El Bey v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey
Defendant: Ricky L. Morse, Pam Haynesworth, Robert D. Beckford, Jr., James C. Campbell and Tyler Bryant Brown
Case Number: 3:2020cv02077
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #17 Order on Report and Recommendation and #18 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey, 8398, Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center, 1250 Winkles Road, Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT dismissing the action with prejudice. (lbak)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 14), overruling Plaintiff's Objections (ECF No. 16), and dismissing the matter with prejudice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/17/2020.(vdou, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #14 Report and Recommendation by Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey. Reply to Objections due by 7/29/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #13 Order - 1983 - No Service and #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey, 8398, Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center, 1250 Winkles Road, Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district court dismiss this action with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/29/2020. (lbak)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Motion granted: #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/29/2020. (lbak)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert D. Beckford, Jr, Tyler Bryant Brown, James C. Campbell, Pam Haynesworth, Ricky L. Morse, filed by Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order, standard complaint form and five Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey, 8398, Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center, 1250 Winkles Road, Sumter, SC 29153. (lbak/mnas)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by June 29, 2020, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend the district judge dismiss the complaint without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 6/29/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/8/2020. (lbak)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 6/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/8/2020. (lbak)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (lbak)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey. Response to Motion due by 6/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Bey v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky L. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Haynesworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Beckford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Bryant Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noble Saquan Tarkee El Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?