Stronghill Capital, LLC v. Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stronghill Capital, LLC
Defendant: BC Law Firm, P.A., John Papastrat, Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC and Fidelity National Title Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03139
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Fidelity National Title Company, LLC.(Lang, Louis)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by Fidelity National Title Company, LLC, Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Lang, Louis)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/2/2020. (cbru, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 10/6/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/31/2020, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/11/2021, Motions due by 3/16/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/1/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/2/2021, Mediation Due by 5/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/2/2020. (cbru, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC.(Shaw, Joshua)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC.(Shaw, Joshua)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 9/9/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/2/2020. (cbru, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fidelity National Title Company, LLC.(cbru, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-03042 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9315421) filed by Fidelity National Title Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stronghill Capital, LLC v. Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC Law Firm, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Papastrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC
Represented By: Alexis Kocher Reynolds
Represented By: Joshua D Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company, LLC
Represented By: Louis H Lang
Represented By: Demetri K Koutrakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stronghill Capital, LLC
Represented By: Anna L Bullington
Represented By: Raford Wainwright Bussey
Represented By: Benjamin Tradd Hepner
Represented By: Murray Stokely Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?