Goodwin v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Plaintiff: Andra Goodwin
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01783
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on May 28, 2020.(kbos)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Stipulation of the Parties by Andra Goodwin. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Linowski, Zachary)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by CVS Pharmacy Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020. No proposed order.(kbos)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (kbos)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CVS Pharmacy Inc.(kbos)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Richland County, case number 2020-CP-40-1826. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9088603), filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Represented By: James Whittington Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Goodwin
Represented By: Zachary Dean Linowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?