Barnes v. Dedmondt et al
Plaintiff: Steven Louis Barnes
Defendant: George Dedmondt, Brain Williams, Shadell Stevens, Marcus Smith, Polly Hall, A Dell Dobey, Brenda B Carpenter, Heidi Pressley, Randy Doran, O-Lee Sturkey and Karren Jaggers
Case Number: 4:2008cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Edgefield
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 194 Report and Recommendations, denying 171 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying all remaining motions as moot, re 129 Motion for Hearing, 140 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 193 Motion to Strike, and 158 Motion to Appoint Expert. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/29/2009. (jpet, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted, re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brain Williams, Heidi Pressley, A Dell Dobey, George Dedmondt, Randy Doran, Shadell Stevens, Polly Hal l, Karren Jaggers, Marcus Smith, that Barnes' motion for partial summary judgment be denied, re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Louis Barnes, and that the following motions be terminated should the district judge adopt these re commendations regarding the above dispositive motions: 129 MOTION for Hearing filed by Steven Louis Barnes, 140 MOTION for judicial notice filed by Steven Louis Barnes, 193 MOTION to Strike filed by Brain Williams, Heidi Pressley, Brenda B Carp enter, A Dell Dobey, George Dedmondt, Randy Doran, Shadell Stevens, Polly Hall, Marcus Smith, Karren Jaggers, 158 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by Steven Louis Barnes ( Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2009), Motions terminated: denying 159 MOTION for Discovery filed by Steven Louis Barnes, denying 160 MOTION to Strike filed by Steven Louis Barnes, mooting 179 MOTION to correct mistake of entry 161 & 162 re 161 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, 162 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, MOTION to correct mistake of entry 161 & 162 re 161 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, 162 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Steven Louis Barnes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 8/26/2009. (jpet, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 81 Report and Recommendations, 39 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brenda B Carpenter. DefendantCarpenter is dismissed with prejudice on the grounds of judicial immunity. The within action is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for additional pretrial handling. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/30/08. (swel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Dedmondt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Louis Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Dedmondt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadell Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Dell Dobey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda B Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O-Lee Sturkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karren Jaggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?