United States of America v. 0.012 Acres et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 0.012 Acres and CSS Land LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01733
Filed: April 26, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 0.012 Acres, CSS Land LLC. (document was filed incorrectly as attachment to Answer)(kbos)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to accept and deposit the funds into the Registry Bank Account of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The Court further orders the Clerk of Court to then deposit the funds into an interest-bearing account under the terms and conditions set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Rule 67.01 as soon as the Court's business allows. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on June 16, 2023.(ahil)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSS Land LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Berry, Joseph)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. CSS Land LLC waiver executed on 4/28/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. 0.012 Acres waiver executed on 4/28/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Waiver of Service)(Sneed, Robert)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 5/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(ahil)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(ahil)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION, filed by United States of America.(ahil)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 0.012 Acres, CSS Land LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number waived.), filed by United States of America. Service due by 7/25/2023 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking)(ahil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 0.012 Acres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert McLaughlin Gore
Represented By: Robert M Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.012 Acres
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Berry
Represented By: John Marion S Hoefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSS Land LLC
Represented By: John Marion S Hoefer
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?