Nelums et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H et al
Plaintiff: Delmarshi H. Nelums and John C. Nelums
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, John Does, 1-100, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, PHH Mortgage Services and Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Case Number: 3:2020cv02932
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
2 Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Response filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Services.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/16/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelchner, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 INTERROGATORIES Propounded by Delmarshi H. Nelums, John C. Nelums. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)Re-filed for correct event type (mmcd).
October 6, 2020 Filing 25 INTERROGATORIES Propounded by Delmarshi H. Nelums, John C. Nelums. (Attachments: #1 Fraud Upon the Court, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Supporting Documents, #4 Envelope)Re-filed for correct event type (mmcd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Paige J. Gossett by Delmarshi H. Nelums and John C. Nelums. Response to Motion due by 10/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Scheduling Order Response filed by Delmarshi H. Nelums and John C. Nelums.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (mmcd) Modified on 10/5/2020 to correct docket text per request by chambers (mmcd).
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Scheduling Order by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Services. Response to Motion due by 9/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Kelchner, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to John C. Nelums and Delmarshi H.Nelums 315 Bentwood Lane Columbia, SC 29229. (mmcd)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/2/2020. (mmcd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Delmarshi H. Nelums, John C. Nelums. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 1, #2 Certificate of Service 2, #3 Envelope) (mmcd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED #12 Roseboro Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to John C. Nelums and Delmarshi H.Nelums 315 Bentwood Lane Columbia, SC 29229. (mmcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #12 Roseboro Order and #13 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to John C. Nelums and Delmarshi H. Nelums 315 Bentwood Lane Columbia, SC 29229. (mmcd)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/21/2020, Discovery due by 12/18/2020, and Motions due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/21/2020. (mmcd)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 9/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/21/2020. (mmcd) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/25/2020 with corrected document) (mmcd).
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Services. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Note, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Mortgage, #4 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Kelchner, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to John C. Nelums and Delmarshi H. Nelums 315 Bentwood Lane Columbia, SC 29229. (mmcd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Richland County Public Index, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kelchner, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Services re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Notice of Removal, (Kelchner, John)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mortgage Electronic Registration System. (lbak)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PHH Mortgage Services. (lbak)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H. (lbak)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Richland Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02956. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9276482), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, PHH Mortgage Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelums et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2005-A8CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-H
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmarshi H. Nelums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Nelums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?