United States of America v. All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022
Case Number: 3:2022cv03494
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022 (cbru, ) (Main Document 13 replaced to correct scrivener's error on 12/5/2022) (cbru, ).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND GRANTING JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/5/2022. (cbru, )
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT byUnited States of America . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Default Judgment is dismissed without prejudice to refiling as a request for entry of default judgment in accordance with the Court's Standing Order Regarding Requests for Default and Default Judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/30/2022.(cbru, )
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022 by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sherard, Carrie)
November 29, 2022 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022 (cbru, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byUnited States of America. (Sherard, Carrie)
October 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Warrant For Arrest In Rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (cbru, )
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (cbru, )
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022 (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 1/9/2023(cbru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2022: #1 Verification) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Dogs Located at 3236 Screaming Eagle Road, Eastover, SC on September 25, 2022
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?