Midway International Inc v. StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC et al
Plaintiff: Midway International Inc
Defendant: StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC and Jakecia White
Case Number: 3:2020cv03213
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jakecia White 6531-A Two Notch Road Suite 103 Columbia, SC 29223. (asni, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/21/2020. (asni, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STIPULATION by Midway International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Draft Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Matthews, Steve) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/21/2020) (asni, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midway International Inc. Jakecia White served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Matthews, Steve)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midway International Inc. StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Matthews, Steve)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (asni, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Midway International Inc.(asni, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jakecia White. (asni, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC. (asni, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC, Jakecia White ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9327869.), filed by Midway International Inc. Service due by 12/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1 Photo, #2 Exhibit 2 Trademark Principal Register)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midway International Inc v. StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midway International Inc
Represented By: Steve Allen Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StylesByKey Braiding Studio LLC
Represented By: James Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakecia White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?