Phillips et al v. Principle Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cody Phillips and Christie Phillips
Defendant: Principal Securities Inc, Principle National Life Insurance Company and Principal Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02995
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/24/2020. (asni, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS 1ST AMENDED COMPLANT by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities Inc, Principle National Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Hawk, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Company, filed by Christie Phillips, Cody Phillips. Service due by 11/25/2020 (Moore, Stephen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christie Phillips, Cody Phillips.(Moore, Stephen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Confirming Extension)(Hawk, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Principal Securities Inc, Principle National Life Insurance Company.(asni, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2020-CP-40-03186. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9289457), filed by Principal Securities Inc, Principle National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A state court documents, #2 Exhibit B letter from the South Carolina Department of Insurance, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Service for PNLIC, #4 Exhibit D certified mail Domestic Return Receipt, #5 Exhibit E Affidavit of Service for PSI, #6 Exhibit F Policy, #7 Exhibit G GTL Policy, #8 Exhibit H VTL Policy, #9 Exhibit I Statement of Understanding)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. Principle Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Securities Inc
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principle National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Phillips
Represented By: S Jahue Moore, Jr
Represented By: Stephen Jahue Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Phillips
Represented By: S Jahue Moore, Jr
Represented By: Stephen Jahue Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?