Rogers v. Safe Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Christopher Rogers
Defendant: Safe Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2024cv04897
Filed: September 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #20 Report and Recommendation and 21 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Rogers 20 Doe Court Wedgefield, SC 29168. (cpri)
October 30, 2024 Filing 21 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Mary Geiger Lewis. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: Matthew J. Perry, Jr. U.S. Courthouse 901 Richland Street Columbia, SC 29201. (cpri)
October 30, 2024 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge grant Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's federal law claims and decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. ECF No. #12 . Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/30/2024. (cpri)
October 18, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Response filed by Christopher Rogers. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/25/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 date and time stamped cover letter, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope) (cpri)
October 8, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Henry Petkoff on behalf of Safe Federal Credit Union (Petkoff, Carl)
October 4, 2024 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #15 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Rogers 20 Doe Court Wedgefield, SC 29168. (cpri)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Response to Motion due by 11/4/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/04/2024. (cpri)
October 4, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safe Federal Credit Union re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (Brannon, Kyle) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/7/2024 with corrected document provided by filing user). (cpri)
October 4, 2024 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Safe Federal Credit Union.(Brannon, Kyle)
October 4, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Safe Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of T.H. Pierce in Support of SAFE Federal Credit Union's Motion and Incorporated Memorandum to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Mailing, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Affidavit of Default, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Motion for Default Judgment and Application for Entry of Default, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Motion to Reconsider, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Motion to Set Aside Default, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Answer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - Response to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - Response to Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M - Affidavit of Michael Baker, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N - Judge McFaddin's Letter, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O - Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P - Notice of Dismissal)No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Brannon, Kyle)
October 3, 2024 Filing 10 SECOND SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope) (cpri)
September 16, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Rogers. Safe Federal Credit Union served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (cpri)
September 10, 2024 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #6 Order Service - Non-Inmate, #7 Summons Issued and #1 Complaint with attachments, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Rogers 20 Doe Court Wedgefield, SC 29168. (cpri) Modified on 9/10/2024 to edit docket text. (cpri)
September 9, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Safe Federal Credit Union. Service due by 12/9/2024. (cpri)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff is responsible for service of process under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 09/09/2024. (cpri)
September 9, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Rogers. (cpri) Modified on 10/21/2024 to edit docket text. (cpri)
September 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Safe Federal Credit Union, filed by Christopher Rogers. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 300112117.) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (cpri) Modified on 10/21/2024 to edit docket text. (cpri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Safe Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Kyle Aaron Brannon
Represented By: Carl Henry Petkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?