South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund v. Andino et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund
Defendant: Marci Andino, Linda McCall, Clifford J. Edler, Scott Mosley, JoAnne Day and John Wells
Petitioner: James H. Lucas, Jay and Harvey Peeler
Case Number: 3:2020cv03503
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund (Cohoon, Jack)
October 9, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTIONS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; finding as moot the #29 motion to intervene. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/09/2020.(dsto, ) Modified to edit text on 10/13/2020 (cbru, ). (Main Document 40 replaced on 10/13/2020 at the direction of chambers) (dsto)
October 7, 2020 Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/7/2020.(cbru, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 38 Additional Attachments to Main Document #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debra L. Greenberger ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9385013). First attachment description: Certificate of Good Standing - Debra L. Greenberger . (Cohoon, Jack)
October 7, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response filed by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Brett Bursey)(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/7/2020 (cbru, ).
October 7, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by James H. Lucas, Harvey Peeler. (Carroll, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Cohoon, Jack)
October 6, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Carroll Moore on behalf of James H. Lucas (Moore, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File. (Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/13/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/6/2020.(cbru, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells to #23 Response in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority)(Lambert, William) Modified to edit text on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Addendum - Mi Familia Vota, et al., v. Hobbs, #2 Addendum - Andino, et al., v. Middleton)(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Pedrick McWilliams on behalf of James H. Lucas. (McWilliams, Susan) Modified to edit text on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Intervene by Harvey Peeler, James H. Lucas. Response to Motion due by 10/20/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Andino v. Middleton, 592 U.S. ___ (2020))No proposed order.(Carroll, Matthew) Modified to add filer listed on document and to edit text on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Brett Bursey)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack)
October 5, 2020 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/5/2020.(cbru, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Motion hearing set for 10/6/2020 at 11:00am has been canceled. (cbru, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells.(Trinkley, Jane)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane W Trinkley on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells (Trinkley, Jane) (Main Document 24 replaced on 10/5/2020) (cbru, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Response filed by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lambert, William) (Main Document 23 replaced on 10/5/2020) (cbru, ). Supplement filed as entry #32 on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by William Grayson Lambert on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells (Lambert, William) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/5/2020) (cbru, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells (Crum, Mary) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/5/2020) (cbru, ).
October 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9385049) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Brinckerhoff (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9385015) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S. Abady (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9385014) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debra L. Greenberger (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9385013) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ). Additional attachment filed as entry #38 on 10/7/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ananda V. Burra (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9385012) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Cohoon, Jack) Modified to edit text on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 12 Order, #1 Complaint, 11 Order. (Cohoon, Jack) Modified to link correct events to associated event on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Forthwith, but not later than 3:00 PM today, October 3, 2020, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants: (1) a copy of the complaint in this matter #1 , (2) their motions for a preliminary injunction and a temporary restraining order #2 , and (3) the Court's order regarding filing a response to those motions and the hearing date #11. Plaintiffs shall then immediately, but not later than 5:00 PM today, October 3, 2020, file certificates of service concerning these matters with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Certificate of Service due by 10/3/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/3/2020. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text to correct scrivener's error on 10/5/2020 (cbru, ).
October 3, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Not later than 12:00 PM on Monday, October 5, 2020, Defendants shall file their response(s) to Plaintiff's motions for a preliminary injunction and a temporary restraining order #2 . The Court will conduct a hearing in this matter on Tuesday, October 6, 2020, at 11:00 AM in Columbia #1, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Response to Motion due by 10/5/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/3/2020. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Scott Mosley. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Marci Andino. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Linda McCall. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to John Wells. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JoAnne Day. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clifford J. Edler. (cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund.(cbru, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Response to Motion due by 10/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett Bursey, #2 Declaration of Jack E. Cohoon)No proposed order.(cbru, ) Supplement filed as entry #31 on 10/6/2020 (cbru, ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J. Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Mosley, John Wells (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9384459) filed by South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund. Service due by 12/31/2020(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund v. Andino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Andino
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCall
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J. Edler
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mosley
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnne Day
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wells
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Progressive Network Education Fund
Represented By: Jack Emerson Cohoon
Represented By: Jonathan S Abady
Represented By: Matthew D Brinckerhoff
Represented By: Debra L Greenberger
Represented By: Ananda V Burra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James H. Lucas
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvey Peeler
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?