 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Paul Morphy vs Willie Davis Court Name: Lancaster County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248961). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Service)Lindemann, Andrew) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2788-JMC-SVH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1454 COMPLAINT Brooke Bivens (former Brooke Ash) vs The United States of America Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248842). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Cooper, Michael) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2878-BHH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1453 COMPLAINT Lisa McGraw Williams vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2786-MGL-PJG.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1452 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Steve Minnich Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248772). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2785-BHH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1451 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Michael Cook Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9248726). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2784-BHH.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1450 COMPLAINT United States of America vs $111,622.00 in United States Currency Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Agent Verification, #3 Supporting Documents Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest in Rem)Sherard, Carrie) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2783-TLW.
July 30, 2020 Filing 1449 COMPLAINT Edward Webb vs Commissioner of Social Security Administration South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Bramhall, Evan) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2782-RBH-MGB.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1448 COMPLAINT Alvin Wayne Patton vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9247425). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Consent to Magistrate)Dunn, Geoff) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2778-TMC-MHC.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1447 COMPLAINT Amanda Marie Gilmer vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9247212). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/29/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02775 DCC MGB
July 29, 2020 Filing 1446 COMPLAINT DR Horton, Inc vs Frankenmuth Mutual Spartanburg Division Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9247046). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet -Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Summons To be Issued, #3 LR 26.01 Answers -DRH Response to LR 26.01 INT)Broderick, Olivia) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2774-DCC.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1445 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Judy Diane Miller vs The County of Lexington Court Name: County of Lexington Common Pleas, 11th Judicial Circuit ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9246746). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet for Removal from State Court, #3 LR 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Certificate of Service on Plaintiff's counsel)Pauley, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2773-TLW.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1444 COMPLAINT Joshua Comstock vs Juul Labs, Inc. Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9246232). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Adam Bowens, #3 Summons Alternative Ingredients, #4 Summons Altria Enterprises, #5 Summons Altria Group Inc, #6 Summons Citgo Petroleum Corporation, #7 Summons Coremark Holding Co Inc, #8 Summons Eby-Brown Co. LLC, #9 Summons ELiquitech Inc., #10 Summons Hoyoung Huh, #11 Summons James Monsees, #12 Summons Juul Labs Inc, #13 Summons Marathon Petroleum Co. LP, #14 Summons McLane Co Inc, #15 Summons Mother Murphy's Labs Inc, #16 Summons Nicholas Pritzker, #17 Summons Phillip Morris USA Inc, #18 Summons Riaz Valani, #19 Summons Tobacco Technology Inc, #20 LR 26.01 Answers by Plaintiff)Guerry, John) Modified on 7/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2779-MDL.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1443 COMPLAINT Jaclyn Rideau vs National Veterinary Associates, Inc. Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9246190). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Tong, Emily) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2772-RMG-MGB.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1442 COMPLAINT Leisa Howard vs Andrew Saul Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/29/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02771 TMC KDW
July 29, 2020 Filing 1441 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John Doe vs Deputy Barnes Court Name: 2019-CP-04-01559 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9246064). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 State Court Documents Answer to Amended Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service)Pruitt, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2770-HMH.
July 29, 2020 Filing 1440 COMPLAINT Bradham vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed IFP)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 7/29/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02769 TMC JDA
July 28, 2020 Filing 1439 COMPLAINT Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. vs Brian W. Reed Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9244410). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Unsworn Declaration, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Answer, #5 Summons Reed, #6 Summons Rutland, #7 Summons RRR Farms)Wood, Robert) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2768-MGL.
July 28, 2020 Filing 1438 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Steven Fishman, Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel I. Fishman vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Court Name: Horry ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9244401). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2767-RBH.
July 28, 2020 Filing 1437 COMPLAINT First Acceptance Insurance Company vs Estate of Johnnie Douglas, Sr., Estate of Michael Smith, Estate of Patrice Latoya McFadden, and Roland McFadden Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9244277). (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, John) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2766-RBH.
July 28, 2020 Filing 1436 COMPLAINT Dominique Gibson vs Andrew Saul Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/28/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02765 TMC TER
July 28, 2020 Filing 1435 COMPLAINT Richard Gurley vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/28/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02764 SAL TER
July 28, 2020 Filing 1434 COMPLAINT Christopher Burrell vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Walhalla Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/28/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02762 RBH MHC
July 28, 2020 Filing 1433 COMPLAINT Mark Dwayne Peer vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Iva Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/28/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02763 TMC MHC
July 27, 2020 Filing 1432 COMPLAINT Jennifer A. Youngs vs William Barr Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9242235). (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Local Rule Interrogatory Responses)Gaffney, Amy) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2758-JMC-SVH.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1431 NOTICE OF REMOVAL USF Holland, Incorporated, In Re: Clarence Dawson vs Res-Care, Inc. Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9242154). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)Crites, J) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2757-JFA.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1430 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Umanda Williams vs Williamsburg County School District Court Name: County of Williamsburg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9242138). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Notice to Cir Court, #3 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff)Story, Ashley) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2760-SAL.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1429 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Isabell Lucas vs Ben Mrad Moezl Court Name: Colleton County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241955). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons & Complaint, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Davis, Benjamin) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2756-BHH.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1427 COMPLAINT John Doe vs Mark Keel Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241726). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)Dunn, Susan) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2755-MGL.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1426 COMPLAINT Treli Schneeb Sessions vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241546). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02752 RBH JDA
July 27, 2020 Filing 1425 COMPLAINT Donavon Chestnutt vs Bryan Stirling Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241456). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)Chaney, David) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2753-RMG-MGB.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1424 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Scott Kelly vs Argos USA LLC Court Name: SC County of Jasper ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241134). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit State Court Filings EX 1, #5 Exhibit Aff of Service EX 2, #6 Exhibit Notice filing Notice Removal EX 3, #7 Exhibit MP Declaration EX 4)Shytle, Courtney) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2746-RMG.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1423 COMPLAINT Pamela W. Nicholson vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9241104). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02751 DCC MHC
July 27, 2020 Filing 1422 COMPLAINT Smitha Patrice Littlejohn vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02742 TMC TER
July 27, 2020 Filing 1421 COMPLAINT Bobbie Lesheone Kelly vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02741 TMC KDW
July 27, 2020 Filing 1420 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Rodney Smalls vs Charleston County Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9240576). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Jackson, Robin) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2743-DCN-MHC.
July 27, 2020 Filing 1419 COMPLAINT Daniel Parris vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02740 JMC TER
July 27, 2020 Filing 1418 COMPLAINT Bernard McKnight vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9240203). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02739 TMC JDA
July 26, 2020 Filing 1417 COMPLAINT Kimberly Griffith vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02737 DCC JDA
July 25, 2020 Filing 1416 COMPLAINT Protection and Advocacy for People with Disabilities, Inc. vs James Alton Cannon, Jr., in his official capacity as Charleston County Sheriff Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9239815). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Charleston County Sheriff's Office Defendants, #3 Summons to Charleston County School District, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Main Document Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Louis Kraus, M.D., #7 Exhibit A to Kraus Aff- Kraus CV, #8 Exhibit B to Krauss Aff- List of Documents Reviewed, #9 Exhibit C to Kraus Aff- Publications Relied Upon, #10 Exhibit D to Krauss Aff- AACAP Solitary Confinement of Juvenile Offenders, #11 Exhibit E to Krauss Aff- APA Position Stmt on Solitary Confinement of Juveniles, #12 Exhibit F to Krauss Aff- NCOCHC Solitary Confinement, #13 Exhibit G to Krauss Aff- AMA Adopts New Policies to Improve Health of Nation, #14 Exhibit H to Krauss Aff- United Nations Rules for the Protection of Juveniles, #15 Exhibit B- Affidavit of John P. Rhoads, #16 Exhibit A to Rhoads Aff- Santa Cruz article, #17 Exhibit B to Rhoads Aff- Rhoads CV, #18 Exhibit C to Rhoads Aff- Rhoads Interview Summaries, #19 Exhibit D to Rhoads Aff- Not in Isolation, #20 Exhibit C- Emails from Pennington to Beatty)Brunson, Robert) Modified on 7/27/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2738-DCN.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1415 COMPLAINT Kinsey Knight vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees and Costs)Martin, Alton) Modified on 7/24/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02734 TMC MGB
July 24, 2020 Filing 1414 COMPLAINT Soule vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 7/24/2020 (mnas ). 6:20-cv-02730 DCC KFM
July 24, 2020 Filing 1413 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jabari Charles Mosley vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9239389). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Hardin, Claude) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2733-BHH-JDA.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1412 COMPLAINT State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Tracy Michelle Tiller Greenwood Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9239171). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Domin, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2732-TMC.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1411 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jessica Taylor, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated vs Charleston Southern University Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, Ninth Judicial Circuit, Case No. 2020-CP-10-02357 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9239188). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Johnson, Wilbur) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2731-BHH.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1410 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tequila Palmer vs Carl Kinard Court Name: Columbia ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9239090). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Walker, Breon) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2729-MGL.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1409 COMPLAINT Arauco North America, Inc. vs Marlboro Electric Cooperative, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9238692). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1-Base Agmt 2011, #4 Exhibit 2-2014 Addendum, #5 Exhibit 3-2017 Generator Agmt, #6 Exhibit 4-June 1 Invoice, #7 Exhibit 5-June 5 Discrepency Letter, #8 Exhibit 6-June 5 MEC Response, #9 Exhibit 7-Revised Invoice, #10 Exhibit 8-Base Energy Overcharges, #11 Exhibit 9-July Invoice, #12 Exhibit 10-July Invoice Letter, #13 Exhibit 11-MDF Facility Closure Letter, #14 Exhibit 12-Carroll Declaration, #15 LR 26.01 Answers)Munson, Keith) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2728-SAL.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1408 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kenneth Owens vs Mason Dixon Intermodal, Inc. d/b/a Universal Intermodal Services, Inc. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9238469). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to NOR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #6 Main Document Answer)Highfield, Duke) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2723-BHH.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1407 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Anne Campbell vs Carrier Enterprise, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, Sumter County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9238392). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Hemric, Steven) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2722-MGL-PJG.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1406 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Courtney Young vs CSL Plasma Inc. Court Name: South Carolina Court of Common Pleas, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9238315). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Action Coversheet, #2 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint filed in South Carolina Court of Common Pleas, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Richland County, #3 LR 26.01 Answers CSL Plasma, Inc.'s Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Zwing Bryant, Lyndey) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2720-CMC-PJG.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1405 COMPLAINT United States of America vs James T. McLaren Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Barnett, John) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2714-MGL.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1404 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pay Tel Communications vs Lattice Incorporated Court Name: Colleton ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9237243). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Bell, Kevin) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2713-RMG.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1403 COMPLAINT The Cincinnati Insurance Company vs Meetze Plumbing Co., Inc. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9237006). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 LR 26.01 Answers, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)Wieters, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2719-SAL.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1402 COMPLAINT Tri-Lift NC, Inc. vs Drive Automotive Industries of America, Inc. Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9236656). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - April 1 Invoice, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - April 7 Invoice, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - April 8 Invoices, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - 2019 Overtime Invoice, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - 2020 Overtime Invoice, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons - Drive Automotive, #9 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers by Plaintiff)Huegel, Erin) Modified on 7/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2712-HMH.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1401 COMPLAINT Harold Rhodes vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9236030). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Owens, Brett) Modified on 7/23/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02711 RBH TER
July 23, 2020 Filing 1400 COMPLAINT Amy Jo Elizabeth Mackenzie vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/23/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02709 MGL KDW
July 23, 2020 Filing 1399 COMPLAINT Kathy Earle vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/23/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02707 DCC PJG
July 23, 2020 Filing 1398 COMPLAINT Cynthia Holland vs Life Insurance Company of North America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9235369). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 7/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2705-HMH.
July 23, 2020 Filing 1397 COMPLAINT Debra Moss vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/23/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02704 TMC SVH
July 23, 2020 Filing 1396 COMPLAINT Millissia Diane King vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Piedmont Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02703 DCC JDA
July 22, 2020 Filing 1395 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Brady O'Leary, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated vs TrustedID, Inc. Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9234115). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Terry Griffin, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Barker, Rita) Modified on 7/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2702-MGL.
July 22, 2020 Filing 1394 COMPLAINT Rachel McJunkin vs Lake Keowee Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, LLC Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9233611). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Murphy, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02699 DCC KFM
July 22, 2020 Filing 1393 COMPLAINT Johnathan Riley vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02697 RBH TER
July 22, 2020 Filing 1392 COMPLAINT Mary Kathleen White vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02696 RBH SVH
July 22, 2020 Filing 1391 COMPLAINT Garcia vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02694 JMC MHC
July 22, 2020 Filing 1390 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Brandon Keith Craig vs Quality Carriers, Inc. Court Name: Pickens County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9232093). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Answer to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)Highfield, Duke) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02693 TMC
July 22, 2020 Filing 1389 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Pickens County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Answer to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Highfield, Duke) Modified on 7/22/2020 (bshr, ). Please see ECF No. #1390 for corrected filing with filing fee. case number 8:20-cv-02693-TMC.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1388 COMPLAINT CROWN CASTLE FIBER LLC vs CITY OF CHARLESTON Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9231591). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CPCN, #2 Exhibit B - Small Wireless Ordinance, #3 Exhibit C - Denial Ltr. CHS-026, #4 Exhibit D - Denial Ltr. CHS-027, #5 Exhibit E - Denial Ltr. CHS-028, #6 Exhibit F - Denial Ltr. CHS-032, #7 Exhibit G - Ltr. re CHS-001, #8 Exhibit H - Ltr. re CHS-016, #9 Exhibit I Ltr. re CHS-023, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 LR 26.01 Answers, #13 Financial Certificate Corporate Disclosure)Baker, Charles) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02692 DCN
July 21, 2020 Filing 1387 COMPLAINT Julia Adams Bean vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents Consent to Magistrate, #4 Supporting Documents Informa Pauperis)Dunn, Geoff) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02691 RBH MGB
July 21, 2020 Filing 1386 COMPLAINT Steve Blandenburg vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2690-TMC-MHC.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1385 COMPLAINT Latasha Proctor Rowland vs Andrew Sauls Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2689-TMC-KDW.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1384 COMPLAINT Gary R. Moore vs MONSANTO COMPANY Western District of South Carolina Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9231026). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Christian, Joshua) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2688-MDL.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1383 COMPLAINT Dawn Clemons vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/21/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02686 TMC KFM
July 21, 2020 Filing 1382 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sean McDonnell vs Speedway LLC Court Name: Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9229575). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Corporate confirmation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Crites, J) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2684-DCN.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1381 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Timothy Kottke Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9229590). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to T Kottke, #4 Summons to Synergy)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2683-BHH.
July 21, 2020 Filing 1380 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Gwendolyn C. Thompson vs Fluor Federal Services, Inc. Court Name: Greenville County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9229376). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Satterfield, Andreas) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2682-DCC-KFM.
July 20, 2020 Filing 1379 COMPLAINT Sheri L. Jefferson vs C.R. Bard, Inc. South Carolina Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9228772). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Harris, Walter) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2685-JMC.
July 20, 2020 Filing 1378 COMPLAINT Arch Specialty Insurance Company vs Hardwick & Son Roofing & Sheet Metal, Inc. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9227371). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Sharpe, Patrick) Modified on 7/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2680-SAL.
July 20, 2020 Filing 1377 COMPLAINT Casanta-Floryance vs Saul Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9227989). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02678 RMG MGB
July 20, 2020 Filing 1376 COMPLAINT Alphine Bradley vs Med-Trans Corporation Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9227667). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Invoice and EOB- Redacted, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Summons)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 7/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2679-SAL.
July 20, 2020 Filing 1375 COMPLAINT Nancy Erwin vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9226182). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02671 DCC PJG
July 17, 2020 Filing 1374 Defendants TD Bank, N.A. and Amy Brinkley Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant.(McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1373 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1357 Notice of Removal,, on behalf of Defendants, TD Bank, N.A. and Amy Brinkley by Thomas William McGee, III on behalf of Defendant (McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1372 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William McGee, III on behalf of Defendant (McGee, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1371 Defendants First Community Bank and Michael Crapps Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant.(Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1370 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1357 Notice of Removal,, on behalf of Defendants First Community Bank and Michael Crapps by Cory E Manning on behalf of Defendant (Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1369 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory E Manning on behalf of Defendant (Manning, Cory) Modified on 7/20/2020: attorney instructed to file in case 6-20-cv-2651-TMC (kmca).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1368 COMPLAINT Maxine Mitchum Gibson vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225181). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02666 RBH KDW
July 17, 2020 Filing 1367 COMPLAINT American National Property & Casualty Company vs Christian C. Wylie Rock HIll Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225151). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Hanna, George) Modified on 7/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2672-TLW.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1366 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Loretta Byers vs Walmart, Inc. Court Name: York County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225132). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Motion to Strike Attorney's Fees, #5 Certificate of Service - Motion to Strike, #6 Memo in Support of Motion to Strike, #7 Certificate of Service - Memorandum, #8 Answer of Defendant, #9 Certificate of Service - Answer, #10 LR 26.01 Answers, #11 Certificate of Service - Rule 26.01 Responses)Laffitte, Rebecca) Modified on 7/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2669-SAL.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1365 COMPLAINT Hartford Fire Insurance Company vs Medical Society of South Carolina Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225108). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories)Mahon, Christy) Modified on 7/20/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2668-RMG.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1364 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kimberly Lundmark vs Ehad Al-Shaer Court Name: Jasper County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224913). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents Answer of Defendant, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 State Court Documents)Griffith, Ernest) Modified on 7/20/2020 (bshr, ). 9:20-cv-2667-DCN.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1363 COMPLAINT Tory Robinson vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02664 DCC SVH
July 17, 2020 Filing 1362 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Chinessia Lee vs Bi-Lo, LLC Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224600). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers, #3 Main Document Answer, #4 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #5 State Court Documents Proof of Service)Holt, Ryan) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02663 HMH
July 17, 2020 Filing 1361 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mobilia Consulting, LLC vs Housing Works, Inc. Court Name: Charleston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224601). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Sumner, Robert) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02662 BHH
July 17, 2020 Filing 1360 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Verderia Stockman vs Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. Court Name: York ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224290). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Henthorne, D) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02660 MGL PJG
July 17, 2020 Filing 1359 NOTICE OF REMOVAL David Wilson vs Southern Crown Partners Court Name: Orangeburg Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224134). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Reeves, George) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02655 JMC SVH
July 17, 2020 Filing 1358 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Geraldine Deloris Bedenbaugh vs Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. Court Name: Richland County County of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224135). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.'s Answers to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)McKissock, Timothy) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-02654 MGL
July 17, 2020 Filing 1357 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Peay and Associates, LLC vs First Community Bank Court Name: Laurens ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9223727). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit C - Georgia SOS Business Information, #7 Exhibit D - Chart of calculations of agent fees, #8 Exhibit E - Chart of calculations of lender fees)Smith, Benjamin) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02651 TMC
July 17, 2020 Filing 1356 COMPLAINT Louis Scott, Sr. vs Shelton Hardy, Jr. Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9223540). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Hawkins, Daryl) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02649 SAL
July 17, 2020 Filing 1355 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Samuel Duell Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9223549). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02647 BHH
July 17, 2020 Filing 1354 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Melinda K. Williams vs SpartanNash Associates, LLC Court Name: Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9223387). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Thompson, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02646 SAL
July 17, 2020 Filing 1353 COMPLAINT John Kahyaoglu vs Life Insurance Company of North America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9223008). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02645 DCC
July 16, 2020 Filing 1352 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Debra Bell Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222724). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Debra Bell)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2644-BHH.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1351 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Brian Swerdlow Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222712). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Anchor Financial, #4 Summons to Swerdlow)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2643-BHH.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1350 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jack R. Griffing vs Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Court Name: Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222656). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents State Court File as of 7/16/20)Techman, Jennifer) Modified on 7/17/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02661 MBS
July 16, 2020 Filing 1349 COMPLAINT LISA B WOOD vs THE HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY CHARLESTON Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222485). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Photo of Plaintiff's vehicle, #5 Exhibit Photo of pre-surgery x-ray, #6 Exhibit Photo of surgery showing plate and screw, #7 Exhibit Covenant Not to Execute, #8 Exhibit April 3, 2020 letter from Attorney Gibson to Adjuster Starke, #9 Exhibit April 28, 2020, letter from Starke extending offer of $90,000, #10 Exhibit May 22, 20 letter from Attorney Gibson to Starke with settlement demand of $425,000, #11 Exhibit June 9, 2020, letter from Starke increasing offer to $99,000, #12 Exhibit June 30, 2020, Attorney Driggers send time demand to Starke, #13 Exhibit July 2, 2020, Attorney Driggers sent letter correcting deadline of time demand, #14 Exhibit July 2, 2020, Starke letter to Attorney Driggers rejecting demand and reaffirming offer of $99,000)Driggers, Johnny) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2640-RMG.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1348 COMPLAINT Bennie Mitchell vs Andrew Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/16/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02639 DCC PJG
July 16, 2020 Filing 1347 COMPLAINT Suzanne Scibek vs Laura Gee Gilbert Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222303). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Smith, Kevin) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2638-DCN.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1346 COMPLAINT Utica Mutual Insurance Company vs The Propane Store, Inc. Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221957). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)Moghaddassi, Soroush) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2637-DCC.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1345 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tress Wright, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Willie Mae Wright vs Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. Court Name: South Carolina Court of Common Pleas- Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221729). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Encompass Health's Answers to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Chris Daughtry's Answers to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)McKissock, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2636-MGL.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1344 COMPLAINT Lakeisha S. Tribble vs Commissioner of Social Security Administration South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Duggan, John) Modified on 7/16/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02631 DCC JDA
July 16, 2020 Filing 1343 COMPLAINT David Oppenheimer vs IFS Group, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221392). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyrighted Work, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copyright Registration Certificate, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's 26.01 Responses, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Cover Sheet, #5 Summons To IFS)Pittman, Jason) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2630-DCN.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1342 COMPLAINT Barbara Annamarie Veit-Harwell vs James S. Worrell Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221232). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Defendant Worrell, #3 Summons Summons to Defendant KGB Logistics, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories)Lynn, Sydney) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2641-SAL.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1341 COMPLAINT Cody Queen vs Zefco, Inc. Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221185). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Overtime Per Diem, #2 Exhibit 2 - Paystubs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bonus Pay, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bonus Check, #5 Exhibit 5 - Severance Pay, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 LR 26.01 Answers)LeFever, Grant) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2629-TMC.
July 16, 2020 Filing 1340 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kacithia Jones vs U.S. Bank National Association Court Name: Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9221068). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Jefferson, Meliah) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2635-DCN.
July 15, 2020 Filing 1339 COMPLAINT State Farm Life Insurance Company vs Abigail Rogers Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9219436). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - life insurance policy, #2 Exhibit B - assignment of proceeds of insurance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Abigail Rogers, #5 Summons Joseph Kimpson, #6 Summons Wilfred Rogers, #7 Summons Palmer Memorial Chapel, Inc., #8 Summons American Funeral Financial, LLC, #9 LR 26.01 Answers)Patterson, Cory) Modified on 7/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2627-MGL.
July 15, 2020 Filing 1338 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs Adam Sutton Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9219101). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to Adam Sutton, #4 Summons to Cornerstone Financial)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2624-BHH.
July 15, 2020 Filing 1337 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Swiss Krono SC, LLC vs Christof Industries GMBH n/k/a Christof Industries Global GMBH Court Name: Barnwell Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9218961). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court filings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Hall, Kevin) Modified on 7/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2623-MGL.
July 15, 2020 Filing 1336 COMPLAINT Jamaro Veteigo Spann vs United States Probation Office Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9217901). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Treacy, Robert) Modified on 7/16/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2628-CMC.
July 15, 2020 Filing 1335 COMPLAINT Belinda Cody vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02620 DCN MHC
July 15, 2020 Filing 1334 COMPLAINT Darlene Gulli vs Andrew Saul Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02619 DCC SVH
July 14, 2020 Filing 1333 NOTICE OF REMOVAL William Shepherd vs Danny Almond Court Name: Richland County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9217015). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Summons & Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Rule 26.01 Disclosures)McDonald, Patrick) Modified on 7/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2618-MGL.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1332 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Steven R. Frazier vs Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC Court Name: Horry County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9217026). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Motion to Dismiss or Change Venue, #6 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Thomas Goodman, #7 Exhibit 2 - Prior Order Granting MTD)Waring, Bradish) Modified on 7/15/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2617-SAL.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1331 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Matthew Simmons vs Nathaniel P. Wallace Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9216854). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to NOR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #4 State Court Documents state court docs, #5 Main Document Answer to Second Amended Complaint)Highfield, Duke) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2616-RMG.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1330 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kevin Helms vs Sealing Agents Waterproofing, Inc. Court Name: York County, Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9216371). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Summon and Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Local Rule 26.01 Answerss)White, Daniel) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2615-MGL.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1329 COMPLAINT Ratliff CPA Firm, PC vs Synovus Financial Corp. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9216179). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Synovus Financial, #4 Summons Synovus Bank)Tanenbaum, Mark) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2614-BHH.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1328 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment. ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9215812). McGuffin, Stanley) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mnas). 0:20-mc-00306
July 14, 2020 Filing 1327 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Nancy Blanchard vs PETCO Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. Court Name: Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9215257). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Moody, Donald) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2612-RMG.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1326 COMPLAINT McCants vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 7/14/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02611 TMC TER
July 14, 2020 Filing 1325 COMPLAINT Rama Renee Corn vs Sealed Air Corporation Short Term Disability Plan Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9214912). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2609-MGL.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1324 COMPLAINT Sandra Williams Lindsay vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for filing IFP, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/14/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02607 BHH KFM
July 14, 2020 Filing 1323 COMPLAINT Mark A. Knox vs Ray David Hardee Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9214429). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Bloodgood, Nancy) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2608-SAL-TER.
July 14, 2020 Filing 1322 COMPLAINT Rosa Martin vs Sealed Air Corporation Short Term Disability Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9214409). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2606-HMH.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1321 COMPLAINT BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. vs KINARD'S LLC GREENWOOD Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9214054). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Second Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit Third Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit Lease, #5 Exhibit Thomas Kinard Guaranties, #6 Exhibit Andrew Kinard Guaranties, #7 Exhibit Notice of Default and Acceleration, #8 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #9 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #10 Summons sample or proposed summons)Freeman, William) Modified on 7/14/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2605-HMH.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1320 COMPLAINT Emma Browder vs Everest Receivable Services, Inc. Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9213484). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Bland, Chauntel) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2603-MGL.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1319 COMPLAINT Mary Poteat vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 7/13/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02602 TMC PJG
July 13, 2020 Filing 1317 COMPLAINT Sean Pierre Flattery vs Andrew M. Saul, commissioner of the Social Security Administration Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)Lowery, Marie) Modified on 7/13/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02600 RBH MHC
July 13, 2020 Filing 1316 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Russell C. Geissler vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9212720). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Service)Lindemann, Andrew) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2597-DCC-TER.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1314 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Hucks Pool Company, Inc. vs Colony Insurance Company Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9212351). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Horry County State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Harris, David) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2593-SAL.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1312 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sherrie Mann vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Court Name: Common Pleas, County of Greenville ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9212042). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers State Farm's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings)Norris, Charles) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2591-TMC.
July 13, 2020 Filing 1311 COMPLAINT Jacqueline Morris vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/13/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02590 RBH KFM
July 10, 2020 Filing 1310 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Lathisha L. Riley vs Ross Dress for Less, Inc. Court Name: Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210845). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer of Ross Dress for Less, Inc., #5 Certificate of Service)Griffin, Catharine) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2587-SAL.
July 10, 2020 Filing 1309 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Fred Henry Ballard vs Volvo Car USA, LLC Court Name: Dorchester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210540). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Duda, William) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2586-BHH.
July 10, 2020 Filing 1308 COMPLAINT Roy Rutland vs Monsanto Company Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210479). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Moore, Christopher) Modified on 7/13/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2585-MDL.
July 10, 2020 Filing 1307 COMPLAINT David Bankston vs United States of America Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210378). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Jordan, David) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02584 DCN
July 10, 2020 Filing 1306 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs AMZ Financial Insurance Services, LLC Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210342). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to AMZ Financial Insurance Services)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02581 BHH
July 10, 2020 Filing 1305 COMPLAINT Keisha Walker vs Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210178). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Garner, Everett) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02579 TMC KFM
July 10, 2020 Filing 1304 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Yeadam Oh vs Dasol Pyo Court Name: Clarendon County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210208). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Grantland, John) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02583 RMG
July 10, 2020 Filing 1303 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joseph Baek vs Dasol Pyo Court Name: Clarendon County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210189). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Answer, #5 Certificate of Service)Grantland, John) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02582 RMG
July 10, 2020 Filing 1302 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Corey Robinson vs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Court Name: Charleston County Clerk of Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210146). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Answer)Gardner, Kenyatta) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02580 RMG
July 10, 2020 Filing 1301 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tishama Wright vs Wal-Mart, Inc. Court Name: York County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9210057). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 - Answer of Defendant, #5 Certificate of Service - Answer of Defendant, #6 LR 26.01 Answers, #7 Certificate of Service - Defendant's Responses to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)Montgomery, John) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02578 TLW
July 10, 2020 Filing 1300 COMPLAINT Benjamin Wayne Gosnell vs Associate Warden Gregory Washington Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9209864). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Elliott, Charles) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02577 SAL MGB
July 10, 2020 Filing 1299 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kiara Parks vs IH Services, Inc. Court Name: Greenville County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9209746). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Stephenson, Thomas) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02573 TMC JDA
July 10, 2020 Filing 1298 COMPLAINT Christie Lynn Williams vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice Consent to a Magistrate, #4 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02571 RBH KFM
July 10, 2020 Filing 1297 COMPLAINT Karen Denise Hutchinson vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02569 TMC MGB
July 10, 2020 Filing 1296 COMPLAINT Thelma Lewis vs Town of Moncks Corner Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9208821). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Bojarski, Christopher) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02575 RMG MGB
July 9, 2020 Filing 1295 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Michael Costello vs Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC Court Name: Dorchester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207967). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Barnwell, Brian) Modified on 7/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2566-BHH.
July 9, 2020 Filing 1294 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tara Brice vs Anderson County School District No. Two Board of Trustees Court Name: Anderson County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207895). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Matthews, Eugene) Modified on 7/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2565-DCC.
July 9, 2020 Filing 1293 COMPLAINT Judy O'Shields vs Circle K Inc., d/b/a Kangaroo Express #3416 Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207661). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Clardy, Boyce) Modified on 7/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2564-DCC.
July 9, 2020 Filing 1292 COMPLAINT Teresita Michelle Jones vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 7/9/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02561 PJG
July 9, 2020 Filing 1291 COMPLAINT Wyshonda Davis Bethea vs Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Addendum request for waiver of filing fee)Valtorta, Laura) Modified on 7/9/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02559 TMC TER
July 9, 2020 Filing 1290 COMPLAINT Justin Mackie vs Coconut Joe's IOP LLC., CJ Offering LLC., Joe Petro and Caitlin West, Individually Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207310). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Mullaney, Marybeth) Modified on 7/9/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02562 DCN
July 9, 2020 Filing 1289 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Melissa Hodge vs City of North Charleston Court Name: Charleston County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9206718). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Dorsel, Christopher) Modified on 7/9/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02560 DCN MGB
July 9, 2020 Filing 1288 COMPLAINT Katherine Renee Laboone vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security TBD Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9206414). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents AO 85)Jordan, Woodrow) Modified on 7/9/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02557 DCN MGB
July 9, 2020 Filing 1287 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Ryan M. Cato vs Glock, Inc. Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9206170). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Montgomery, John) Modified on 7/9/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2563-DCN.
July 8, 2020 Filing 1286 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Tiearra Richardson vs Goran Ilievski Court Name: Richland County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9204990). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers Goran Ilievski, #6 LR 26.01 Answers Amero Line, LLC)Keibler, Chase) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2550-MGL.
July 8, 2020 Filing 1285 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Paul C. Nowlin vs Caterpillar Inc. Court Name: Jasper County in South Carolina State Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9204424). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Answer, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Craig, Molly) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2547-DCN.
July 8, 2020 Filing 1284 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Waters at Magnolia Bay, LP vs Vaughn & Melton Consulting Engineers, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9204163). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)West, Allen) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2546-RMG.
July 8, 2020 Filing 1283 COMPLAINT Elbert R. Jenkins vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Easley Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/8/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02544 CMC SVH
July 8, 2020 Filing 1282 COMPLAINT Andre Sweeper vs Vernetia Dozier Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9203961). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)Elliott, Charles) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 1:20-cv-2545-SAL-SVH.
July 8, 2020 Filing 1281 NOTICE OF REMOVAL William Stuart Duncan vs Cenlar Loan Administration & Reporting d/b/a Cenlar Court Name: Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9202911). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Milam, G) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2543-DCN.
July 7, 2020 Filing 1280 COMPLAINT Joye Laird vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit informa pauperis, #4 Exhibit consent to magistrate)Dunn, Geoff) Modified on 7/8/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02542 TMC JDA
July 7, 2020 Filing 1279 COMPLAINT CORI COCKFIELD vs SEQUIUM ASSET SOLUTIONS, LLC CHARLESTON Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9201689). (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Answers)Segui, Harper) Modified on 7/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2540-BHH.
July 7, 2020 Filing 1278 COMPLAINT USA vs Brian L. Armonat Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Attachment A, #6 Exhibit Attachment B, #7 Exhibit Attachment C, #8 Exhibit Attachment D, #9 Exhibit Attachment E, #10 LR 26.01 Answers)Sneed, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2538-TMC.
July 7, 2020 Filing 1277 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Derry Drunt Livingston vs Jackie C. Witherspoon Court Name: Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9199980). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A: State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Chandler, J W) Modified on 7/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2537-DCN-MGB.
July 6, 2020 Filing 1276 COMPLAINT Katrina Lynn Little-Warner vs Andrew Saul Aiken Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 7/6/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02530 BHH SVH
July 6, 2020 Filing 1275 COMPLAINT Ramona Johnson vs United States a/k/a United States of America Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9197195). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement from USPS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #3 Summons Summons USPS Georgetown, #4 Summons Summons 2, #5 Summons Summons 3, #6 Summons Summons 4, #7 Summons Summons 5, #8 Summons Summons 6, #9 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 answers)Maguire, Ian) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2533-BHH.
July 6, 2020 Filing 1273 COMPLAINT Allstate Insurance Company vs Patricia Damico Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9197485). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Contracts, #3 Exhibit Lennar's Answer and Crossclaims, #4 Exhibit Spring Grove's Answer and Crossclaims, #5 Exhibit 2013 Policy, #6 Exhibit 2014 Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 LR 26.01 Answers)Montague, Shelley) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2531-BHH.
July 6, 2020 Filing 1272 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment. ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9197062). Knowlton, Francis) Modified on 7/7/2020 filed as 4:20-mc-292 (mcot, ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 1271 COMPLAINT Susan M. Lykes on behalf of Jamal Emmanuel McKennan vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9196909). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Owens, Brett) Modified on 7/6/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02529 MGL TER
July 6, 2020 Filing 1270 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Johnny Bethel vs South Carolina Department of Corrections Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9196820). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Balthazor, Peter) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2526-MGL-SVH.
July 5, 2020 Filing 1269 COMPLAINT Kathleen Orr vs Wild Dunes LLC., Lowe Hospitality Group, Inc. and Hyatt Corporation Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9196421). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Mullaney, Marybeth) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2525-RMG-MGB.
July 3, 2020 Filing 1267 COMPLAINT Bruce E. Katz, M.D.,P.C., d/b/a Juva Skin and Laser Center vs Capital Medical Education, LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9196060). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Responses)Collins, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2524-JMC.
July 3, 2020 Filing 1266 COMPLAINT Kevin K. Mohammed vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9196004). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2523-BHH.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1265 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Craig Youmans vs TDY Industries, LLC d/b/a ATI Specialty Materials Court Name: Chester County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9195692). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Dennis Hemphill, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Rawl, A) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2522-JFA.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1263 COMPLAINT Daniella Bratcher vs Ethicon, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9195568). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Chandler, Grace) Modified on 7/7/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2539-SAL.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1260 COMPLAINT T-Zone Health, Inc. vs SouthStar Capital, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9195476). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Lydon, Thomas) Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02519 DCN
July 2, 2020 Filing 1259 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Robin D. Scruggs vs Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Court Name: Spartanburg County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9195394). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Coversheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Answer of Defendants)Boyd, Nashiba Dawntay) Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 7:20-cv-02518 TMC
July 2, 2020 Filing 1258 COMPLAINT Penny Jo Barnett, individually, and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Barnett vs United States of America, United States Coast Guard, and United States Army Corps of Engineers Charleston Division-In Admiralty Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194805). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)McCool, Christopher) Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02517 DCN Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02517 DCN
July 2, 2020 Filing 1257 COMPLAINT Donna Muhammad vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02516 RMG KDW
July 2, 2020 Filing 1256 COMPLAINT Carolina Lending and Trust, LLC vs James Scharf, Jr. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194838). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Altman, Samuel) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2514-RMG.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1255 COMPLAINT Robert Henderson Riggs vs Veterans Affairs Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194793). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Merck, Weston) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2515-JMC.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1254 COMPLAINT Massachusetts Bay Insurance vs Drucker & Faulk, LLC Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194636). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Management Agreement - AP, #3 Exhibit C - Management Agreement - RW, #4 Exhibit D - Policy ZHRA18309400 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit E - Policy ZHRA18309402 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit F - Policy ZDRA18309402 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit G - Policy ZDRA18309403-Redacted, #8 Exhibit H - Policy ZDRA18309404-Redacted, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 LR 26.01 Answers, #11 Summons BMW North Charleston LLC, #12 Summons Drucker & Faulk LLC, #13 Summons Riverland, LLC, #14 Summons State Farm Fire & Causalty)Burchstead, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2513-RMG.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1253 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mark Mona vs Real Movers Moving and Storage, Inc. Court Name: Charleston County Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194625). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Answers to LR 26.01 Interrogatories)Calamari, Robert) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2512-BHH.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1252 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Michael and Dorothy Doyle vs Robert Michael Spitulski Court Name: Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194379). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service)DuBose, Susan) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2511-SAL.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1251 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Wendy Nesmith vs Family Dollar, Inc. Court Name: Dorchester ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194365). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Henthorne, D) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2510-MBS-MGB.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1250 NOTICE OF REMOVAL John C. Brown, Jr. vs Cooper Standard Automotive, Inc. Court Name: Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194234). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Connell, John) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case nubmer 7:20-cv-2509-DCC.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1249 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Melissa Ballard vs Walmart Supercenter Store # 2265, Simpsonville, SC Court Name: Greenville County CP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194094). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Main Document Answer of Defendant)Roberts, Randi) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2508-TMC.
July 2, 2020 Filing 1248 COMPLAINT Nickolas Godfrey vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 7/2/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02504 TMC KFM
July 2, 2020 Filing 1247 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kriegel & Associates, P.C. vs Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9193433). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Hawk, John) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2503-TMC.
July 1, 2020 Filing 1246 COMPLAINT Elizabeth Driggers-Dubose vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9192307). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 7/1/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02502 MGL PJG
July 1, 2020 Filing 1245 COMPLAINT Kimberly Wallace vs O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9191948). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Smith, Kevin) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2499-RMG.
July 1, 2020 Filing 1244 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Myeshia Wilson vs Jesus Sotomayor Court Name: AGB Interstate Trucking, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9191454). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Jones, Brandon) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2497-MGL.
July 1, 2020 Filing 1243 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Wyman Boatwright vs Life Insurance Company of North America Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9190825). (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Appendix 2 - Notice of Filing Removal to the United States District Court of South Carolina, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Defendant's Responses to Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #5 Defendant's Answer)Shuler, Franklin) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2496-SAL.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1242 COMPLAINT Michelle D Johnson vs Financial Asset Management Systems Inc Columbia Division. Summons and Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9190449). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)Norsworthy, Kenneth) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2495-JFA.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1241 COMPLAINT Pearl Adams vs Synergetic Communication, Inc. Spartanburg Division. Summons and Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9190446). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit)Norsworthy, Kenneth) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2494-TMC.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1240 COMPLAINT RHIANNON KENDALL vs AMAZON CORPORATE, LLC Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9190298). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Answers)Segui, Harper) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2493-JFA.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1239 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mary Taylor vs Dollar General Court Name: Florence Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9190046). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Boineau, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2491-RBH.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1238 COMPLAINT Marian Calbi vs Steven Bostic Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9189625). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Construction Contract, #5 Exhibit Design Contract, #6 Exhibit Constr. Photographs Part 1, #7 Exhibit Constr. Photographs Part 2, #8 Exhibit Constr. Photographs Part 3, #9 Exhibit Constr. Photographs Part 4, #10 Exhibit Constr. Photographs Part 5, #11 Exhibit Mechanics Liens, #12 Exhibit Engineer Preliminary Report, #13 Exhibit Letter Bostic to Trade Vendor, #14 Exhibit Subcontract Bostic Projects' Liens)Davis, James) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2490-DCN.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1237 COMPLAINT RHIANNON KENDALL vs AMAZON CORPORATE, LLC Columbia Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Answers)Segui, Harper) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). Please see ECF No. #1240 for filing fee. case number 3:20-cv-2493-JFA.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1236 COMPLAINT Leanne Goss vs Greenway Health, LLC Insurance Plan Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9189466). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Greenway Health Plan, #3 Summons Summons as to CIGNA, #4 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Interrogatories)Laddaga, Lawrence) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2486-RMG.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1235 COMPLAINT Saundra W. Branson vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 6/30/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02485 TMC MGB
June 30, 2020 Filing 1234 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Roshonda Gadson vs Dollar General Court Name: Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9188908). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Boineau, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2484-MGL.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1233 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Gary Phillips vs Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. Court Name: State of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9188759). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Evert, Jill) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2483-JMC-SVH.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1232 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate Service to Hubbard)(Smith, Sedeirdra) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2482-JMC-SVH.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1231 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Myron Hubbard vs SC Department of Mental Health Court Name: SC State Court of Common Pleas for Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9188624). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court & Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Smith, Sedeirdra) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2482-JMC-SVH.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1230 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Dalvin Sanders vs Progressive Direct Insurance Company (a/k/a) Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Dominique Bryant Court Name: Hampton Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9188430). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Murphy, John) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2480-DCN.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1229 COMPLAINT Stacey Tennant vs Andrew W Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Anderson Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 6/30/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02477 DCC KFM
June 30, 2020 Filing 1228 COMPLAINT Johnny Shingler vs ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY d/b/a/ ERC, Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9187047). (Attachments: #1 Summons Supporting Document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supporting Document, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Supporting Document)Bland, Chauntel) Modified on 7/1/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2492-JMC.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1227 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Frank Adcock vs Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Court Name: Sumter County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9186781). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supporting Documents Answer to Complaint)Bailey, Amanda) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2474-JFA.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1226 COMPLAINT Darrell Jackson vs Drug Enforcement Administration Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9186686). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DEA, #3 Summons 15 DEU, #4 Summons HC, #5 Summons Jimmy Richardson, #6 Summons HCSO, #7 Summons HCPD, #8 Summons Christopher Costa, #9 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Interrogatories)Wilson, Ralph) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2473-RBH-TER.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1225 COMPLAINT Monique Marcell Flowers vs Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 6/30/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02470 RBH PJG
June 29, 2020 Filing 1224 COMPLAINT Christopher C. Clark vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees, #4 Notice Consent to a Magistrate)McDaniel, Christi) Modified on 6/30/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02471 RMG JDA
June 29, 2020 Filing 1223 Motion to Quash Subpoena Greenville Division. Ravensafe v. Nexus ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9186445). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena served on Kim & Lahey, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Subpoena served on K&L Gates)Ward, Robert) Modified on 7/2/2020: 6-20-mc-270-DCC (kmca).
June 29, 2020 Filing 1222 New Miscellaneous Filing Greenville Division. Ravensafe v. Nexus Motion to Quash Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0420-9186272). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Subpoena served on Kim & Lahey, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Subpoena served on K&L Gates)Ward, Robert) Modified on 7/2/2020: 6-20-mc-269-DCC (kmca).
June 29, 2020 Filing 1221 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Luxury Event Studios, LLC vs David Bernard Court Name: Common Pleas Charleston County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185594). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Business Search & Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)Scardato, Michael) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2467-DCN.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1220 COMPLAINT John Roger Hiott vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185598). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Creech, Margaret) Modified on 6/29/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02463 BHH BM
June 29, 2020 Filing 1219 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Erith Elleastene Grant-Partlow vs PMOB, LLC Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185578). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Documents)Hanna, George) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2465-JFA.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1218 COMPLAINT George Ropp, III vs Monsanto Co. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185528). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Winkler, Ashlee) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2462-MDL.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1217 COMPLAINT Richard Parker vs Monsanto Co. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185522). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Winkler, Ashlee) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2461-MDL.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1216 COMPLAINT Theophilus Berry vs Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185480). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Williams, Virginia) Modified on 6/30/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2476-CMC.
June 29, 2020 Filing 1215 COMPLAINT Amber Henry vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/29/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02464 TMC TER
June 29, 2020 Filing 1214 COMPLAINT Stipkala & Klosowski LLC d.b.a. Thrive IP vs Thrive Law, PA Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9185031). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 TM Certificate, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Plaintiff's Website, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Defendants' Website and Instagram, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 062 TM App., #5 Exhibit Ex 5 USPTO Office Action, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 489 TM App., #7 Exhibit Ex 7 USPTO Office Action, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 USPTO Final Office Action, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 FL TM App., #10 Exhibit Ex 10 209 TM App., #11 Exhibit Ex 11 USPTO Office Action, #12 Exhibit Ex 12 CnD Letter, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #14 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #15 Summons Summons Thrive Law PA, #16 Summons Summons Marcario)Stipkala, Jeremy) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2456-RMG.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1213 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Eboni McMillian vs South Carolina Department of Social Services Court Name: Richland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9183906). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Montgomery, Michael) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2454-JMC.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1212 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Wendy Bowen vs South Carolina Department of Social Services Court Name: Richland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9183742). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint in State Court, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Montgomery, Michael) Modified on 6/29/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2453-JMC.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1211 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kayla Adelle Therrell vs CalArk, Inc. Court Name: Sumter ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9183788). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Rule 26.01 Interrogatory Responses, #4 Supporting Documents Defendant's Answer)Barrow, Mark) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2443-MGL.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1210 COMPLAINT Smith vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2440-TMC-MGB.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1209 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Diane Potts vs Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC Court Name: State of SC Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9183375). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Evert, Jill) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2438-MGL-SVH.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1208 COMPLAINT Coaxum vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2437-TLW-JDA.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1207 COMPLAINT John Franklin Glenn vs United States of America/United States Postal Service Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9182795). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Bouton, William) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 7:20-cv-2436-TMC.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1206 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Clarence S. Boyd vs Manhattan Life Insurance Company Court Name: York ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9182996). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Watson, Joseph) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2435-JMC.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1205 COMPLAINT Concrete Supply Co., LLC vs Banks Construction Company Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9182974). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Banks Construction Co., #3 Summons G. Reid Banks, #4 Summons TRB Mellichamp, LLC, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Payne, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2434-RMG.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1204 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WYDNA LEE MARTIN vs CHAR-BROIL, LLC Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9182793). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Woodward, Nickisha) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2433-CMC.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1203 NOTICE OF REMOVAL MICHAEL E. HAMM vs ANDREW SAUL Court Name: South Carolina State Court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents)de Holl, Andrew) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2427-RMG-BM.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1202 COMPLAINT Sir Brandon Legette vs Officer Sean Rollins Columbia Division. 20AV99999 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9182130). (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Brown, Marcus) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2439-JMC-PJG.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1201 COMPLAINT Beverly Susanne Waddell vs Commissioner of SSA Beaufort Division. . (Attachments: #1 Ex A--Appeals Council Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2425-JMC-BM.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1200 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Christopher James France In Propria Persona vs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9181976). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.'s Corporate Filing Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers for Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.)Kelchner, John) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2424-BHH-BM.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1199 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Terri Rodgers vs Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9181761). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Hawk, John) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2421-BHH.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1198 COMPLAINT Jay H. Cooley vs Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Anderson Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9181575). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02415 HMH
June 26, 2020 Filing 1197 COMPLAINT Betty J. Brady vs Unum Life Insurance Company of America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9181573). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02416 TMC
June 25, 2020 Filing 1196 COMPLAINT Amber Childers vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02411 RBH SVH
June 25, 2020 Filing 1195 COMPLAINT Jennifer Rice vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02412 DCC BM
June 25, 2020 Filing 1194 COMPLAINT Castellucci vs Saul Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Application to Proceed IFP, #4 Fee Agreement)Whitten, Beatrice) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02413 RMG KFM
June 25, 2020 Filing 1193 COMPLAINT Angela Petty vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02414 SAL SVH
June 25, 2020 Filing 1192 COMPLAINT Amy Walters vs On-Board Services, Inc. Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9181124). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Clark, Pheobe) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 3:20-cv-02418 JMC PJG
June 25, 2020 Filing 1191 COMPLAINT Mary Beth Martin vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Union Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9180925). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Dennison, Carole) Modified on 6/26/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02417 DCN TER
June 25, 2020 Filing 1190 COMPLAINT Eloise Calloway vs Wayne Ownes Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9180677). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons)Elliott, Charles) Modified on 6/25/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02410 RBH
June 25, 2020 Filing 1189 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Phyllis Moody-Beuthien vs BASF Corporation Court Name: State Court Common Pleas Oconee County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9180621). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers BASF's Response to 26.01 Interrogatories)Asper, Lucas) Modified on 6/25/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02409 DCC
June 25, 2020 Filing 1188 COMPLAINT Lisa Ann Holden-Adams vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 6/25/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02408 JMC PJG
June 25, 2020 Filing 1187 COMPLAINT Charles Williams vs Monsanto Company Orangeburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9180414). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Moore, Christopher) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2420-MDL.
June 25, 2020 Filing 1186 COMPLAINT Roxanne Harkness vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/25/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02403 MBS SVH
June 25, 2020 Filing 1185 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Thuy N. Gasser vs ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C. Court Name: Horry County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9179401). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 LR 26.01 Answers)Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 6/26/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2419-RBH.
June 25, 2020 Filing 1184 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TCT1 vs Nationwide Court Name: Oconee County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9179205). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Stern, Frank) Modified on 6/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2404-DCC. Duplicate filing of ECF No. #1181 . Refund Requested from finance.
June 25, 2020 Filing 1183 COMPLAINT Aladino Romero vs Verizon Wireless Long Term Disability Plan Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9179130). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Louzri, Melissa) Modified on 6/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2406-BHH.
June 25, 2020 Filing 1182 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Roderick R. Ellsworth vs Fluke Corporation Court Name: Greenville ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9179037). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Certificate of Service)Outten, Samuel) Modified on 6/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2405-TMC.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1181 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TCT1 vs Nationwide Court Name: Oconee County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9178220). Stern, Frank) Modified on 6/25/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2404-DCC.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1180 COMPLAINT Tametha D. Jones vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2398-TMC-MGB.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1179 COMPLAINT Victor Cooper vs Monsanto Company Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9178157). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons)Newman, Graham) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2397-MDL.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1178 COMPLAINT Peter Dale Allard vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9178160). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2400-TMC-JDA.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1177 COMPLAINT William Bradford Lackey vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02394 RBH MGB
June 24, 2020 Filing 1176 COMPLAINT Benjamin Stiles Mikell, Jr. vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9178036). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Jung, William) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02393 BHH PJG
June 24, 2020 Filing 1175 COMPLAINT Tifphanie Lashawnda Brown vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02392 TMC JDA
June 24, 2020 Filing 1174 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Jody Parker vs Barrier Reef Fiberglass Pools, LLC Court Name: Florence County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9177654). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Referenced in Removal, #5 Certificate of Service for Removal Package and Answer)Josey, Jon) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2391-SAL-TER.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1173 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joshua Isaiah Williams vs NewRez, LLC Court Name: Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9177518). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affiidavit of Joshua Williams, #3 Exhibit Motion for Temporaty Injunction, #4 Exhibit Incident Report, #5 Exhibit Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing, #7 Exhibit Proof of Service on Registered Agent, #8 Exhibit Proof of Service on President)Milam, G) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2395-BHH.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1172 COMPLAINT Jamie M. Lee vs James Judy Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9177382). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #3 Summons)Bluestein, S) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2390-DCN.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1171 COMPLAINT Paula Sams vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02389 TMC KFM
June 24, 2020 Filing 1170 COMPLAINT Ayanna McKoy vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02386 RBH KFM
June 24, 2020 Filing 1169 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Brian Biering vs Wheaton Van Lines, Inc. Court Name: Colleton Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9176554). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Marcinak, Casper) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2385-BHH.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1168 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Christopher Jones vs Wheaton Van Lines, Inc. Court Name: Colleton Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9176455). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Marcinak, Casper) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2383-BHH.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1167 COMPLAINT Fancy That! Bistro and Catering, LLC vs Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9176166). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - The Hartford, #3 Summons Summons - Sentinel, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Willey, Roy) Modified on 6/24/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2382-MDL.
June 24, 2020 Filing 1166 COMPLAINT Jagona Mobley vs Andrew Saul Rock Hill Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02381 TMC MGB
June 23, 2020 Filing 1164 COMPLAINT Samantha Jeanne Gilmore vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02376 RBH KDW
June 23, 2020 Filing 1163 COMPLAINT Antonis Williams vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9175195). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/24/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02379 TMC SVH
June 23, 2020 Filing 1162 COMPLAINT Pauline T. Umbarger vs Monsanto Company Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9175025). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01 Answers)Winkler, Ashlee) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2372-MDL.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1161 COMPLAINT John Cantwell vs Lloyd's of London Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9175027). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lloyd's Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Lloyd's Letter Refusing Coverage, #3 Exhibit Bankers Insurance Flood Policy, #4 Exhibit Bankers Insurance Letter Denying Coverage, #5 Summons Summons to Lloyd's of London, #6 Summons Summons to American Bankers Insurance, #7 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiffs' Response to 26.01 Interrogatories)Detwiler, Richard) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2371-DCN.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1160 COMPLAINT Walter Hansen, Jr. vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/23/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02367 TMC TER
June 23, 2020 Filing 1159 COMPLAINT Isaac W. Goble, Jr. vs Monsanto Company Florence Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9174835). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Plaintiff's Rule 26.01 Responses)Moore, Christopher) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2370-MDL.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1158 COMPLAINT Erin Ward vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/23/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02366 TMC TER
June 23, 2020 Filing 1157 COMPLAINT Charity Joy Taber vs Commissioner of SSA Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--AC decisioni, #2 Application to Proceed IFP, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons to Office of General Counsel, #6 Summons to US Attorney)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 6/23/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02364 RBH KDW
June 23, 2020 Filing 1155 COMPLAINT Nickolas Lawson vs Commissioner of Social Security Florence Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents)Calcutt, Steven) Modified on 6/23/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02361 RBH KDW
June 23, 2020 Filing 1154 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Charleston Division. Credit Central LLC, Credit Central of Anderson, LLC, Credit Central of Tennessee, LLC, Credit Central of Texas, LLC, Credit Central South, LLC d/b/a Credit Central Loans & Taxes v. Ruther Mae Bauer (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal Letter)(sphipps-USBK, ) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 4:20-cv-2368-RBH.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1153 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Chandra D. Price vs State of South Carolina Department of Social Services Court Name: Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9173461). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Ferguson, Emmanuel) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 5:20-cv-2354-TLW-PJG.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1152 COMPLAINT Beattie B. Ashmore, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Scott A. Kohn, Future Income Payments, LLC, Joseph P. Hipp, Kraig S. Aiken, and David N. Kenneally vs David Altemeyer Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9173383). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons to David Altemeyer, #4 Summons to Altemeyer Financial)Tollison, Lewis) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2353-BHH.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1151 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Christine Terry vs Beaufort County School District Court Name: Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9172362). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Service)Lindemann, Andrew) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2351-MBS-MGB.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1150 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Charleston Glass and Mirror, Inc. vs Todd Evans Court Name: Charleston County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9172314). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Docket, #3 Exhibit State Notice Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers)Davis, James) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2350-DCN.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1149 Defendant Daniel's Moving and Storage, Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant.(Adkins, Matthew) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2349-DCC-JDA.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1148 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joan M. Parsons vs Daniel's Moving Court Name: County of Pickens In the Court of Common Pleas 13th Judicial Circuit ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9172218). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Record, #4 Exhibit Loss and Damages Report, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew D. Adkins, #6 Exhibit Defendant Mover's Specialty Service Inc's Notice of Consent to Remove)Adkins, Matthew) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 8:20-cv-2349-DCC-JDA.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1147 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kareem Chandler vs Kinder Morgan, Inc. Court Name: Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9172107). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Ex. A - Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, #3 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Glass, Benjamin) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2348-RMG-BM.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1146 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joyce Adele Lottman McNeill vs John P. Tilton Court Name: Court of Common Pleas, Beaufort County, State of South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9171469). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court Documents Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Answer)Darling, Stephen) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2345-DCN.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1145 COMPLAINT Lullene D. Manning vs Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Charleston Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Appendix Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees)Wendt, Robertson) Modified on 6/22/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02342 RBH TER
June 22, 2020 Filing 1144 COMPLAINT Waynetta Gowan vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/22/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02341 TMC SVH
June 22, 2020 Filing 1143 COMPLAINT Richard Michael Tench vs Kevin J. Azzara Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9170636). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bodycam screenshot of Azzara shooting, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of GCSO Facebook post, #3 Exhibit C - SLED photo depicting car, #4 Exhibit D - SLED photo depicting Tench home, #5 Exhibit E - Bodycam screenshot of Tench walking away, #6 Exhibit F - Bodycam screenshot of Azzara, #7 Exhibit G - Bodycam screenshot of Tench's arm at his side, #8 Exhibit H - Bodycam screenshot of Azzara shooting into Tench home, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Fowler, Holman and May's report, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpt from affidavit in support of search warrant for blood, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpt from affidavit in support of search warrant for medical records, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpt from affidavit in support of search warrant for home, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 LR 26.01 Answers, #15 Summons Deputy Azzara, #16 Summons GCSO Summons, #17 Summons Greenville County Summons)Ashmore, Beattie) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bshr, ). 6:20-cv-2344-BHH-JDA.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1142 COMPLAINT Michelle Jenkins vs Pandora Marketing Rock Hill Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9170296). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Timeshare Compliance (fka), #3 Exhibit National Do-Not-Call Registry, #4 Summons, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Maxfield, David) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2337-MGL.
June 22, 2020 Filing 1141 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Fiona Adeniji-Adele vs Midlands Authority for Convention, Sports and Tourism d/b/a Experience Columbia, SC Court Name: Richland County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9170131). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Answer)Rogers, Christina) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2336-JMC-PJG.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1140 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Mary E. Quarles vs Sealed Air Corporation (US) Court Name: Greenville County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9169351). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Foster, William) Modified on 6/22/2020 (mnas). 6:20-2335 DCC KFM
June 19, 2020 Filing 1139 COMPLAINT Elvis Dwayne Previtte vs Andrew Saul AIKEN Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit In forma pauperis)Mayes, W) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mnas). 1:20-cv-02330 TMC SVH
June 19, 2020 Filing 1138 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Kimberly S. Sutton vs Giti Tire Manufacturing (USA), Ltd. Court Name: Chester Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9168848). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)McWilliams, Phillips) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mnas). 0:20-cv-02333 JMC PJG
June 19, 2020 Filing 1137 COMPLAINT Lee Runyon for minor vs The South Carolina High School League Charleston, South Carolina District Division. and Defendant Molly Spears, SC Dept. of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9168356). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Affidavit, #3 Recommendation Petition for Appointment of GAL and proposed Order, #4 LR 26.01 Answers Response of Plaintiff's minor)Runyon, William) Modified on 6/23/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2352-RMG.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1136 COMPLAINT Troy Scarborough vs Winthrop University and Daniel Gordon Spartanburg Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9168475). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers)Haley, Darren) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 0:20-cv-2331-JMC-SVH.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1135 COMPLAINT David Cothran vs Andrew Saul Columbia Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9168086). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02321 TMC KDW
June 19, 2020 Filing 1134 COMPLAINT Beth Simmons vs American Medical Systems, Inc. Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9167718). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)Hall, Frederick) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2320-MDL.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1133 COMPLAINT Tammy Easler vs Andrew Saul Greenville Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mnas). 9:20-cv-02319 SAL BM.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1132 COMPLAINT Wendy Leal vs Life Insurance Company of North America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9167045). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2316-HMH.
June 19, 2020 Filing 1131 COMPLAINT Tracey L. Palmer vs Life Insurance Company of North America Greenville Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9167044). (Attachments: #1 Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons)Bax, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 6:20-cv-2315-BHH.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1130 COMPLAINT Cassandra Yvette Lemon vs Andrew Saul, as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Proceed without the Payment of Filing Fees)Lewis, Alexander) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mnas). 4:20-cv-02310 RBH TER
June 18, 2020 Filing 1129 COMPLAINT Vaughn Dyer vs Air Methods Corporation Beaufort Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9166542). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Summons Air Methods, #4 Summons Rocky Mountain Holdings)Pacella, Mario) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 9:20-cv-2309-DCN.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1128 COMPLAINT Accident Insurance Company, Inc. vs Morillo Construction, LLC Charleston Division. Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9166509). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AIC Policy, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Reservation of Rights, #4 Exhibit ARM correspondence, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of DeAndre J. Thomason)Daniel, Jackson) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2314-RMG.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1127 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sherry Cawley vs Dell Financial Services, LLC Court Name: Colleton County Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9166166). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Granting More Definite Statement, #3 Exhibit Amended Summons & Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Filing, #5 LR 26.01 Answers)Palmer, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/19/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2313-MBS.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1126 COMPLAINT Jametta Harrison vs Andrew Saul Anderson/Greenwood Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)McChesney, Paul) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02307 TMC JDA
June 18, 2020 Filing 1125 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Grace G. Driggers vs Costco Wholesale Corporation Court Name: Court of Common Pleas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9165600). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Main Document Answer, #4 LR 26.01 Answers LR 26.01 Answers, #5 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Leigh Ann Ruijters, #6 State Court Documents State Court Documents)Highfield, Duke) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2306-RMG.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1124 COMPLAINT Joan Ann Ryan vs Commissioner of SSA South Carolina Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supporting Documents In Forma Pauperis)Hughes, Daniel) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mnas). 2:20-cv-02298 TMC MGB
June 18, 2020 Filing 1123 COMPLAINT Lorraine Harris vs James Keyes Aton Charleston Division. In Admiralty ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9164798). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 26.01 Answers 26.01s, #3 Summons Barbara Aton, #4 Summons James Keyes Aton, #5 Summons 2006 McKee Craft)Gibson, Edward) Modified on 6/18/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2297-RMG.
June 18, 2020 Filing 1122 COMPLAINT Arthur P. Gordon, Jr. vs Andrew W. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security McCormick Division. . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for IFP Filing, #2 Supporting Documents Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Clardy, Timothy) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mnas). 6:20-cv-02295 SAL KFM
June 17, 2020 Filing 1121 COMPLAINT Valerie Norman vs Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration Civil Division. . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Application to Proceed without Paying Filing Fee)Cummings, William) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mnas). 5:20-cv-02293 RBH KDW
June 17, 2020 Filing 1120 COMPLAINT Princess Kimberly Enniss vs Andrew Saul Spartanburg Division. . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supporting Documents Application to Proceed)Smith, R) Modified on 6/17/2020 (mnas). 8:20-cv-02292 TMC JDA
June 17, 2020 Filing 1119 COMPLAINT Allstate Insurance Company vs Jarrod Rodgers Charleston Division. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9163424). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 LR 26.01 Answers, #4 Corporate Disclosure, #5 Summons Rodgers, #6 Summons Jowers)Cox, Alfred) Modified on 6/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 2:20-cv-2290-DCN.
June 17, 2020 Filing 1118 NOTICE OF REMOVAL James Edward Brewer, Jr. vs Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC Court Name: Court of Common Pleas Richland County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9162863). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 1, #4 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 2, #5 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 3, #6 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 4, #7 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 5, #8 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 6, #9 State Court Documents State Court Documents Part 7, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 LR 26.01 Answers Defendant's Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #12 Supporting Documents Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)Weatherly, Lee) Modified on 6/17/2020 (bshr, ). case number 3:20-cv-2288-MGL.
June 17, 2020