Stokes v. China's National Health Commission
Plaintiff: Rodney Stokes
Defendant: China's National Health Commission
Case Number: 3:2020cv02221
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 Judgment, #16 Order on Report and Recommendation,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Rodney Stokes 365722 Broad River Corectional Institution 4460 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 (jbry, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 JUDGMENT in favor of China's National Health Commission against Rodney Stokes (jbry, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER affirming #10 Report and Recommendation; dismissing case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process; finding as moot #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/10/2020.(eric, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation by Rodney Stokes. Reply to Objections due by 7/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend Filings by Rodney Stokes. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(prou, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order - 1983 - No Service, #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Rodney Stokes, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Rodney Stokes 365722 Broad River Corectional Institution 4460 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210 (swel, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the court dismiss this case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/19/2020. (prou, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #8 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/19/2020.(prou, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/19/2020. (prou, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Rodney Stokes. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against China's National Health Commission, filed by Rodney Stokes. Service due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. China's National Health Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China's National Health Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?