Hawkins v. Riley Pope and Laney, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Hawkins
Defendant: Valorie Woodard, Riley Pope and Laney, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Michael Morris, Yolandia Brailsford, Greater Columbia Real Estate LLC, Sonya Miller Bellamy, MP Morris Law Firm, One Main Financial, Attorney Anthony Panico, Jayme L Shy, Citi Mortgage, Kondaur Captial Corporations, Jason Hunter, Marci Spires, Terri Harris and Judge Joseph Strickland
Case Number: 3:2020cv04310
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendation by Johnny Hawkins. Reply to Objections due by 2/12/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Allonge to Note, #2 Exhibit 2 Loan number 001788345 doc, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice to Creditors, #4 Exhibit 4 Statement of Creditor's Claim, #5 Exhibit 5 Proof of Delivery, #6 Exhibit 6 Affidavit of Claim, #7 Exhibit 7 Ending Balance Statement, #8 Exhibit 8 Corporate Assignment of Mortgage April 11, 2018, #9 Exhibit 9 Corporate Assignment of Mortgage and first page of Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff, #10 Exhibit 10 Second page of Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit 11 Citibank Document, #12 Exhibit 12 Citibank Document 2, #13 Exhibit 13 Assignment of Mortgage, #14 Exhibit 14 Corporate Assignment Mortgage April 11, 2018, #15 Exhibit 15 Corporate Assignment Mortgage May 14, 2018, #16 Exhibit 16 Assignment of Mortgage, #17 Exhibit 17 Taxpayer Information, #18 Exhibit 18 Customer Service, #19 Exhibit 19 Notification of Assignment, #20 Attachment Judicial Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent - Injunction and Demand for an Emergency Hearing Because of the Pending Lawsuit in Federal Court, #21 Attachment SC State Court Filings from 2018-CP-40-00575)(ahil)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #3 Order to Notify of Address Change, #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 5 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Johnny Hawkins, 2320 Lorick Avenue, Columbia, SC 29203. (lbak/bgoo)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Sherri A. Lydon. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 407 West Evans Street, Florence, South Carolina 29501. (lbak)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the court dismiss the #1 complaint without prejudice to him filing in a proper jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/12/2021. (lbak)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/12/2021. (lbak)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number SCX300091138.), filed by Johnny Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Riley Pope and Laney, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valorie Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Pope and Laney, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolandia Brailsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Columbia Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Miller Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Morris Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Main Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Anthony Panico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme L Shy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kondaur Captial Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Spires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joseph Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?