Beazer Homes Corp v. National Grange Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Beazer Homes Corp
Defendant: National Grange Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company, The, Nationwide Insurance Company, NGM Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines, Clarendon America Insurance and USF Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv02419
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to Defendant Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina only, without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by The Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 7/29/2013. (hcic, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER AS TO PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS BY CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, AND WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 2/19/2013.(hcic, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CONSENT ORDER ON AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S OBLIGATION TO PRODUCE UNDERWRITING FILE. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/17/2013. (hcic, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN BEAZER HOMES CORP AND NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/8/2013. (hcic, )
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 AMENDED ORDER granting 166 Motion to Compel; denying 167 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 168 Motion for Protective Order; granting 169 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/13/2012. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beazer Homes Corp v. National Grange Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beazer Homes Corp
Represented By: Louie Franklin Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grange Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?