Cape PLC v. Anglo American PLC et al
Plaintiff: Cape PLC
Defendant: Anglo American PLC, Cape Industrial Services Group Ltd., De Beers PLC, Cape Holdco Ltd., Lightbox Jewelry Inc., De Beers Centenary AG, Charter Consolidated Ltd., Element Six Technologies (OR) Corp., Forevermark US Inc., Element Six US Corp., Anglo American Crop Nutrients (U.S.A.), LLC, De Beers S.A., De Beers UK Ltd., Altrad Services Ltd., Law Debenture Corporation PLC, The, De Beers Jewellers Ltd., De Beers Jewellers US, Inc., First Mode Holdings, Inc., Anglo American US Holdings Inc., ESAB Corporation, Central Mining & Investment Corporation Ltd., De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd., Platinum Guild International (U.S.A.) Jewelry Inc., Element Six Technologies US Corp., Mohed Altrad, Altrad UK Ltd., Cape UK Holdings NewCo Ltd., Cape Industrial Services Ltd., Altrad Investment Authority S.A.S., Sparrows Offshore Group Ltd., Hawk BidCo US Inc., Arranco US, LLC, Sparrows Offshore, LLC and Sparrows Group, LLC, The
Case Number: 3:2024cv03771
Filed: June 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2024 Filing 76 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #75 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court to Richland County Clerk of Court; ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #75 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerk's Office to The Honorable Jeanette W. McBride, Clerk of Court, Richland County Court of Common Pleas, PO Box 2766, Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (Attachments: #1 Remand NEF, #2 Remand Order) (cbru, )
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/13/2024. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. (cbru, )
August 2, 2024 Filing 74 TEXT ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/2/2024.(cbru, )
August 1, 2024 Filing 73 Additional Attachments to Main Document #51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Rubinstein. First attachment description: Corrected PHV application Rubinstein . (Elliott, James)
August 1, 2024 Filing 72 Additional Attachments to Main Document #49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Kaminski. First attachment description: Corrected PHV Application Kaminski . (Elliott, James)
August 1, 2024 Filing 71 Additional Attachments to Main Document #54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maxwell D. Herman. First attachment description: Corrected Application PHV Herman . (Elliott, James)
August 1, 2024 Filing 70 Additional Attachments to Main Document #50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott S. Balber. First attachment description: Corrected Application PHV Balber . (Elliott, James)
July 23, 2024 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Cape PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Cape Answer in State Court, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4- Letter from Court of Appeals, #5 Exhibit 5- Letter from Court of Appeals, #6 Exhibit 6- Return to Petitions for Writ of Certiorari)(Lay, John)
July 22, 2024 Filing 66 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 65 Reason: notification of delivery of courtesy copies should not be filed in ECF (mdea )
July 19, 2024 Filing 64 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 62. Reason: Per order #63. (cbru, )
July 19, 2024 Filing 63 TEXT ORDER: The Clerk is directed to delete docket entry #62 as Defendant Anglo American PLC did not seek, nor was granted, leave to file an exhibit to its response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/18/2024. (cbru, )
July 19, 2024 Filing 61 Additional Attachments to Main Document #51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Rubinstein. First attachment description: Corrected Pro Hac Vice Application Benjamin C. Rubinstein . (Elliott, James)
July 18, 2024 Filing 60 Additional Attachments to Main Document #49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Kaminski. First attachment description: Corrected Application/Affidavit. (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/19/2024 (cbru, ).
July 18, 2024 Filing 59 Additional Attachments to Main Document #54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maxwell D. Herman. First attachment description: Corrected Application/Affidavit with Exhibit A. (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/19/2024 (cbru, ).
July 18, 2024 Filing 58 Additional Attachments to Main Document #50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott S. Balber. First attachment description: Corrected Application/Affidavit with Exhibit A. (Elliott, James) Modified to delete incorrectly attached document and to edit text on 7/19/2024 (cbru, ).
July 18, 2024 Filing 57 Sealed Document in re document #1 and #45 . (Elliott, James) Modified on 7/22/2024 to add linkage to entry #45 at request of filer (mdea, ).
July 18, 2024 Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Seal Document. Defendant Anglo American PLC shall file the sealed document forthwith but not later than July 22, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Sealed Document due by 7/22/2024) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/18/2024. (cbru, )
July 18, 2024 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maxwell D. Herman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11883890) by Anglo American PLC, De Beers Centenary AG, De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd., De Beers PLC, De Beers UK Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice Herman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Herman)No proposed order.(Elliott, James) Additional attachment filed as entry #59 on 7/18/2024 (cbru, ). Additional attachment filed as entry #71 on 8/1/2024 (cbru, ).
July 18, 2024 Filing 53 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 52. Reason: Filing fee not collected due to technical issue. To be refiled to allow for collection of filing fee. (cbru, )
July 17, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Rubinstein ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11882844) by Anglo American PLC, De Beers Centenary AG, De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd., De Beers PLC, De Beers UK Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice B. Rubinstein, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing B. Rubinstein)No proposed order.(Elliott, James) Additional attachment filed as entry #61 on 7/19/2024 (cbru, ). Additional attachment filed as entry #73 on 8/1/2024 (cbru, ).
July 17, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott S. Balber ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11882794) by Anglo American PLC, De Beers Centenary AG, De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd., De Beers PLC, De Beers UK Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice Balber, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Balber)No proposed order.(Elliott, James) Additional attachment filed as entry #58 on 7/18/2024 (cbru, ). Additional attachment filed as entry #70 on 8/1/2024 (cbru, ).
July 17, 2024 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Kaminski ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11882608) by Anglo American PLC, De Beers Centenary AG, De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd., De Beers PLC, De Beers UK Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice E. Kaminski, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Kaminski)No proposed order.(Elliott, James) Additional attachment filed as entry #60 on 7/18/2024 (cbru, ). Additional attachment filed as entry #72 on 8/1/2024 (cbru, ).
July 16, 2024 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response filed by Arranco US, LLC, Hawk BidCo US Inc., Sparrows Offshore, LLC. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 10, 2024 Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Altrad Defendants' App'x (Tables 1 & 2) to Feb. 22 Brief)(Pugh, Steven) Modified to edit text on 7/17/2024 (cbru, ).
July 16, 2024 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Mohed Altrad, Altrad Investment Authority S.A.S..Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--McVey Email Confirming Park Was Fully Resolved (June 3, 2022), #2 Exhibit B--Order Appointing Receiver in Park (March 17, 2023), #3 Exhibit C--Motion to Appoint a Receiver in Park (March 6, 2023), #4 Exhibit D--McVey Email Confirming Cape is Not in Tibbs (April 8, 2024), #5 Exhibit E--Excerpt of Hearing Transcript Confirming Cape is Not in Tibbs (April 10, 2024))(Hall, Kevin)
July 16, 2024 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Central Mining & Investment Corporation Ltd., Charter Consolidated Ltd., ESAB Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Rawl, A)
July 16, 2024 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response filed by Anglo American PLC. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver Complaint, #2 Exhibit B (placeholder), #3 Exhibit C - Letter from Chief Justice Toal to Parties and Judge Lewis, #4 Exhibit D - July 16 State Court Hearing Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Tibbs Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - April 8, 2024 McVey Email to Chief Justice Toal, #7 Exhibit G - April 10, 2024 State Court Hearing Transcript, #8 Exhibit H - Receiver Discovery Responses, #9 Exhibit I - Receiver Motion for Protective Order, #10 Exhibit J - Confidentiality Order, #11 Exhibit K - Asbestos General Scheduling Order, #12 Declaration of James H. Elliott, Jr.)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/17/2024 (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 44 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mohed Altrad, Altrad Investment Authority S.A.S..(O'Neill, Mary)
July 12, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Mohed Altrad, Altrad Investment Authority S.A.S. (O'Neill, Mary)
July 12, 2024 Filing 41 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Arranco US, LLC, Hawk BidCo US Inc., Sparrows Offshore, LLC.(Pugh, Steven)
July 12, 2024 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd..(Elliott, James) (Main Document 40 replaced on 7/15/2024) (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by De Beers Centenary AG.(Elliott, James) (Main Document 39 replaced on 7/15/2024) (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by De Beers UK Ltd..(Elliott, James) (Main Document 38 replaced on 7/15/2024) (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 37 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by De Beers PLC.(Elliott, James) (Main Document 37 replaced on 7/15/2024) (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 36 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anglo American PLC.(Elliott, James) (Main Document 36 replaced on 7/15/2024) (cbru, ).
July 12, 2024 Filing 35 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cape PLC.(Lay, John)
July 12, 2024 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ESAB Corporation.(Rawl, A)
July 12, 2024 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Central Mining & Investment Corporation Ltd..(Rawl, A)
July 12, 2024 Filing 32 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charter Consolidated Ltd..(Rawl, A)
July 10, 2024 Filing 31 Letter from James H. Elliott, Jr. Anglo American plc. (Elliott, James) (Main Document 31 replaced on 7/11/2024) (cbru, ).
July 9, 2024 Filing 30 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9, 10. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #11 , #12 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
July 8, 2024 Filing 29 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 696-708 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 28 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 492-546 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 388-491 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 26 REPLY by Anglo American PLC Statement Regarding Standing Order regarding removed cases. (Elliott, James) (Main Document 26 replaced on 7/10/2024) (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 25 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 343-387 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 660-695 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 655-659 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 626-654 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket No. 625 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 615-624 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 605-614 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 599-604 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 573-598 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 547-572 . (Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 79, 80, 81. (Attachments: #1 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 83, #2 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 84, #3 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 85, #4 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 86, #5 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 87-342, #6 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 89-Ex. B)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-12. (Attachments: #1 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 13, #2 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 15, 16, #3 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 17, 18, 22, 23, #4 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 19, 20-1, #5 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 20-2, #6 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 24-32, #7 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 33-65, #8 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 66, #9 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 82, 67-77, #10 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 78)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-1 with further exhibits. (Attachments: #1 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-2, #2 EState Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-3, #3 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-4, #4 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-5, #5 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-6, #6 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-7, #7 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-8, #8 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-9, #9 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-10, #10 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 12-11)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: State Court Edited Docket Nos. 232-251. (Attachments: #1 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 252-274, #2 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 275-302, #3 State Court Edited Docket No. 303, #4 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 1-3, #5 State Court Edited Docket No. 303 Ex. 4-7, #6 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 8, #7 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 9, #8 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 10-1, #9 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 10-2, #10 State Court Edited Docket No. 304 Ex. 11)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2024 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: Edited SC State Court Docket. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 1-147, #3 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 148-162, #4 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 163-172, #5 State Court Edited Docket No. 173-1, #6 State Court Edited Docket No. 173-2, #7 State Court Edited Docket No. 174-1, #8 State Court Edited Docket No. 174-2, #9 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 175-211, #10 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 212-219, #11 State Court Edited Docket Nos. 220-231)(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2024 (cbru, ).
July 2, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION byAnglo American PLC re #6 MOTION to Seal Document . (Elliott, James)
July 2, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cape PLC. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order Appointing Receiver, #2 Exhibit B- Order Denying Motion to Dissolve Receivership)No proposed order.(Lay, John)
July 2, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document by Anglo American PLC. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support #2 Exhibit 1 - Confidenitality Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Descriptive Index) No proposed order.(Elliott, James) Modified to edit text on 7/2/2024 (cbru, ).
July 1, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at http://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 7/8/2024) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/1/2024. (cbru, )
June 28, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anglo American PLC.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/1/2024) (cbru, ).
June 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP-40-01759 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11851962), filed by Anglo American PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (placeholder), #2 State Court Third-Party Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2024) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cape PLC v. Anglo American PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo American PLC
Represented By: Scott S Balber
Represented By: Maxwell D Herman
Represented By: Elizabeth Clare Kaminski
Represented By: Benjamin C Rubinstein
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Industrial Services Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers PLC
Represented By: Scott S Balber
Represented By: Maxwell D Herman
Represented By: Elizabeth Clare Kaminski
Represented By: Benjamin C Rubinstein
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Holdco Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightbox Jewelry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers Centenary AG
Represented By: Scott S Balber
Represented By: Maxwell D Herman
Represented By: Elizabeth Clare Kaminski
Represented By: Benjamin C Rubinstein
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated Ltd.
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Technologies (OR) Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forevermark US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six US Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo American Crop Nutrients (U.S.A.), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers UK Ltd.
Represented By: Scott S Balber
Represented By: Maxwell D Herman
Represented By: Elizabeth Clare Kaminski
Represented By: Benjamin C Rubinstein
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altrad Services Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Debenture Corporation PLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers Jewellers Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers Jewellers US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mode Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo American US Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESAB Corporation
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mining & Investment Corporation Ltd.
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers Consolidated Mines Ltd.
Represented By: Scott S Balber
Represented By: Maxwell D Herman
Represented By: Elizabeth Clare Kaminski
Represented By: Benjamin C Rubinstein
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Guild International (U.S.A.) Jewelry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Technologies US Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohed Altrad
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altrad UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape UK Holdings NewCo Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Industrial Services Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altrad Investment Authority S.A.S.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparrows Offshore Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawk BidCo US Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Carmen Vaughn Ganjehsani
Represented By: Benjamin Palmer Carlton
Represented By: Ashwin Sanzgiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arranco US, LLC
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Carmen Vaughn Ganjehsani
Represented By: Benjamin Palmer Carlton
Represented By: Ashwin Sanzgiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparrows Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Carmen Vaughn Ganjehsani
Represented By: Benjamin Palmer Carlton
Represented By: Ashwin Sanzgiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparrows Group, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape PLC
Represented By: Shanon Nicole Peake
Represented By: Lindsay Anne Joyner
Represented By: Laura Watkins Jordan
Represented By: Laura Watkins Jordan
Represented By: Jonathan M Robinson
Represented By: John T Lay
Represented By: Gray Thomas Culbreath
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Represented By: Eleanor Lasseigne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?