UFP Eastern Division Inc v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: UFP Eastern Division Inc
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Co and Selective Insurance Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv02801
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: The Court DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 82 ), GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Defendant's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 83 ), and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's motion to strike (Dkt. No. 110 ). Signed by the Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 4/6/2017. (hcic, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER AND OPINION: The Court DENIES Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 64 ) and DENIES Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 65 ). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/6/2017.(prou, )
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The Court DENIES Defendant's renewed motion to exclude witnesses (Dkt. No. 57 ), DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 56 ) and Plaintiff's renewed motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 55 ), and ORDERS that the Second Amended Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 53 ) is amended as provided in this Order. Signed by the Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 7/21/2016. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UFP Eastern Division Inc v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFP Eastern Division Inc
Represented By: James A Bruorton, IV
Represented By: Timothy J.W. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Group Inc
Represented By: Andrew F Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?