Bolton v. Byars et al
Plaintiff: Thurston M Bolton
Defendant: William R Byars and J Bryant Diehl
Case Number: 4:2013cv00607
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Court agrees with and adopts the R&R as the order of the Court. (Dkt. No. 72 ). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to dismiss this action without prejudice. (Dkt. No. 66 ). All other motions are terminated as moot. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/14/2014. (mcot, )
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/21/2013.(dsto, )
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 24 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/11/2013.(dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. Byars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurston M Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bryant Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?