Santana v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eva Liriano Santana
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv03197
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 SPECIALIZED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/27/2021. (cbru, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Liriano Santana. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (cbru, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eva Liriano Santana.(cbru, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10104060) filed by Eva Liriano Santana. Service due by 12/30/2021(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Liriano Santana
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?