Newkirk v. Enzor et al
Plaintiff: Catherine B Newkirk
Defendant: James B Enzor and South Carolina Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 4:2013cv01635
Filed: June 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS pages 2-3 and page 20 of the R&R (Dkt. No. 80 ), DENIES in part and GRANTS in part the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Enzor (Dkt. No. 64 ), and DENIES in part and GRANTS in part the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant SCDPS. (Dkt. No. 65 ). The case will therefore proceed on the Section 1983 excessive force claim against Defendant Enzor, and on the state tort claims of assault, battery, and negligence/gross negligence/recklessness. The claims for unlawful arrest, malicious prosecution, and false imprisonment are dismissed. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/19/2015. (mcot, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/24/2014.(mcot, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. No later than March 26, 2014, Plaintiff's current counsel is to provided such a notice to the client, providing the court with a copy of that letter by filing it in the co urt's electronic filing system ("ECF"). If Plaintiff has obtained new counsel, that counsel is to enter a notice of appearance in this court no later than March 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/24/2014. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newkirk v. Enzor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine B Newkirk
Represented By: James Thomas McBratney, III
Represented By: James Thomas McBratney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Enzor
Represented By: Samuel F Arthur, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?