Walker v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tesha Lashay Walker
Defendant: Sallie Mae Bank, Merchants Adjustment Service Inc, Sunrise Community Banks, Trans Union LLC, Radius Global Solutions LLC, First Financial Asset Management Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC, PMAB LLC, IC System Inc, Radius Global Solutions, LLC, PMAB, LLC, First Financial Asset Management, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc., IC System, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01242
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 63 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Tesha Lashay Walker.(Hiller, Carl) (Main Document 63 replaced on 5/28/2020) (cbru, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 62 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc..(Echols, Chad)
May 26, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc..(Echols, Chad)
May 26, 2020 Filing 60 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Tesha Lashay Walker.(Hiller, Carl)
May 26, 2020 Filing 59 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Sallie Mae Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boguski, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/19/2020.(cbru, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles R. Penot, Jr. (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-9108742) by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit, #2 PHV Address/Email Update Form, #3 Certificate of Good Standing (State Bar of Texas), #4 Certificate of Good Standing (Supreme Court of Texas))No proposed order.(Burchstead, Michael) Modified to edit text on 5/19/2020 (cbru, ).
May 18, 2020 Filing 56 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by First Financial Asset Management, Inc..(Echols, Chad)
May 18, 2020 Filing 55 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PMAB, LLC.(Echols, Chad)
May 15, 2020 Filing 54 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/15/2020.(cbru, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 53 Additional Attachments to Main Document #46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher William Edwin Boss ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9099065). First attachment description: Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher Boss. (Hiller, Carl)
May 14, 2020 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/14/2020.(cbru, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER: Defendant PMAB, LLC's response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #45 is incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 5/18/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/13/2020. (cbru, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas F. Lucchesi ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9099087) by Sallie Mae Bank. Response to Motion due by 5/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for PHV Admission, #2 Journal related to e-signatures on Application, #3 Certificate in Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Boguski, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/14/2020) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text on 5/14/2020 (cbru, ).
May 13, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher William Edwin Boss. (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-9099065) by Tesha Lashay Walker. Response to Motion due by 5/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Cert Good Stand)No proposed order.(Hiller, Carl) Additional attachment filed as entry #53 on 5/15/2020 (cbru, ).
May 13, 2020 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PMAB, LLC.(Echols, Chad)
May 11, 2020 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The applicant failed to answer question #11 on the Application/Affidavit attached to the motion filed as entry #43 . Plaintiff shall file an amended Application/Affidavit using the event "Additional Attachments to Main Document no later than May 15, 2020. (Amended Application/Affidavit due by 5/15/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/11/2020. (cbru, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher William Edwin Boss ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9094752) by Tesha Lashay Walker. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Cert Good Stand)No proposed order.(Hiller, Carl)
May 5, 2020 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants PMAB, LLC and First Financial Asset Management, Inc. are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than May 19, 2020. (cbru, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 39 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 6/9/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/31/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/28/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/28/2020, Discovery due by 11/23/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/12/2021, Motions due by 12/7/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/16/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/3/2021, ADR Statement due by 1/4/2021, Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/5/2020. (cbru, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 Case Reassigned to Judge Cameron McGowan Currie. Judge Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Merchants Adjustment Service Inc answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence granting extension)(Echols, Chad)
May 4, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Radius Global Solutions LLC.(Burchstead, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Radius Global Solutions LLC.(Burchstead, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Radius Global Solutions LLC.(Burchstead, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PMAB LLC.(Echols, Chad)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by First Financial Asset Management Inc.(Echols, Chad)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
April 30, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
April 29, 2020 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 6/1/2020. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/29/20.(mflo, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. First Financial Asset Management Inc served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Sunrise Community Banks served on 4/18/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Radius Global Solutions LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. PMAB LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Merchants Adjustment Service Inc served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. IC System Inc served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Trans Union LLC served on 4/19/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cert Mail receipt)(Hiller, Carl)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sallie Mae Bank.(Boguski, Christopher)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Tesha Lashay Walker. Sallie Mae Bank waiver executed on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Hiller, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #1 Waiver of Summons as to Sallie Mae Bank as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sallie Mae Bank. (Boguski, Christopher)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lee Boguski on behalf of Sallie Mae Bank (Boguski, Christopher)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sallie Mae Bank. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to First Financial Asset Management Inc. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sunrise Community Banks. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Radius Global Solutions LLC. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PMAB LLC. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Merchants Adjustment Service Inc. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to IC System Inc. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (mflo, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tesha Lashay Walker.(mflo, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9031490.), filed by Tesha Lashay Walker. Service due by 6/30/2020(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae Bank
Represented By: Christopher Lee Boguski
Represented By: Thomas Francis Lucchesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Adjustment Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Community Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Asset Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMAB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC System Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Charles R Penot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMAB, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesha Lashay Walker
Represented By: Carl David Hiller
Represented By: Christopher William Edwin Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?