Taylor v. Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor, III
Defendant: Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC doing business as Wells Fargo Advisors
Case Number: 3:2021cv02260
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel. (Response to Motion due by 10/1/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/16/2021.(cbru, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel by Robert Taylor, III. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mann, Jenkins) Modified to correct motion relief on 9/16/2021 (cbru, ).
September 15, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Joint MOTION to Stay, staying the scheduling order in this action pending ruling on #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/15/2021. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text to correct scrivener's error on 9/15/2021 (cbru, ).
September 15, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Stay re #15 Scheduling Order by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Church, Brian) Modified to correct motion relief on 9/15/2021 (cbru, ).
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel. (Response to Motion due by 9/17/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/8/2021.(cbru, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel by Robert Taylor, III. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mann, Jenkins) Modified to correct motion relief on 9/8/2021 (cbru, ).
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel. (Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/30/2021.(cbru, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel by Robert Taylor, III. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mann, Jenkins) Modified to correct motion relief and to edit text on 8/30/2021 (cbru, ).
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/23/2021. (cbru, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/27/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/19/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/18/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/20/2021, Discovery due by 2/16/2022, Motion in Limine due by 5/27/2022, Motions due by 3/3/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/17/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 6/20/2022, Mediation Due by 5/2/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/23/2021.(cbru, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Case Pending Arbitration, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo - Shardai Smith Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Smith Declaration - Black 4/6/2009 Client Agreement Signature Page, #4 Exhibit B to Smith Declaration - Black General Account Agreement and Disclosure Document, #5 Exhibit C to Smith Declaration - Black 4/6/2015 signed Trustee Certification of Investment Powers, #6 Exhibit D to Smith Declaration - Black 4/27/2016 signed Trustee Certification of Investment Powers, #7 Exhibit E to Smith Declaration - Taylor Acct. 5373 Investment Profile Package Signature Page, #8 Exhibit F to Smith Declaration - Taylor Acct. 0569 Investment Profile Package Signature Page, #9 Exhibit G to Smith Declaration - Taylor Acct. 7204 Investment Profile Package Signature Page, #10 Exhibit H to Smith Declaration - Taylor General Account Agreement and Disclosure Document)No proposed order.(Church, Brian) Modified to edit text and to add motion relief on 8/20/2021 (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 8/23/2021 (cbru, ).
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11. Reason: Attorney refiled instead of submitting corrected document via email as directed. Corrected Filing Document Number #12 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Taylor, III.(Mann, Jenkins)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC answer due 8/20/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/29/2021.(cbru, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7. Reason: Mulitple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #8 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. (cbru, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Church, Brian)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Church, Brian)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 7/30/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/23/2021. (cbru, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC.(cbru, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-40-03025 (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9976827) filed by Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor, III
Represented By: Jenkins McMillan Mann
Represented By: Kevin Desmond Maroney
Represented By: Shaun Christian Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC doing business as Wells Fargo Advisors
Represented By: Brian Lee Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?