RBC Bank USA v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: RBC Bank USA
Defendant: David Thomas Hix, Jr, Warfin Developers LLC, Theron Floyd, Trinity Development LLC, Larry Prosser, Duplex Development Inc, John Marks, Action Builders of Myrtle Beach LLC, David L Bridges, Jr, Alvin H Shuman, McKean Properties LLC, Youval Geringer, Stonegate Properties Inc, John M Warner, Jr, Alissa Smith, East Coast Funding LLC, Casa Mia Inc, J&M Mortgage Services Inc, Mike Wimberly, Zereko Nevada Inc, Thomas Darin Epps, Dunes Mortgage LLC, Synergy Investment Group LLC, Jeremy Eason, JJE Enterprises LLC, Malia McCaffrey, Prodigy Consulting LLC, Linda L Steele, Linbrandt LLC, Joseph Gray, Jacqueline Gray, West Coast Funding LLC, Theresa Feschuk, MAJ LLC, ZAG LLC, Myrtle Beach Villas LLC, David O'Connell, Jeffery Todd Shoup, Atlantis Villas of NMB LLC, Matthew Skinner and Billy James Barfield
Case Number: 4:2011cv00124
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 226 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/2/2013.(hcic, )
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER. Mr. Biddle's request that the court reconsider the award of attorney's fees is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/20/2012. (hcic, )
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST ALVIN SHUMAN AND MCKEAN PROPERTIES LLC. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/19/2012. (hcic, )
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST MATTHEW SKINNER. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/7/2012. (hcic, )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts the R&R of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against the defaulting defendants is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/13/2012. (prou, )
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER dismissing defendant, David OConnell. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 08/01/2012. (dsto, )
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER dismissing claims against Action Builders of Myrtle Beach LLC, John Marks. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 06/12/2012. (dsto, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER dismissing Warfin Developers LLC, and John M. Warner, Jr.. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/27/2012. (dsto, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER dismissing J&M Mortgage Services, Inc., a/k/a Challenge Home Equity. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/22/2012. (dsto, )
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER dismissing defendant, David L. Bridges, Jr.. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/19/2012. (dsto, )
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER dismissing defendants, Larry Prosser and Duplex Development, Inc.. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/15/2012. (dsto, )
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court adopts the Magistrate Judge's R&R in part. The R&R is adopted insofar as the Magistrate Judge recommends denying the Motion to Dismiss 45 as to Counts One and Two, an d the court respectfully declines to adopt the R&R insofar as it recommends granting the Motion to Dismiss 45 as to Count Three. Accordingly, it is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Bridges' Motion to Dismiss 45 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 3/9/2012. (mcot, )
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying 92 Motion to Quash; granting 101 Motion to Compel. Defendants Alvin H. Shuman, McKean Properties, LLC, and David OConnell shall serve their responses to Plaintiffs discovery requests within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/13/2012.(dsto, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Joseph Gray and Stonegate Properties Inc are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/11/2012.(hcic, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CONSENT JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that RBC Bank shall have and recover from Floyd judgment in the principal amount of $925,000.00, plus interest at the legal rate after judgment until paid infu ll. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT RBC Banks claims against Trinity Development,LLC in this action shall be dismissed, without prejudice, and the remaining claims against Floyd shall be dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 11/14/2011. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RBC Bank USA v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thomas Hix, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warfin Developers LLC
Represented By: Wallace Herbert Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theron Floyd
Represented By: William A Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Development LLC
Represented By: William A Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Prosser
Represented By: James W Peterson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duplex Development Inc
Represented By: James W Peterson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marks
Represented By: Robert C Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Builders of Myrtle Beach LLC
Represented By: Robert C Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Bridges, Jr
Represented By: Douglas M Zayicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin H Shuman
Represented By: J Marshall Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKean Properties LLC
Represented By: J Marshall Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youval Geringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonegate Properties Inc
Represented By: Joel Wyman Collins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Warner, Jr
Represented By: Wallace Herbert Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alissa Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Mia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&M Mortgage Services Inc
Represented By: John Aaron Ecton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zereko Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Darin Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunes Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Investment Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJE Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malia McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda L Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linbrandt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Feschuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZAG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrtle Beach Villas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Todd Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantis Villas of NMB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Skinner
Represented By: William Isaac Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy James Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBC Bank USA
Represented By: Thomas Lynn Ogburn, III
Represented By: David Dreifus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?