Jones v. McRee
Plaintiff: Eric Jasen Jones
Defendant: J McRee
Case Number: 4:2015cv03273
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation 43 of the Magistrate Judge as the Order of the Court and GRANTS Defendant's motion for summary judgment. (Dkt. No. 36 ). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 09/16/2016. (dsto, )
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge regarding the summary dismissal of Plaintiff's claims for medical malpractice and negligence against all Defendants a nd the summary dismissal of all claims against Defendant South Carolina Department of Corrections. The Court DECLINES TO ADOPT the recommendation of summary dismissal regarding the deliberate indifference claim against Defendant McRee, and REFERS this matter back to the Magistrate Judge for further action consistent with this order.AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/09/2015. (dsto, )
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/16/2015. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. McRee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jasen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J McRee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?