Evans v. Quintiles Transnational

Plaintiff: Deborah Drda Evans
Defendant: Quintiles Transnational
Case Number: 4:2013cv00987
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion in limine for negative inferences from missing evidence 117 ; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's motion in limine concerning damages 118 ; and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's omnibus motion in limine 119 . Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/23/2015.(tmcb, )
April 29, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Defendant Quintiles Transnational Corp.'s [ECF # 52 ] motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Quintiles' [ECF # 56 ] motion in limine is DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 4/29/2015. (hcic, )
May 16, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL. Should no objections be filed by June 3, 2014, the temporary order will automatically convert to a permanent order to seal. Signed by The Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 5/16/2014. (hcic, )
October 7, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/7/2013. (hcic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Quintiles Transnational
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Drda Evans
Represented By: Glenn V Ohanesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintiles Transnational
Represented By: Zebulon D Anderson
Represented By: Johanna S Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?