Kelly v. Finance of America Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Franklin E Kelly
Defendant: Finance of America Mortgage LLC and LoanCare LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00936
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Finance of America Mortgage LLC, LoanCare LLC.(Herman, Alanna)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Franklin E Kelly.(Maxfield, David)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Franklin E Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 26 Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/31/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/14/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 4/14/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/12/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/9/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/9/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/31/2020, Discovery due by 11/18/2020, Motions due by 12/3/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/1/2021, Mediation Due by 12/31/2020, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on March 11, 2020. (kbos)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by LoanCare LLC.(Herman, Alanna)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Finance of America Mortgage LLC.(Herman, Alanna)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Franklin E Kelly.(Maxfield, David)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Finance of America Mortgage LLC, LoanCare LLC.(asni, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County, case number 2020-CP-32-00438. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8982571), filed by Finance of America Mortgage LLC, LoanCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing to State Court and to Plaintiff)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Finance of America Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finance of America Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Alanna B Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare LLC
Represented By: Alanna B Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin E Kelly
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?