Hester v. City of Bishopville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: William H. Hester
Defendant: Bishopville Police Department, City of, Bishopville, City of and City of Bishopville Police Department
Case Number: 3:2022cv01586
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 7/12/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/7/2022, Discovery due by 12/28/2022, Motions due by 1/11/2023, Mediation Due by 3/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/8/2022. (dist)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bishopville, City of, City of Bishopville Police Department. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Rollins, C)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H. Hester. City of Bishopville Police Department served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents US Postal Green Card)(Clark, Pheobe)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H. Hester. Bishopville, City of served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents US Postal Green Card)(Clark, Pheobe)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dist)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William H. Hester.(dist)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10499446.), filed by William H. Hester. Service due by 8/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(dist)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. City of Bishopville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Hester
Represented By: Pheobe A Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishopville Police Department, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishopville, City of
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bishopville Police Department
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?