United States of America v. Richland Community Health Care Association et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Palmetto Health, Richland Community Health Care Association, SCE&G, Richland County, South Carolina, Eastover Community Club, The, South Carolina Department of Revenue, GMK Associates, Inc. and Palmetto Health Alliance
Case Number: 3:2021cv00770
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 18 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/17/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 6/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/12/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/5/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/7/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/24/2021, Discovery due by 10/25/2021, Motion in Limine due by 12/23/2021, Motions due by 11/8/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/3/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 1/24/2022, and Mediation Due by 11/22/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on April 27, 2021. (ahil)
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by GMK Associates, Inc.(ahil)
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GMK Associates, Inc.(Creech, Magalie) Modified on 4/27/2021 to remove the 26.01 attachment to refile as new entry. (ahil)
April 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. GMK Associates, Inc. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Richland County, South Carolina served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Palmetto Health served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. South Carolina Department of Revenue served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to SCE&G. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Richland County, South Carolina. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richland Community Health Care Association. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Palmetto Health f/k/a Palmetto Health Alliance. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to GMK Associates, Inc.. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Eastover Community Club. (ahil)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to South Carolina Department of Revenue. (ahil)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 LIS PENDENS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Legal Description of Property)(ahil)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(ahil)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GMK Associates, Inc., Palmetto Health, Richland Community Health Care Association, Richland County, South Carolina, SCE&G, South Carolina Department of Revenue, and The Eastover Community Club filed by United States of America. Service due by 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Loan Resolution Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit Real Estate Mortgage For South Carolina, #3 Exhibit Promissory Note)(ahil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Richland Community Health Care Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Community Health Care Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCE&G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastover Community Club, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMK Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Magalie Arcure Creech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Health Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine McLean Ryan
Represented By: Walker Heinitsh Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?